Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:17-op-45073
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2017
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:17-cv-05285
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:49 PM EST
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
Represented By
Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Bartlit Beck - Chicago
contact info
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
SpecGx LLC
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Noramco Inc
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Advantage Logistics
Represented By
Francis A. Citera
Greenberg Traurig - Chicago
contact info
Gretchen N. Miller
Greenberg Traurig - Chicago
contact info
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Indivior, Inc.
Represented By
Maria R. Durant
Hogan Lovells Us - Boston
contact info
Safa W. Osmani
Hogan Lovells Us - Boston
contact info
Sara E. Silva
Hogan Lovells Us - Boston
contact info
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Plaintiff
Ramsey County, Minnesota
Represented By
Joseph F Henderson
J F Henderson Law, PLLC
contact info
Yvonne M. Flaherty
Lockridge Grindal Nauen
contact info
David W Asp
Lockridge Grindal Nauen
contact info
Richard A. Lockridge
Lockridge, Grindal, Raven & Holstein
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:23 PM EDT
Thursday, November 30, 2017
1 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc. , Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-5841987) filed by Ramsey County, Minnesota. Filer requests summons issued. (Flaherty, Yvonne) Modified on 12/1/2017 (AKL). [Transferred from mnd on 12/18/2017.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 17cv5285 PAM/FLN. (AKL) [Transferred from mnd on 12/18/2017.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Issued as to Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (AKL) [Transferred from mnd on 12/18/2017.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Noramco, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (AKL) [Transferred from mnd on 12/18/2017.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Summons Issued as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (AKL) [Transferred from mnd on 12/18/2017.]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2017
6 6 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson, Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 17-cv-5285 (SRN/KMM) . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 12/1/2017. (lmb) Modified text on 12/1/2017 (lmb). [Transferred from mnd on 12/18/2017.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2017
7 7 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1), transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio per MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Dan A. Polster. (AKL) [Transferred from mnd on 12/18/2017.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2017
8 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Minnesota. Case number 0:17-cv-05285. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]