City of Lafayette v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45081 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 15, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Indiana Northern, 4:17-cv-00091 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:00 PM EST |
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DIK Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
Indivior Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Lafayette
Office of the Mayor 20 North 6th Street
Lafayette, IN 47901 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:03 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
Judge Rudy Lozano and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (New Case) (sct) [Transferred from innd on 12/15/2017.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. Magistrate Judge John E Martin no longer assigned to case. (smb) [Transferred from innd on 12/15/2017.] | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10 ORDER re9 Notice of Related Action filed by City of Lafayette. Pursuant to N.D. Inc. L.R. 40-1(e), the Clerk of Court is directed to reassign the referral Magistrate Judge in this case from Magistrate Judge John E. Martin to Magistrate Judge Andrew P. Rodovich. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/30/2017. (smb) [Transferred from innd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
15 | 15
![]() |
|
16 | 16
![]() |
|
17 | 17
![]() |
|
18 | 18
![]() |
|
19 | 19
![]() |
|
20 | 20
![]() |
|
21 | 21
![]() |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
![]() |