Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51849
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2017
Terminated:Jul 02, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
FTS International, Inc.
777 Main Street Suite 3000
Fort Worth, TX 76102
Represented By
FTS International, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Tue 07/02 11:29 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51849 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2019
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 07/01 2:32 PM
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding related document(s)1 ,3 ,11 Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman) Modified text on 7/2/2019 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
22 22 3 pgs order Order Thu 04/11 2:38 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Amend Caption to Add Defendant. Related [+] Order Signed on 4/11/2019. (LCN)
Related: [-] 18
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, April 08, 2019
21 21 order Stipulation Mon 04/08 3:25 PM
Second Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than$75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] Order Signed on 4/8/2019. (LH)
Related: [-] 20
20 20 motion Stipulation Mon 04/08 12:22 PM
Stipulation Between FTS International, Inc. and Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust to Extend Deadlines in Procedures Order . Filed by FTS International, Inc.. (Fraser, Simon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, March 26, 2019
19 19 notice Service - Notice Tue 03/26 1:48 PM
Notice of Service of Answers and Objections of FTS International, Inc. and FTS International Services, LLC to First Set of Requests for Admission Propounded by Plaintiff Filed by FTS International, Inc.. (Fraser, Simon)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 26, 2018
18 18 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Mon 11/26 3:45 PM
Certification of Counsel Submitting Stipulation to Amend Complaint to Add Defendant Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 1 ,3 ,11
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation to Amend Complaint
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
17 17 motion Stipulation Mon 11/26 3:39 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadlines in Procedures Order Between Peter Kravitz and Defendant FTS International, Inc. . Filed by Peter Kravitz Related [+]. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 10
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Order Extending Deadlines
Friday, September 28, 2018
16 16 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Fri 09/28 4:17 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Plaintiff's First Set of Written Discovery Requests Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Fri 09/28 4:16 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to FTS International, Inc.'s First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 01, 2018
14 14 notice Service - Notice Wed 08/01 2:04 PM
Notice of Service of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Bankruptcy Case (or Adversary Proceeding) directed to Samson Lone Star, LLC Filed by FTS International, Inc.. (Fraser, Simon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, July 31, 2018
13 13 notice Service - Notice Tue 07/31 3:53 PM
Notice of Service of FTS International, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff, FTS International, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission Directed to Plaintiff, and FTS International, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff Filed by FTS International, Inc.. (Fraser, Simon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2018
12 12 notice Service - Notice Thu 05/03 10:05 AM
Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) Filed by FTS International, Inc.. (Fraser, Simon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/03 2:20 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by FTS International, Inc. Mediation due date: 08/1/2018.(Fraser, Simon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 17, 2018
10 10 9 pgs order Order Wed 01/17 1:55 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Related [+] Order Signed on 1/17/2018. (LCN)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, January 05, 2018
9 9 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 01/05 5:07 PM
Affidavit of Service Re: Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on January 8, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 01/05 5:04 PM
Affidavit of Service Re: Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on January 8, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Fri 01/05 4:50 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Fri 01/05 12:34 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 1/8/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2018
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Thu 01/04 11:31 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 1/8/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
4 4 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:29 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 12/04 12:58 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant FTS International, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/2/2018. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, December 01, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 12/01 4:50 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51849 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8673507, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 12/01 3:54 PM
Adversary case 17-51849 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against FTS International, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 03/1/2018. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives