USA v. Wilcox et al
Hawaii District Court | |
Case #: | 1:17-cr-00555 |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 07, 2019 11:51 PM HST |
Defendant
Shane Kaui (2)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Solomon Kealoha (4)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jay C. K. Lono (9)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Niuli'i Martin (7)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dore Oishi (8)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shawn Pa'a'aina (5)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Delaneo Kawika Puha (3)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Justin K. Wilcox (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Cisco James Silva (6)
Terminated: 08/09/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/15/2020 2:14 PM HST |
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 3 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Justin Kaanoi Wilcox (1) - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 9/26/2017. (emt, ) [1:17-mj-01125-KJM] | |
2 | 2 EO: as to Justin Kaanoi Wilcox - Initial Appearance is set for 09/26/2017 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. ( Added attorney Brandon K. Flores for Justin Kaanoi Wilcox). (Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:17-mj-01125-KJM] | |
3 | 3 MOTION to Detain Defendant Without Bail - by USA as to Justin Kaanoi Wilcox. (emt, ) [1:17-mj-01125-KJM] | |
4 | 4 1 pgs EP :Initial Appearance as to Justin Kaanoi Wilcox held on 9/26/2017. Defendant present, in custody. Defendant sworn to the financial affidavit and request for court appointed attorney is granted. Brandon K. Flores is appointed as CJA counsel. Defendant's counsel informs the Court that his client's legal name is JUSTIN KAANOI . The record will reflect as so. Charges have been received. Defendant understands the charges. Detention Hearing set for 9/29/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/10/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal Service. ***Procedural Interval start as to Justin Kaanoi Wilcox. (FTR-Ctrm 6/2:00-2:05 PM.) (Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD) (emt, ) No COS issued for this docket entry [1:17-mj-01125-KJM] | |
5 | 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit - by Justin Kaanoi. (emt, ) [1:17-mj-01125-KJM] | |
6 | 6 CJA 20 as to Justin Kaanoi: Brandon K. Flores, Esq. appointed for Justin Kaanoi. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 9/26/2017. (emt, ) No COS issued for this docket entry [1:17-mj-01125-KJM] Modified on 10/3/2017 (emt, ). | |
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7 13 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT as to Justin K. Wilcox (1) count(s) 1, 12-13, 14, Shane Kaui (2) count(s) 1, 12-13, 14, Delaneo Kawika Puha (3) count(s) 1, 5-6, 7, 9, 10, 11, 14, Solomon Martin (4) count(s) 1, Shawn Pa'a'aina (5) count(s) 1, 9, 10, Cisco James Silva (6) count(s) 8, David Niuli'i Martin (7) count(s) 1, 5-6, Dore Oishi (8) count(s) 1, 5-6 , Jay C. K. Lono (9) count(s) 1, 2-4. (emt, ) Modified on 7/11/2018 added to Counts 5-6 as to (08) Dore Oishi, reflected on the docket as Counts 5s, 6s (emt, ). | |
8 | 8 (ORIGINAL) SEALED INDICTMENT as to (01) Justin K. Wilcox, (02) Shane Kaui, (03) Delaneo Kawika Puha, (04) Solomon Martin, (05) Shawn Pa'a'aina, (06) Cisco James Silva, (07) David Niuli'i Martin, {08} Dore Oishi, (09) Jay C. K. Lono. (SEALED) (emt, ) | |
9 | 9 Defendant Information Sheet: (01) Justin K. Wilcox. (SEALED) (emt, ) | |
10 | 10 Defendant Information Sheet: (02) Shane Kaui. (SEALED) (emt, ) | |
11 | 11 Defendant Information Sheet: (03) Delaneo Kawika Puha. (SEALED) (emt, ) | |
12 | 12 Defendant Information Sheet: (04) Solomon Martin. (SEALED) (emt, ) | |
13 | 13 Defendant Information Sheet: (05) Shawn Pa'a'aina. (SEALED) (emt, ) | |
14 | 14 Defendant Information Sheet: (06) Cisco James Silva. (SEALED) (emt, ) | |
15 | 15 Defendant Information Sheet: (07) David Nuili'i Martin. (SEALED) (emt, ) | |
16 | 16 Defendant Information Sheet: (08) Dore Oishi. (SEALED) (emt, ) | |
17 | 17 Defendant Information Sheet: (09) Jay C. K. Lono. (SEALED) (emt, ) |