Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51504
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2017
Terminated:Aug 26, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Northwest Septic and Oilfield Services, Inc.
11955 ND 5 NW
Crosby, ND 58730
Represented By
Northwest Septic and Oilfield Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, August 26, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Mon 08/26 11:49 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51504 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2019
16 16 notice Dismissal - Notice Fri 08/23 2:27 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Sunday, October 28, 2018
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/29 1:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 10/28/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Friday, October 26, 2018
14 14 1 pgs court Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Fri 10/26 1:41 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ira L. Herman is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Related [+] Signed on 10/26/2018. (LCN)
Related: [-] 13
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
13 13 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Wed 10/24 12:00 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
12 12 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Thu 04/26 1:40 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Plaintiff's First Set of Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/12 12:34 PM
Certificate of Service for the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000 Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2017
10 10 10 pgs order Order Thu 12/28 3:21 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Thank $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 12/28/2017. (SJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:36 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 2:32 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 11/27 1:31 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 1:59 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 2:33 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 10/12 5:24 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Northwest Septic and Oilfield Services, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, September 15, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 09/15 7:07 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51504 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8584522, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2017
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 09/14 5:03 PM
Adversary case 17-51504 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Northwest Septic and Oilfield Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/13/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives