Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sidney A Fitzwater
Case #: 3:14-cv-03065
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2014
Terminated:Nov 28, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 29, 2017 9:34 PM CST
Defendant
Pine Creek Medical Center LLC
Plaintiff
Suzanne Scott
Represented By
Shannon L K Welch
Fisher & Welch
contact info
James A Fisher
Fisher & Welch
contact info
Plaintiff
Savannah Sogar
Represented By
Shannon L K Welch
Fisher & Welch
contact info
James A Fisher
Fisher & Welch
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
J Scott Hogan-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Tracy Lyle Hilmer
Us Department Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Lindsey E Beran-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
45 45 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Tue 11/28 9:03 AM
ORDER: This Action is hereby dismissed with prejudice as to the Relators; with respect to the United States, the Action is dismissed with prejudice as to the Covered Conduct (as defined in the parties' Settlement Agreement), and otherwise without prejudice. The seal shall be lifted upon Relators'2 Complaint, Relators'43 Notice of Dismissal and the United States'44 Consent thereto, this Order, and any subsequent filings in this case. All other contents of the Court's file in this action shall remain under seal and not be made public. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/28/2017) (sss)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
44 44 United States Notice of Consent to Dismissal filed by United States of America. (ndt) Modified restriction on 11/28/2017 (sss).
Related: [-]
43 43 Notice of Dismissal filed by Suzanne Scott, Savannah Sogar. (ndt) Modified restriction on 11/28/2017 (sss).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 26, 2014
2 2 24 pgs COMPLAINT against Pine Creek Medical Center LLC filed by Savannah Sogar, Suzanne Scott. (Filing fee $400.00; Receipt number 76412) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (cea)
Related: [-]