Pitino v. Adidas America, Inc.
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | David J Hale |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00639 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 15, 2018 4:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
Adidas America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard A. Pitino
|
Represented By
|
1. | Court dismisses Rick Pitino's lawsuit against Adidas (nypost.com) |
Submitted Wed 08/15/2018 | |
2. | Adidas asks judge to dismiss University of Louisville men's basketball coach Rick Pitino's lawsuit (courier-journal.com) |
Submitted Mon 11/27/2017 | |
3. | Former Louisville Cardinals coach Rick Pitino files lawsuit against Adidas alleging emotional distress (deadspin.com) |
Submitted Wed 10/18/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 8/14/2018 - The motion to dismiss (D.N.7 ) is GRANTED. This matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. cc: Counsel (KD) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER by Judge David J. Hale granting16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jeffrey S. Moad terminated as counsel for Defendant adidas America, Inc. cc: Counsel(JAC) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
![]() MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Stites & Harbison, PLLC . (Continue to receive notice:Yes) by Defendant Adidas America, Inc. (Moad, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael T. Leigh (Leigh, Michael) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Forum, Venue, and Failure to State a Claim filed by Adidas America, Inc.. (Leigh, Michael) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
![]() AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 12/22/2017;, Schedules re:7 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Forum, Venue, and Failure to State a Claim :( Replies due by 1/5/2018.)cc:counsel (KJA) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re7 by Adidas America, Inc.. (Leigh, Michael) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
![]() RESPONSE to Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Forum, Venue, and Failure to State a Claim filed by Richard A. Pitino. (Pence, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 11/28 4:34 PM
TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 11/28/2017 granting8 Motion for William H. Taft, V., to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting9 Motion for Miheer Mhatre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT) |
|
Friday, November 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
![]() MOTION for Miheer Mhatre to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2548285. by Defendant Adidas America, Inc. (Leigh, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() MOTION for William H. Taft V to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2548284. by Defendant Adidas America, Inc. (Leigh, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Forum, Venue, and Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Adidas America, Inc. (Leigh, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
![]() AGREED ORDER by Judge David J. Hale (EBOC). Defendant Adidas America, Inc. to respond to complaint by 11/24/2017. cc:counsel (JAC) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Proposed Order Agreed Proposed Order Modifying Time to Respond re1 Complaint by Adidas America, Inc.. (Leigh, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent adidas North America, Inc., Corporate Parent adidas AG for Adidas America, Inc.. by Adidas America, Inc.. (Leigh, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to Adidas America, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (NM) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. Magistrate Judge designation: Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (NM) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Adidas America, Inc. filed by Richard A. Pitino. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2527731. (NM) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |