Cloanto Corporation v. Hyperion Entertainment C.V.B.A.
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence E Kahn |
Referred: | Andrew T Baxter |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-01353 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 12, 2018 5:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Hyperion Entertainment C.V.B.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cloanto Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 04/12 9:07 AM
Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in United States District Court for the Western District of Washington as case 2:18-cv-00535, filed 04/11/2018. (amt) |
||
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Western District of Washington. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 4/10/18. (sfp, ) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 04/11 11:39 AM
Case has been electronically transferred to the Western District of Washington. (sfp, ) |
||
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
![]() STIPULATION (Joint) To Transfer to the Western District of Washington by Hyperion Entertainment C.V.B.A. submitted to Judge Kahn. (Evangelatos, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
![]() RESPONSE to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively, to Transfer or Stay (Statement of Non-Opposition) filed by Cloanto Corporation. (Troy, Gordon) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order
Tue 04/03 1:45 PM
TEXT ORDER: In the memorandum of law submitted in support of its motion to dismiss, Defendant requested oral argument. Dkt. No. 9-1 ("Memorandum"); see also Dkt. No. 9 ("Motion"). The request is DENIED. The Motion will be considered on the submission of the papers, only. No personal appearances are required. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on April 03, 2018. (sas) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Mon 03/19 2:32 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 conference set for 4/16/2018 and 3/19/2018 deadline for the submission of a joint Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE. The hearing and related deadlines will be reset, if deemed necessary, after disposition of the9 motion to dismiss. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 3/19/2018. (nmk) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
![]() FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hyperion Entertainment C.V.B.A.. (Satra, Bella) |
|
9 | 9
![]() MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively, to Transfer or Stay Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2018 09:30 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn Response to Motion due by 4/3/2018 Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/9/2018. filed by Hyperion Entertainment C.V.B.A.. (Satra, Bella) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Letter Request
Thu 02/15 4:11 PM
TEXT ORDER: granting7 Letter Request. The telephonic Rule 16 conference set for 3/26/2018 is RESCHEDULED to 4/16/2018 at 11:00 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to coordinate the conference call and is to contact chambers at 315-234-8600 once all participants are on the conference line. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 2/15/2018. (nmk) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Letter Motion from Gordon E. R. Troy for Cloanto Corporation requesting Request for Continuance of Initial Conference submitted to Judge Hon. Andrew T. Baxter . (Troy, Gordon) |
|
6 | 6
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cloanto Corporation. Hyperion Entertainment C.V.B.A. waiver sent on 12/14/2017, answer due 3/14/2018. (Troy, Gordon) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 3/26/2018 at 11:00 AM by telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/19/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sfp, ) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s). [Served by mail.] (sfp, ) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action regarding a Trademark. (sfp, ) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cloanto Corporation. (sfp, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Hyperion Entertainment C.V.B.A. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4225960) filed by Cloanto Corporation.(sfp, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |