Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51523
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2017
Terminated:Dec 18, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
JDL Construction, Inc.
938 Washington Street
Douglas, WY 82633
Represented By
JDL Construction, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/18 11:19 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51523 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
14 14 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 12/11 2:19 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, April 26, 2018
13 13 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Thu 04/26 1:35 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Plaintiff's First Set of Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2018
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/12 12:34 PM
Certificate of Service for the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000 Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2017
11 11 10 pgs order Order Thu 12/28 3:18 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Thank $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 12/28/2017. (SJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:29 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 2:32 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 11/27 1:12 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 1:59 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2017
5 5 cmp Alias Summons Tue 10/31 2:40 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant JDL Construction, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2017 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/2/2018. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 2:21 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 10/12 5:15 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant JDL Construction, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Monday, September 18, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 09/18 7:31 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51523 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8586143, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2017
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 09/15 1:42 PM
Adversary case 17-51523 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against JDL Construction, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/14/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives