LH Liquidations Corporation
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-15591 |
Case Filed: | Dec 07, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Lectrus Holding Corporation
1919 W Polymer Dr
Chattanooga, TN 37421-2204 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Historic U.S. Courthouse 31 E. Eleventh Street Fourth Floor
Chattanooga, TN 37402 |
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 12:01 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Tue 07/18 11:26 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 1:17-bk-15591 for the Quarter Ending: June 30, 2023 Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Other Professional Scott M Shaw. (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Mon 05/01 9:22 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 1:17-bk-15591 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2023 Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Other Professional Scott M Shaw. (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Fri 01/20 7:02 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-15591 for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2022 Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Other Professional Scott M Shaw. (Shaw, Scott) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Fri 01/20 7:01 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-15591 for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2022 Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Other Professional Scott M Shaw. (Shaw, Scott) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Fri 01/20 7:00 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-15591 for the Quarter Ending: 06/30/2022 Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Other Professional Scott M Shaw. (Shaw, Scott) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Fri 01/20 6:59 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-15591 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2022 Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Other Professional Scott M Shaw. (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, January 26, 2022 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Thu 01/27 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/26/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 25, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Tue 01/25 2:23 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-15591 for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2021 Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Other Professional Scott M Shaw. (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service and Additional Parties to be Served | ||
Monday, January 24, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
order
Acting On Objection to Claim
Mon 01/24 3:24 PM
Order Sustaining Objection to claim 2 . (elr) |
|
Wednesday, December 22, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
claims
Objection to Claim
Wed 12/22 10:59 AM
Objection to Claim 2 by Claimant W.W. Grainger, Inc.. Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Other Professional Scott M Shaw. Objections due by 01/21/2022.(Shaw, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 16, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 11/16 3:29 PM
Certificate of Service -Amended Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Debtor LH Liquidations Corporation . (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Mon 11/15 10:55 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-15591 for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2021 Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Debtor LH Liquidations Corporation. (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service and Additional Parties to be Served | ||
Tuesday, July 27, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Tue 07/27 11:27 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-15591 for the Quarter Ending: 06/30/2021 Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Debtor LH Liquidations Corporation. (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service and Additional Parties to be Served | ||
22 | 22
misc
Withdraw Document(s)
Tue 07/27 11:15 AM
Withdraw Documents(s) Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Debtor LH Liquidations Corporation . (Shaw, Scott) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Tue 07/27 10:55 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-15591 for the Quarter Ending: 06/30/2021 Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Debtor LH Liquidations Corporation. (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service and Additional Parties to be Served | ||
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Held
Mon 01/08 3:53 PM
Section 341 Meeting Held on 01/08/2018. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee. (Holesinger, David) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Fri 01/05 2:37 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Justin M. Sveadas on behalf of Debtor Lectrus Holding Corporation . (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
Saturday, December 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sun 12/17 1:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 21. Notice Date 12/16/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 12/16 1:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 23. Notice Date 12/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
court
Memo
Thu 12/14 9:36 AM
An order has been entered in this case directing joint administration of this case with the Chapter 11 bankruptcy case of Lectrus Corporation, Case No. (1:17-bk-15588-NWW), which docket should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (elr) |
|
15 | 15
order
Joint Administration
Thu 12/14 9:34 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 1:17-bk-15588-NWW with Member Case 1:17-bk-15591-NWW . An order has been entered in this case directing joint administration of thiscase with the Chapter 11 bankruptcy case of Lectrus Corporation, CaseNo. (1:17-bk-15588-NWW), which docket should be consulted for allmatters affecting this case. (elr) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Thu 12/14 1:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 21. Notice Date 12/13/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Tue 12/12 4:37 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/8/2018 at 02:00 PM at Basement Room 18, Chattanooga, TN. Proof of Claim due by 4/9/2018. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee. (Holesinger, David) |
|
12 | 12
court
Hearing Held (BK)
Tue 12/12 4:24 PM
Hearing Held Motion granted; replacement order to be submitted. (sal) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
court
Hearing Set (BK)
Mon 12/11 11:08 AM
Hearing Set Hearing scheduled 12/12/2017 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (sal) |
|
Saturday, December 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sun 12/10 1:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 21. Notice Date 12/09/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Fri 12/08 8:45 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Justin M. Sveadas on behalf of Debtor Lectrus Holding Corporation. (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Debtor Electronic Noticing Election (DeBN)
Fri 12/08 8:42 AM
Debtor Requests to Begin Electronic Noticing Filed by Justin M. Sveadas on behalf of Debtor Lectrus Holding Corporation. (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Acting on Motion to Extend or Shorten Time
Thu 12/07 5:03 PM
Order Granting Motion for Ex Parte Relief to Extend Time to File Statement of Financial Affairs; Extended through and including January 7, 2018. (elr) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Ex Parte Relief
Thu 12/07 1:08 PM
Motion for Ex Parte Relief Re: Time to File Statement of Financial Affairs, in addition to Motion to Extend Time To Time to File Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Erno D. Lindner on behalf of Debtor Lectrus Holding Corporation (Lindner, Erno) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
6
pgs
motion
Joint Administration
Thu 12/07 1:05 PM
Expedited Motion for Joint Administration Expedited Application of Debtors for Order Directing Joint Administration of Cases Pursuant to Rule 1015(b) Filed by Justin M. Sveadas on behalf of Debtor Lectrus Holding Corporation Hearing scheduled 12/12/2017 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 12/07 12:21 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(1:17-bk-15591) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 17404034. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Equity Security Holders
Thu 12/07 12:19 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Justin M. Sveadas on behalf of Debtor Lectrus Holding Corporation. (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
2 | 2
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Thu 12/07 12:18 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Justin M. Sveadas on behalf of Debtor Lectrus Holding Corporation. (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
1 | 1
22
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 12/07 12:17 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Justin M. Sveadas on behalf of Lectrus Holding Corporation. Statement of Financial Affairs due 12/21/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 12/21/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 6/5/2018. (Sveadas, Justin) |