Wixen Music Publishing, Inc. v. Spotify USA Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-09288 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 29, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 27, 2018 2:05 AM PDT |
Defendant
Spotify USA Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Spotify settles the $1.6B copyright lawsuit filed by music publisher Wixen out of court (social.techcrunch.com) |
Submitted Thu 12/20/2018 | |
2. | Spotify hit with $1.6 billion copyright lawsuit (reuters.com) |
Submitted Tue 01/02/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
![]() REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (mrgo) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
28 | 28
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 12/20 2:32 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE previously scheduled for 12/27/2018 to 1/3/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY |
|
27 | 27
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Schacht, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
![]() ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SUBMIT JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN24 by Judge George H. Wu. The scheduling conference set for October 18, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. is continued until December 27, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. The Court will not grant the parties any further continuances as to the above schedule. (lom) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
![]() JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 weeks, filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc... (Nadolenco, John) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 17, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc..(Nadolenco, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
![]() MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu re: Order,, Order Extending Answer Due Deadline,22 . This order is to clarify and amend the August 1, 2018 "Order re: Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Submit Joint Discovery Plan" (Docket No. 22). While said order provides inter alia that "the parties shall have until October 12, 2018 to submit a joint discovery plan... ; and... the Court shall issue a scheduling order on October 19, 2018, it did not specifically take the August 20, 2018 scheduling conference off-calendar. Therefore, the Court herein continues that scheduling conference to October 18, 2018 at 8:30 a.m., and counsel may appear either in person or telephonically with advanced notice to the Court Clerk. (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SUBMIT JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days)21 . Spotify USA Inc. shall have until October 19, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint; the parties shall have until October 12, 2018 to submit a joint discovery plan, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(2)-(3). (mrgo) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 19, 2018 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc..(Nadolenco, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
![]() ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting18 Non-Resident Attorney Allison L. Stillman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Spotify USA Inc, designating John Nadolenco as local counsel. (mrgo) |
|
19 | 19
![]() RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allison L. Stillman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Spotify USA Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22046808)16 by Clerk of Court. Docket No. 16 is stricken for the reason stated in the Notice17 filed on July 6, 2018. (mrgo) |
|
18 | 18
![]() APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allison L. Stillman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Spotify USA Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 7/6/2018, Receipt No. 26APN9J2) filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allison L. Stillman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Spotify USA Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22046808)16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lt) |
|
16 | 16
![]() APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allison L. Stillman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Spotify USA Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22046808) filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SUBMIT JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN14 by Judge George H. Wu. The Court set the following deadlines: (i) Spotify USA Inc. shall have until August 20, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint, (ii) the parties shall have until August 13, 2018 to submit a joint discovery plan; and (iii) the Court shall hold a scheduling conference and issue a scheduling order on August 20, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. (lom) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 20, 2018 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc..(Nadolenco, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc., identifying Spotify USA Inc.; Spotify AB; Spotify Technology S.A.; and Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) |
|
12 | 12
![]() STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Spotify USA Inc. answer now due 6/20/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc..(Attorney John Nadolenco added to party Spotify USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Nadolenco, John) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.. upon Spotify USA Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Allison Stillman. (Schacht, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wixen Music Publishing, Inc., identifying None other than Plaintiff Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.. (Wong, Jonathan) |
|
8 | 8
![]() 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendant Spotify USA Inc. (esa) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa) |
|
4 | 4
![]() REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Wixen Music Publishing, Inc..(Schacht, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.. (Schacht, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.. (Schacht, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21033857 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.. (Attorney Daniel J Schacht added to party Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.(pty:pla))(Schacht, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |