Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51520
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2017
Terminated:Apr 04, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Multi-Chem Group, LLC
Represented By
Multi-Chem Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Justin R. Alberto
Bayard, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/04 12:56 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51520 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
16 16 notice Dismissal - Notice Thu 03/29 12:43 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 22, 2018
15 15 motion Stipulation Thu 03/22 2:00 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between Peter Kravitz and Multi-Chem Group, LLC . Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2018
14 14 motion Stipulation Fri 02/09 1:43 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between Peter Kravitz and Multi-Chem Group, LLC . Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2018
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/12 12:30 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
12 12 15 pgs order Order Fri 01/05 2:55 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 1/3/2018 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 12/12/2017 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:36 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 2:32 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 11:03 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Amended Agenda for Hearing on November 28, 2017 Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 11/27 1:20 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 1:59 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 6:05 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 10/12 4:51 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Multi-Chem Group, LLC Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Flasser, Gregory) Modified on 10/13/2017 to Correct Text (LB)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, September 14, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 09/14 7:24 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51520 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8584337, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 09/14 6:51 PM
Adversary case 17-51520 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Multi-Chem Group, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/13/2017. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives