Jason Scott Hukill v. James T. Warren et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-02448 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 04, 2018 3:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
Kuba Jewgieniew
|
|
Defendant
Jack Zuckerman
|
|
Defendant
James T. Warren
|
|
Defendant
Gursey Schneider
|
|
Defendant
Realty One
|
|
Defendant
James T. Neavitt
|
|
Defendant
Chandra Moss
|
|
Defendant
Steven Donnell
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Terry Brock
|
|
Defendant
David Blumenthal
|
|
Defendant
Kenneth A. Black
|
|
Plaintiff
Jason Scott Hukill
2269 Hamner Ave
Norco, CA 92860 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Karen D. Rohan-Hukill
Terminated: 05/16/2018
5042 E Tanglewood Cir
Cave Creek, AZ 85331 |
|
Defendant
Private Dispute Resolution
Terminated: 03/22/2018
|
|
Defendant
Sherrie Davidson
Terminated: 03/22/2018
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 08/10 4:55 PM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals38 , CCA # 18-55823 The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered July 19, 2018, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Order42 DISMISSED.] (mat) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Mon 07/23 10:16 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals38 filed by Jason Scott Hukill. CCA # 18-55823 DISMISSED. (bm) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
order
Dismissing Case
Fri 07/20 10:57 AM
MINUTES Order DISMISSING Action for Failure to Prosecute (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Upon consideration of these five factors, the Court finds dismissal for failure to prosecute is warranted. For the foregoing reasons, the Court DISMISSES this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
appeal
Appeal Fees Paid
Fri 07/06 2:39 PM
APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals38 as to Plaintiff Jason Scott Hukill; Receipt Number: RS009505 in the amount of $505. (lmu) |
||
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 06/27 10:21 AM
MINUTE ORDER to Show Cause re: Lack of Prosecution (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed as to the Remaining Defendants for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff should respond no later than July 2, 2018. In his response, Plaintiff should explain why the Remaining Defendants have not been served, given this case was originally filed on December 6, 2017. A failure to respond, or an inadequate response, will result in dismissal. (iva) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Fri 06/22 1:27 PM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 18-55823 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals38 as to Plaintiff Jason Scott Hukill. (bm) |
|
38 | 38
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Thu 06/21 2:03 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Appellant Jason Scott Hukill. Appeal of Order on Motion for Order,,,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,37 . (Appeal Fee - Previously Paid.) (Hukill, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
order
For Order Sanctions
Thu 05/17 9:29 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order (1) GRANTING Defendants Motion to Dismiss32 ; (2) DENYING Defendants Request for Sanctions35 ; (3) DISMISSING Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint as against Karen Hukill WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; and (4) VACATING the May 21, 2018 Hearing by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: (see document image for further details). Given the nature of Plaintiffs claims, the Court finds that granting leave to amend would be futile. Plaintiffs claims rest on an untenable legal theory, and additional allegations would not remedy the numerous legal deficiencies. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Defendants Motion to Dismiss and DISMISSES Plaintiffs FAC as to Karen Hukill WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. Defendants Request for Sanctions (Dkt. No. 35) is DENIED. The hearing set for May 21, 2018 is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (ad) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Thu 05/10 10:56 AM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case24 filed by Defendant Karen D. Rohan-Hukill. (yl) |
|
35 | 35
motion
Sanctions
Thu 05/10 10:52 AM
REQUEST for Sanctions PURSUANT TO RULE 11 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE filed by Defendant Karen D. Rohan-Hukill. Request set for hearing on 5/21/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (yl) |
|
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/27 5:57 AM
OPPOSITION to Memorandum and Request for Order filed by Plaintiff Jason Scott Hukill. (Hukill, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/19 3:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER (1) ORDERING Plaintiff Jason Scott Hukill to File an Oppositionand (2) Scheduling a Hearing on Defendant Karen D. Rohan-Hukill'sRequest for Order (Dkt. No.32 ) for May 21, 2018 (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an opposition to Defendant's MTD. This opposition should, at a minimum, address Defendant's four arguments outlined above and must be filed by April 27, 2018. The Court warns Plaintiff that he has exhausted the Court's patience with his repeated late filings. Failure to timely file an opposition will result in his FAC being dismissed without leave to amend. Defendant may, if she chooses, file a reply to Plaintiff's opposition. This reply must be filed by May 4, 2018. The Court sets a hearing to be held on this matter on May 21, 2018 at 9 a.m. (iva) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
10
pgs
motion
Order
Wed 04/18 9:44 AM
Memorandum and REQUEST for Order filed by defendant Karen D. Rohan-Hukill. (iva) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Fri 03/23 4:03 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document missing signature. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gga) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Thu 03/22 9:39 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),1 , filed by Plaintiff Jason Scott Hukill(Hukill, Jason) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Dismiss Case
Thu 02/22 1:17 PM
MINUTE Order (1) GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No.24 ); (2) DISMISSING Plaintiff's Complaint WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; and (3) VACATING the February 26, 2018 Hearing (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) Accordingly, the Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's Complaint WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. If Plaintiff chooses to amend his complaint, he must file an amended complaint or before March 9, 2018. Additionally, the Court strongly advises Plaintiff to utilize the Joint Federal Pro Se Clinic which offers free on-site assistance to pro se litigants. Plaintiff can obtain additional information on the Joint Clinic's website at http://prose.cacd.uscourts.gov/riverside. The hearing on February 26, 2018 is VACATED. (iva) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Wed 02/14 10:47 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case23 . The wrong filer/party was selected when the Application was docketed. The correct filer/party is Defendant, Karen D. Rohan-Hukill. (iva) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Wed 02/07 3:00 PM
REPLY Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case24 filed by Plaintiff Jason Scott Hukill.(Hukill, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 O
Wed 02/14 10:53 AM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting23 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (iva) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 01/18 1:32 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Karen D. Rohan-Hukill, re MOTION to Dismiss24 served on 1/16/2018. (iva) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 01/18 1:29 PM
MOTION of Defendant Karen Rohan Hukill to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction; Failure to State a Claim and Litigation Privilege filed by defendant Karen D. Rohan-Hukill. Motion set for hearing on 2/26/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5
Tue 01/16 2:29 PM
APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Jason Scott Hukill. Lodged Proposed Order. (ad) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 O
Tue 01/09 10:07 AM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting20 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (iva) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Thu 12/28 9:10 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, summons issued by Intake Clerk on 12/21/17 to White, Zuckerman, Warsavsky, Luna and Hunt LLP is invalid. Recipient is not a named defendant. (aco) |
|
Att: 1 Voided Summons | ||
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5
Wed 12/27 4:53 PM
APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Jason Scott Hukill. (iva) |
|
Att: 1 Lodged Order | ||
19 | 19
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/27 4:46 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant James T. Neavitt. (iva) |
|
18 | 18
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/27 4:46 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant Steven Donnell. (iva) |
|
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/27 4:45 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant David Blumenthal. (iva) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/27 4:44 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant Gursey Schneider. (iva) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/27 4:43 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant Jack Zuckerman. (iva) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/27 4:40 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant Chandra Moss. (iva) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/27 4:40 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant James T. Warren. (iva) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/27 4:39 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant Kenneth A. Black. (iva) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/27 4:36 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant Private Dispute Resolution. (iva) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/27 4:34 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant Karen D. Rohan-Hukill. (iva) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/27 4:33 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant Kuba Jewgieniew. (iva) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/27 4:32 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant Terry Brock. (iva) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/27 4:31 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendant Realty One. (iva) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 12/14 11:31 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Exhibit (non-trial)
Fri 12/08 11:55 AM
EXHIBITS TO COMPLAINT 1-29 Filed filed by Plaintiff Jason Scott Hukill as to Complaint - (Discovery),1 . |
|
Att: 1 Part 2 of Exhibits to Complaint (car) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2017: | ||
Att: 2 Part 3 of Exhibits to Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Part 4 of Exhibits to Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Part 5 of Exhibits to Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Part 6 of Complaint) (car) | ||
4 | 4
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 12/08 9:59 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 12/08 9:58 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 12/08 9:57 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jason Scott Hukill (car) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 12/08 9:56 AM
COMPLAINT against Defendants Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym.(Filing fee $ 400 PAID), filed by Plaintiff Jason Scott Hukill. (car) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |