Chemtex Far East, Ltd.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-12307
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-12307
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-12313 |
Case Filed: | Oct 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 08, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Chemtex Far East, Ltd.
1979 Eastwood Rd
Wilmington, NC 28403-7214 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago |
Monday, June 08, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Final Decree Closing Subsidiary Cases and Granting Related Relief. Signed on 6/3/2020 (LCN) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 06/08 10:23 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LCN) |
||
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. of Chemtex Far East, Ltd. Filed by Chemtex Far East, Ltd.. (Jones, Laura Davis) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. of Chemtex Far East, Ltd. Filed by Chemtex Far East, Ltd.. (Jones, Laura Davis) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. of Chemtex Far East, Ltd. Filed by Chemtex Far East, Ltd.. (Jones, Laura Davis) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order Approving Motion for Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: M&G USA Corporation, M&G Resins USA, LLC, M&G Polymers USA, LLC, M&G Finance Corporation, M&G Waters USA, LLC, Mossi & Ghisolfi International, M&G Capital, M&G Chemicals S.A., M&G USA Holding, LLC, Chemtex International Inc., Chemtex Far East, Ltd. and Indo American Investments, Inc. in 17-12307 which should be consulted for all matters affecting this case Signed on 11/1/2017 (LCo) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 10/31 8:14 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case. Involvement of Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein Terminated (LCo) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 10/31 12:15 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-12313 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8637171, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Tue 10/31 8:08 AM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case (LCo) |
||
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Chemtex Far East, Ltd.. (Jones, Laura Davis) |