County of McLennan v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et. al.
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45075 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 15, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Texas Western, 6:17-cv-00298 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:59 PM EST |
Defendant
Morris Dickson Co.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Albertson's LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
HEB Grocery Company, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HEB Pharmacy
|
|
Defendant
Indivior, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Target Stores
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart
|
|
Defendant
Wal-mart Pharmacy
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
50 West Broad St., Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does 1-100, Inclusive
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
County of McLennan
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Terminated: 06/12/2018
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:57 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jgb) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] | ||
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jgb) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
15 | 15
![]() |
|
16 | 16
![]() |
|
17 | 17
![]() |
|
18 | 18
![]() |
|
19 | 19
![]() |
|
20 | 20
![]() |
|
21 | 21
![]() |
|
22 | 22
![]() |
|
23 | 23
![]() |
|
24 | 24
![]() |
|
25 | 25
![]() |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] | ||
Case transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] | ||
26 | 26
![]() |