California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:17-mj-03689
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2017
Terminated:Oct 31, 2017
Last checked: Monday Feb 05, 2018 10:54 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Renee Green
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
William Dixon Adelman (1)
Terminated: 10/31/2017
Represented By
Charles L Rees
Law Offices Of Charles L Rees
contact info


Tuesday, October 03, 2017
1 1 13 pgs COMPLAINT as to William Dixon Adelman (1). (cc: USM, AUSA) (rlu) (dlg).
Related: [-]
2 2 Order to Seal Case as to William Dixon Adelman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 10/3/2017. (cc: AUSA) (rlu) (dlg).
Related: [-]
3 3 ARREST WARRANT ISSUED by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes in case as to William Dixon Adelman. (cc: USM, AUSA) (rlu) (dlg).
Related: [-]