Jewett et al v. University of Louisville et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Sheri Polster Chappell |
Referred: | Mac R Mccoy |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00659 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 30, 2018 5:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
Exomedicine Institute
|
|
Defendant
Nathaniel Irvin, II
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nathaniel Irvin, III
|
|
Defendant
Jovian Zayne, LLC
|
|
Defendant
University of Louisville
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wondaland Productions, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe I
|
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe II
|
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe III
|
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe IV
|
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe V
|
|
Plaintiff
Anthony D. Jewett
PO BOX 1264
Fort Myers, FL 33902 |
Docket last updated: 66 minutes ago |
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Judgment
Fri 07/13 10:42 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/13/2018. (laf) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
5
pgs
order
Order dismissing case
Thu 07/12 9:24 AM
ORDER dismissing case. The above-captioned case is DISMISSED for failure to prosecute, failure to serve process, and alleging frivolous claims. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment accordingly, terminate any pending deadlines and motions, and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/12/2018. (LMF) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 07/10 10:56 AM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/10/2018. Court Reporter: Lori L. Bundy (laf) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
respoth
Response
Fri 07/06 11:45 AM
RESPONSE re 24 Order no pdf, 25 Notice of hearing filed by Nathaniel Irvin, II, University of Louisville.(Tucker, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Emails | ||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order to show cause
Wed 06/13 1:58 PM
ORDER to show cause as to Anthony D. Jewett. Plaintiff Anthony Jewett must SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before July 5, 2018, why the Court should not dismiss this case as against Defendants Nathaniel Irvin, III, Jovian Zayne, LLC, Wondaland Productions, LLC, Exomedicine Institute, and the Jane Does for failure to effect service per the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Middle District of Florida Local Rules. Failure to respond to this Order will result in this case being dismissed as against the previously listed Defendants without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/13/2018. (LMF) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of hearing
Wed 06/13 11:55 AM
NOTICE of hearing: Status Conference set for 7/10/2018 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Counsel is permitted to appear telephonically. Counsel is directed to contact Leslie Friedmann, Courtroom Deputy, at 239-461-2068 or Leslie_M_Friedmann@flmd.uscourts.gov, to obtain instructions regarding telephonic appearance. (LMF) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
*Order no pdf
Thu 05/31 4:27 PM
ENDORSED ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on review of the Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. 21 ). To date, the parties have not selected a mediator as they stated they would by May 30, 2018. (Doc. 18 at 3). Accordingly, the Court DIRECTS the parties to select a mediator and tell the Court, in writing, on or before June 4, 2018, as to who they have selected. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/31/2018. (CMC) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Wed 04/11 12:46 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Anthony D. Jewett. Related case(s): yes(RMT) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 04/02 4:42 PM
TEXT ORDER discharging 17 Order to Show Cause and denying as moot 20 Request to Extend Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/2/2018. (brh) |
|
21 | 21
order
Case management and scheduling order
Mon 04/02 4:10 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell, Trial term commencing 8/5/2019 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/2/2018. (jmc) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time to File
Mon 04/02 3:13 PM
REQUEST to extend time to respond TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re17 Order pdf filed by Anthony D. Jewett.(RMT) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Mailing Envelope | ||
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Fri 03/30 11:22 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Interested persons order by Anthony D. Jewett. (RMT) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Case Management Report
Thu 03/29 12:54 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (RMT) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
*Order pdf
Fri 03/16 1:05 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On or before March 30, 2018, Plaintiff shall show good cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed for failure file a Case Management Report, for failure to comply with this Court's Orders, and for failure to prosecute. If Plaintiff fails to show good cause, the Court will recommend that this action be dismissed. On or before March 30, 2018, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report. If the parties do not file a Joint Case Management Report by this deadline, the Court will recommend that this action be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/16/2018. (brh) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically
Thu 02/22 6:19 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 15 Joint Motion to Allow Counsel and Pro Se Party to Meet Via Telephone and Email to Prepare Case Management Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 2/22/2018. (brh) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Appear telephonically
Thu 02/22 4:15 PM
Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Nathaniel Irvin, II, University of Louisville. (Tucker, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
*Order pdf
Thu 02/15 10:50 AM
ORDER requiring the parties: (1) to meet within 7 days to prepare a joint Case Management Report; and (2) to file the Case Management Report within 14 days from the date of the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 2/15/2018. (brh) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
*Order pdf
Thu 01/18 12:01 PM
ORDER disregarding Plaintiff's Letter and Request for Entry of Clerk's Default attached as Exhibit A. Plaintiff shall cease sending letters or emails to any judicial officer of this Court, unless or until he is specifically invited to do so by a presiding judge. Plaintiff may file his Request for Entry of Clerk's Default as a written motion filed with the Clerk of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 1/18/2018.(brh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to amended complaint
Thu 01/18 9:33 AM
ANSWER to 2 Amended Complaint and Court's January 12, 2018 Order by Nathaniel Irvin, II, University of Louisville.(Tucker, Joseph) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
*Order no pdf
Fri 01/12 3:35 PM
AMENDED ENDORSED ORDER. The Court amends its previous Endorsed Order (Doc. 10) dated January 11, 2018, only to correct a scrivener's error. This matter comes before the Court on sua sponte review of the file. On December 1, 2017, Defendants University of Louisville and Nathaniel Irvin, II removed the Amended Complaint (Doc. 2 ) from state court (Doc. 1 ). To date, they have not filed a responsive pleading. Accordingly, the Court directs Defendants to file a responsive pleading on or before January 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/12/2018. (CMC) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
*Order no pdf
Thu 01/11 9:05 AM
ENDORSED ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on sua sponte review of the file. On December 1, 2017, Defendants University of Louisville and Nathaniel Irvin, II removed the Amended Complaint (Doc. 2 ) from state court (Doc. 1 ). To date, they have not filed a responsive pleading. Accordingly, the Court directs Defendants to file a responsive pleading on or before December 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/11/2018. (CMC) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
*Order no pdf
Fri 12/29 3:38 PM
TEXT ORDER: Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 2/9/2018. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and taken under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/29/2017. (jmc) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Mon 12/18 10:38 AM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nathaniel Irvin, II, University of Louisville. Related case(s): No (Tucker, Joseph) |
|
7 | 7
4
pgs
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 12/18 10:19 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Nathaniel Irvin, II. (Tucker, Joseph) |
|
6 | 6
4
pgs
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 12/18 10:18 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by University of Louisville. (Tucker, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Standing Order re: 25 pages
Wed 12/13 11:25 AM
STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/13/2017. (SPB) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Interested persons order
Fri 12/08 2:14 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/22/2017. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/8/2017. (WRW) |
|
3 | 3
11
pgs
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Fri 12/08 2:14 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/22/2017. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/8/2017. (WRW) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
11
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 12/05 12:17 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Exomedicine Institute, Nathaniel Irvin, III, Nathaniel Irvin, II, Jovian Zayne, LLC, University of Louisville, Wondaland Productions, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Anthony D. Jewett. (Filed in State Court on 11/6/17.)(SPB) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 12/05 12:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial Circuit Court, Lee County, case number 17-CA-003489 filed in State Court on 10/29/17. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number FTM011698 filed by University of Louisville, Nathaniel Irvin, II.(SPB) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet |