|
|
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (daj, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
ENTERED IN ERROR (Doss, Michael). Modified on 6/12/2014 (gcy, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
CIVIL Cover Sheet (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Michael P. Doss (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
Corrected Notice of Removal by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., endo health solutions(Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Supplement Janssen Corporate Disclosure Statement,
|
| |
Att: 3
Supplement Endo Corporate Disclosure Statement
|
5
|
|
5
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Scott David Stein (Stein, Scott) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Fiona Burke. (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
NOTICE of Correction regarding notice of removal 1 . (gcy, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Michael J. Dolesh (Dolesh, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Mary Eileen Cunniff Wells (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to remand (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
8
pgs
MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in support of motion to remand10 (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
NOTICE of Motion by Fiona A Burke for presentment of motion to remand10 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 6/19/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9583127. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9583151. (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Actavis PLC, Cephalon, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc. (jp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9584620. (Harrington, Eric) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Eric Harrington (Harrington, Eric) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9584976. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Linda Jill Singer (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
27
|
|
27
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion hearing held on Defendant City of Chicago's motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447 (c), to remand this case to the state court. The motion is entered and continued to 7/2/2014 at 9:00 a.,m. for the reason stated on the record. The Pro hac vice motions of Charles Lifland and Carolyn Kubata for leave to appear on behalf of Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals13 ,14 , and that of Linda Singer and Eric Harrington for the City of Chicago15 ,17 are granted. Mailed notice (ac, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Johnson & Johnson (jp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
SUMMONS Returned Executed by City Of Chicago (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
SUMMONS Returned Executed by City Of Chicago (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. by Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald (Fitzgerald, Patrick) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/28/2016 (ph, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
22
|
|
22
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Carolyn June Kubota (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
23
|
|
23
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc. by R. Ryan Stoll (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
24
|
|
24
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Charles C. Lifland (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
25
|
|
25
MOTION by Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. for extension of time To Respond To Plaintiffs Complaint (Joint Motion)(Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Text of Proposed Order
|
26
|
|
26
NOTICE of Motion by Michael P. Doss for presentment of extension of time25 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/2/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
28
|
|
28
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: On the Court's own motion, the status hearing and motion presentment hearing set for 7/2/2014 are stricken. The parties shall await further orders from the Court. Mailed notice (ac, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
29
|
|
29
NOTICE by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc. of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Objections as to Diversity of the Purdue Defendants (Uncontested)(Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
30
|
|
30
SUMMONS Returned Executed by City Of Chicago (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
31
|
|
31
SUMMONS Returned Executed by City Of Chicago (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
32
|
|
32
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Health Solutions by Peter Vincent Baugher (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
33
|
|
33
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Health Solutions by Kristen Elizabeth Hudson (Hudson, Kristen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
34
|
|
34
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
35
|
|
35
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd. by Tinos Diamantatos (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
36
|
|
36
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
37
|
|
37
MOTION by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc. for extension of time to Respond, Answer, or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint (Uncontested) (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
38
|
|
38
NOTICE of Motion by R. Ryan Stoll for presentment of extension of time37 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/8/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
39
|
|
39
AMENDED other,4 Notice of Removal of Action by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Endo Health Solutions Inc.(Hudson, Kristen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit C,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit D,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit E,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit F,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit G
|
40
|
|
40
MOTION by Defendant Endo Health Solutions for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Uncontested) (Hudson, Kristen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
41
|
|
41
NOTICE of Motion by Kristen Elizabeth Hudson for presentment of extension of time40 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/9/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Hudson, Kristen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
42
|
|
42
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman for all further proceedings, pursuant to 28 USC Section 455(b)(4). Signed by Executive Committee on 7/2/2014. (For further details see order.) (mgh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
43
|
|
43
NOTICE of Motion by Kristen Elizabeth Hudson for presentment of extension of time40 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/9/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Hudson, Kristen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
44
|
|
44
NOTICE of Motion by R. Ryan Stoll for presentment of extension of time37 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/9/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
45
|
|
45
MOTION by Defendant Cephalon, Inc. for extension of time UNCONTESTED(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B
|
46
|
|
46
NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of extension of time45 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/9/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
47
|
|
47
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9642677. (Cooney, J.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
48
|
|
48
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant Janssen's motion25 for extension of time to 7/28/2014 to respond to the complaint is granted. Purdue defendants' motion37 for extension of time to 7/28/2014 to respond to the complaint is granted. Defendant Endo Health's motion40 for extension of time to 7/28/2014 to respond to the complaint is granted. Defendant Cephalon's motion45 for extension of time to 7/28/2014 to respond to the complaint is granted. Motion presentment date of 7/9/2014 is stricken. Mailed notice (gds) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
49
|
|
49
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file Complaint Under Seal (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
50
|
|
50
9
pgs
MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in support of motion for leave to file49 Complaint Under Seal(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit C,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit D,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit E,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit F,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit G
|
51
|
|
51
NOTICE of Motion by Linda Jill Singer for presentment of motion for leave to file49 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/10/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
57
|
|
57
ORDER: Motion47 of J. Gordon Cooney for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. (gcy, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
52
|
|
52
EXHIBIT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago Correcting Exhibit A regarding memorandum in support of motion,50 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
53
|
|
53
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9645255. Related [+] [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-] ed, Steven
|
54
|
|
54
EXHIBIT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago Correcting Exhibit G regarding memorandum in support of motion,50 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
55
|
|
55
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to withdraw motion to remand10 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
56
|
|
56
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Notice to withdraw55 is granted and the motion to remand10 is withdrawn. Telephone notice (gds) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
58
|
|
58
MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson for order Deferring Presentment of Plaintiff's Motion to File Amended Complaint Under Seal , MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & JohnsonAuthorizing Plaintiff to Disclose to Defendants Redacted Allegations Based on Information Produced by the American Pain Foundation(Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Text of Proposed Order
|
59
|
|
59
NOTICE of Motion by Michael P. Doss for presentment of motion for order, motion for miscellaneous relief,,58 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/15/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
60
|
|
60
EXHIBIT by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson regarding MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson for order Deferring Presentment of Plaintiff's Motion to File Amended Complaint Under Seal MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & JohnsonAuthorizing Plaintiff to Disclose to Defendants Redacted Allegations Based on Information Produced by the American Pain Foundation 58(Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 2
|
61
|
|
61
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion for order58 deferring presentment of motion to file amended complaint under seal is granted and the presentment date of 7/10/2014 is stricken. This Court has signed a recusal order in this case. The receiving Judge is requested to hear the motion to file under seal on 7/17/2014, pursuant to the parties' request for such a continuance. Mailed notice (gds) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
62
|
|
62
ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Parties Chicago Tribune Company, Los Angeles Times by Jeffrey Irvine Cummings(Cummings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Certificate of Service
|
63
|
|
63
ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Parties Chicago Tribune Company, Los Angeles Times by George Freeman Galland, Jr(Galland, George) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Certificate of Service
|
64
|
|
64
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo for all further proceedings. Entered by Executive Committee on 7/9/14.(gcy, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
65
|
|
65
ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor USA Today by Jeffrey Irvine Cummings (Cummings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
66
|
|
66
MOTION by Intervenor Parties Chicago Tribune Company, Los Angeles Times, USA Today to intervene -- PETITION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE BY PROPOSED INTERVENORS THE CHICAGO TRIBUNE, THE LOS ANGELES TIMES, AND USA TODAY (Cummings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
67
|
|
67
NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Irvine Cummings for presentment of motion to intervene66 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/17/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Cummings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
73
|
|
73
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Hearing on plaintiff's motion for leave to file complaint under seal49 set for 7/17/2014 at 9:30 AM. Application to appear pro hac vice of Steven A. Reed as counsel for defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. and Cephalon, Inc.53 is granted. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
68
|
|
68
ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor USA Today by George Freeman Galland, Jr (Galland, George) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
69
|
|
69
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Actavis PLC by Nicholas William Marietti (Marietti, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
70
|
|
70
MOTION by Defendant Actavis PLC for extension of time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (UNCONTESTED) (Marietti, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
71
|
|
71
NOTICE of Motion by Nicholas William Marietti for presentment of extension of time70 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/18/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Marietti, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
72
|
|
72
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to withdraw motion for leave to file49 the Complaint Under Seal , MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for order (1) Authorizing Plaintiff To Disclose To Defendants Redacted Allegations Based On Information Produced By The American Pain Foundation; and (2) Extending Defendants Time To Respond To Plaintiffs Complaint, Plaintiffs Time To Respond To Defendants Responsive Pleadings, and Defendants Time To Reply (Joint Motion)(Harrington, Eric) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice of Filing Joint Motion to Withdraw Motion to File Complaint Under Seal and Joint Motions For Order Seeking Authorization to Disclose Redacted Materials to Defendants and Extensions of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, Defendants' Response and Defendants' Reply
|
74
|
|
74
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Health Solutions by Nicholas A Gowen (Gowen, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
75
|
|
75
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file the complaint under seal49 is withdrawn. Uncontested Motion for extension of time until 7/28/2014 for defendant Actavis PLC to respond to plaintiff's complaint70 is granted. Motion to withdraw72 is granted. Joint Motion for orders authorizing plaintiff to disclose to defendants redacted allegations based on information produced by the American Pain Foundation and extending defendants' time to respond to plaintiff's complaint until 8/29/2014 and plaintiff's time to respond to defendants' responsive pleading until 10/13/2014 and defendants' time to reply until 11/3/201472 is granted. Hearing on the motion to intervene set for 7/17/2014 to stand. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
76
|
|
76
Copy of Complaint with all Redactions Removed Except Those Redactions that Pertain to Allegations Based on Information Provided by the American Pain Foundation by City Of Chicago (Harrington, Eric) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
82
|
|
82
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion hearing held on 7/17/2014 regarding motion to intervene66 and continued to 7/24/2014 at 9:30 AM. Petition for leave to intervene by proposed intervenors The Chicago Tribune, The Los Angeles Times and USA Today66 is entered and continued. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
77
|
|
77
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9691680. (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
78
|
|
78
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9691784. (Persio, Joanna) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
79
|
|
79
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9692673. (Ku, Melissa) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
80
|
|
80
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9693752. Related [+] [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-] ade, Steven
|
| |
Att: 1
Appendix Attachment A
|
81
|
|
81
NOTICE by City Of Chicago of Filing Fully Unredacted Complaint(Harrington, Eric) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Supplement Fully Unredacted Complaint
|
83
|
|
83
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion hearing held on 7/24/2014 regarding motion to intervene66 . Counsel for the proposed intervenors to advise the Court in writing if the petition will be withdrawn by 8/1/2014. Application to appear pro hac vice of Joshua M. Davis77 , Joanna G. Persio78 , Melissa A. Ku79 and Steven G. Reade80 as counsel for defendant Endo Health Solutions are granted. Ruling as to defendants' motion to dismiss before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/9/2014 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
84
|
|
84
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY WITHDRAWAL OF PETITION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE BY PROPOSED INTERVENORS THE CHICAGO TRIBUNE, THE LOS ANGELES TIMES, AND USA TODAY by Chicago Tribune Company, Los Angeles Times, USA Today (Cummings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
85
|
|
85
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9774457. (Drori, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
86
|
|
86
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9774510. (Koski, Katy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
87
|
|
87
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9774536. (Potter, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
88
|
|
88
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9774555. (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
89
|
|
89
ACTAVIS PLC'S RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND LOCAL RULE 3.2 NOTIFICATION OF AFFILIATES by Actavis PLC (Marietti, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
90
|
|
90
MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson for protective order (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
91
|
|
91
15
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of motion for protective order90 (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
92
|
|
92
DECLARATION of Michael P. Doss regarding motion for protective order90 (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3
|
93
|
|
93
EXHIBIT by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson regarding declaration92 (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
94
|
|
94
DECLARATION of Carolyn J. Kubota regarding motion for protective order90 (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
95
|
|
95
NOTICE of Motion by Michael P. Doss for presentment of motion for protective order90 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/21/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
96
|
|
96
MOTION by Defendant Cephalon, Inc. for protective order Defendant Cephalon, Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
97
|
|
97
NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion for protective order96 , motion for protective order90 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/21/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
98
|
|
98
MOTION by Defendant Cephalon, Inc. for leave to file excess pages Uncontested Motion for Extension of Page Limit (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
99
|
|
99
NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages98 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/25/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
100
|
|
100
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Proposed Intervenors' Motion to intervene66 is withdrawn. Application to appear pro hac vice of Jason L. Droi85 , Katy E. Koski86 , William G. Potter87 and James W. Matthews88 as counsel for defendant Actavis plc are granted. Defendants' Motions for protective order90 ,96 are taken under advisement. Responses due by 9/4/2014. Defendants' replies due by 9/11/2014. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/24/2014 at 9:30 AM. Various Defendants' Uncontested Motion for leave to file excess pages98 is granted. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
101
|
|
101
MOTION by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc. to disqualify counsel for Plaintiff, Linda Singer and Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
102
|
|
102
17
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc. in support of motion to disqualify counsel101 for Plaintiff, Linda Singer and Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
103
|
|
103
APPENDIX memorandum in support of motion102 to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Linda Singer and Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC(Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit C,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit D,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit E,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit F,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit G,
|
| |
Att: 8
Exhibit H,
|
| |
Att: 9
Exhibit I,
|
| |
Att: 10
Exhibit J,
|
| |
Att: 11
Exhibit K,
|
| |
Att: 12
Exhibit L,
|
| |
Att: 13
Exhibit M,
|
| |
Att: 14
Exhibit N,
|
| |
Att: 15
Exhibit O,
|
| |
Att: 16
Exhibit P,
|
| |
Att: 17
Exhibit Q,
|
| |
Att: 18
Exhibit R
|
104
|
|
104
NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald for presentment of motion to disqualify counsel101 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/22/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
105
|
|
105
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendants' Motion to disqualify counsel101 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff to respond by 9/8/2014. Defendants' to reply by 9/15/2014. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/3/2014 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
106
|
|
106
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to appear as additional counsel (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
107
|
|
107
NOTICE of Motion by Mary Eileen Cunniff Wells for presentment of motion for leave to appear106 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/22/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
108
|
|
108
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Linda Singer, Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC by Jeffrey D. Colman (Colman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
109
|
|
109
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, Linda Singer by Jason Michael Bradford (Bradford, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
110
|
|
110
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, Linda Singer by Michael Anthony Scodro (Scodro, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
111
|
|
111
MOTION by Defendant Actavis PLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and for failure to state a claim (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
112
|
|
112
17
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Actavis PLC in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction111 (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit Affidavit of Sheldon V. Hirt
|
113
|
|
113
NOTICE of Motion by James W Matthews for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction111 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/4/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
114
|
|
114
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION by Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Cephalon, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Motion To Dismiss All Claims Against Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(2), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b) (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
115
|
|
115
18
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction,,114 Memorandum of Law in Support of The Motion To Dismiss All Claims Against Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(2), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b)(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit C
|
116
|
|
116
NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction,,114 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/4/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
117
|
|
117
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND UNDER THE PRIMARY JURISDICTION DOCTRINE (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
118
|
|
118
14
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Endo Health Solutions in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim117 and Under the Primary Jurisdiction Doctrine(Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
119
|
|
119
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under the Primary Jurisdiction Doctrine and Under Rule 12 (b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.] (Entered: 08/29/2014)
Related: [-]
|
120
|
|
120
30+
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction,,119 (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
121
|
|
121
NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction,,119 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/4/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
122
|
|
122
DECLARATION of Carolyn J. Kubota regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction,,119 (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 4,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit 5,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit 6,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit 7,
|
| |
Att: 8
Exhibit 8
|
123
|
|
123
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.] (Entered: 08/29/2014)
Related: [-]
|
124
|
|
124
20
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim123 (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
125
|
|
125
NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim123 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/4/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
126
|
|
126
DECLARATION of Charles C. Lifland regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim123 (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 4,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit 5,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit 6,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit 7,
|
| |
Att: 8
Exhibit 8,
|
| |
Att: 9
Exhibit 9,
|
| |
Att: 10
Exhibit 10,
|
| |
Att: 11
Exhibit 11,
|
| |
Att: 12
Exhibit 12,
|
| |
Att: 13
Exhibit 13,
|
| |
Att: 14
Exhibit 14,
|
| |
Att: 15
Exhibit 15,
|
| |
Att: 16
Exhibit 16,
|
| |
Att: 17
Exhibit 17,
|
| |
Att: 18
Exhibit 18,
|
| |
Att: 19
Exhibit 19,
|
| |
Att: 20
Exhibit 20,
|
| |
Att: 21
Exhibit 21,
|
| |
Att: 22
Exhibit 22,
|
| |
Att: 23
Exhibit 23,
|
| |
Att: 24
Exhibit 24,
|
| |
Att: 25
Exhibit 25,
|
| |
Att: 26
Exhibit 26,
|
| |
Att: 27
Exhibit 27,
|
| |
Att: 28
Exhibit 28,
|
| |
Att: 29
Exhibit 29,
|
| |
Att: 30
Exhibit 30
|
127
|
|
127
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for leave to appear of Jeffery D. Colman, Michael A. Scodro and Jason M. Bradford of the law firm of Jenner & Block LLP as additional counsel for City of Chicago and in conjunction of Purdue's disqualification motion106 is granted. Various defendants Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction111 ,114 ,117 ,119 and123 are taken under advisement. The briefing schedule previously set calling for plaintiff to respond by 10/13/2014 and defendants replies due by 11/3/2014. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/9/2014 at 9:30 AM. All motion noticed for 9/4/2014 are stricken as unnecessary. No appearances are required on 9/4/2014 and 9/22/2014. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
128
|
|
128
NOTICE by Actavis PLC re memorandum in support of motion112 Original Signature Exhibit A(Marietti, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Affidavit (Original Signature)
|
129
|
|
129
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago, Respondents Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, Linda Singer for leave to file excess pages /Agreed (Colman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
130
|
|
130
NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey D. Colman for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages129 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/8/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Colman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
131
|
|
131
RESPONSE by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to motion for protective order90 , motion for protective order96 , memorandum in support of motion91 (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 4
|
132
|
|
132
MOTION by Intervenor USA Today to intervene -- PROPOSED INTERVENOR USA TODAY'S RENEWED PETITION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE(Cummings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit C,
|
| |
Att: 4
Certificate of Service
|
133
|
|
133
NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Irvine Cummings for presentment of motion to intervene132 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/22/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Cummings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
134
|
|
134
MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff City Of Chicago to withdraw as attorney Eric A. Harrington (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
135
|
|
135
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Agreed Motion for leave to file a brief in excess fifteen pages129 is granted. Motion to withdraw of Eric A. Harrington as attorney for plaintiff134 is granted. Attorney Eric Harrington terminated. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
136
|
|
136
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Michael Anthony Scodro (Scodro, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
137
|
|
137
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Jeffrey D. Colman (Colman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
138
|
|
138
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Jason Michael Bradford (Bradford, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
139
|
|
139
RESPONSE by City Of Chicago, Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, Linda Singerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc. to disqualify counsel for Plaintiff, Linda Singer and Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC 101 (Colman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Appendix of Exhibits,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 3,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit 4,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit 5,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit 6,
|
| |
Att: 8
Exhibit 7,
|
| |
Att: 9
Exhibit 8,
|
| |
Att: 10
Exhibit 9,
|
| |
Att: 11
Exhibit 10,
|
| |
Att: 12
Exhibit 11,
|
| |
Att: 13
Exhibit 12,
|
| |
Att: 14
Exhibit 13,
|
| |
Att: 15
Exhibit 14,
|
| |
Att: 16
Exhibit 15,
|
| |
Att: 17
Exhibit 16,
|
| |
Att: 18
Exhibit 17,
|
| |
Att: 19
Exhibit 18,
|
| |
Att: 20
Exhibit 19,
|
| |
Att: 21
Exhibit 20
|
140
|
|
140
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9851313. (Glickman, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
141
|
|
141
REPLY by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson to motion for protective order90 (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3
|
142
|
|
142
CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson regarding reply141 (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
143
|
|
143
REPLY by Cephalon, Inc. to Response,131 , MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson for protective order 90 , reply141 , MOTION by Defendant Cephalon, Inc. for protective order Defendant Cephalon, Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order 96 , memorandum in support of motion91 Defendant Cephalon, Inc.'s Reply Memorandum To The City of Chicago's Response To Cephalon, Inc.'s Motion For A Protective Order(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
144
|
|
144
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Joshua Dubin Glickman (Glickman, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
145
|
|
145
REPLY by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc. to motion to disqualify counsel101 (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
146
|
|
146
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
147
|
|
147
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Proposed Intervenor USA Today's Renewed Petition for leave to intervene132 is taken under advisement. Ruling on Defendants' motions for a protective order [90 and 96] and USA Today's petition to intervene132 will be by mail. No appearance is required on 9/22/2014 or 9/24/2014. Application to appear pro hac vice of Joshua Glickman as counsel for plaintiff City of Chicago140 is granted. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
148
|
|
148
MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Relief From Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power To A Financially-Interested Private Party (Joint Motion for Relief from Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power to a Financially-Interested Private Party) (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
149
|
|
149
17
pgs
MEMORANDUM motion for miscellaneous relief,148 by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Relief from Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power To A Financially-Interested Private Party) (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
150
|
|
150
NOTICE of Motion by Carolyn June Kubota for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief,148 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/25/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
151
|
|
151
DECLARATION of Scott D. Stein regarding motion for miscellaneous relief,148 in support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Relief from Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power To A Financially-Interested Private Party)(Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 4,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit 5,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit 6,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit 7
|
152
|
|
152
DECLARATION of Joshua M. Davis regarding motion for miscellaneous relief,148 in support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Relief from Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power To A Financially-Interested Private Party)(Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3
|
153
|
|
153
DECLARATION of Tinos Diamantatos regarding motion for miscellaneous relief,148 in support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Relief from Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power To A Financially-Interested Private Party)(Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 4
|
154
|
|
154
DECLARATION of Patrick Fitzgerald regarding motion for miscellaneous relief,148 in support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Relief from Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power To A Financially-Interested Private Party)(Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 4
|
155
|
|
155
NOTICE of Motion by Mary Eileen Cunniff Wells for presentment of extension of time146 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/25/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
156
|
|
156
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiff's Uncontested Motion for extension of time146 is granted. Plaintiff to file its First Amended Complaint by 10/20/2014. Defendants to file their responsive pleadings by 12/4/2014. Plaintiff to respond to defendants' responsive pleadings by 1/5/2015. Defendant to reply by 1/26/2015. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo reset to 3/13/2015 at 9:30 a.m. Defendants' Joint Motion for relief from improper delegation of governmental police power to a financially-interested private party148 is taken under advisement. No appearance is required on 9/25/2014. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
157
|
|
157
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The ruling on the Purdue Defendants' motion to disqualify counsel (Dkt. No. 101) will be by mail. No appearance is required on 10/3/2014.Mailed notice (mad, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
158
|
|
158
ORDER: Defendants Johnson & Johnsons and Janssen Pharmaceutrical, Inc.s Motion for a protective order90 and Defendant Cephalon, Inc.s Motion for a protective order96 are denied as moot. Defendants Joint Motion for relief from improper delegation of governmental police power to a financially-interested private party148 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff to respond by 10/31/2014. Defendants to reply by 11/14/2014. Ruling set for 12/12/2-14 at 9:30 a.m. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/10/2014. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
159
|
|
159
Enter MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/10/2014. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
160
|
|
160
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The Order dated 10/10/2014 is amended as follows: Defendants Johnson & Johnsons and Janssen Pharmaceutrical, Inc.s Motion for a protective order90 and Defendant Cephalon, Inc.s Motion for a protective order96 are denied. Proposed Intervenor USA Today's Renewed Petition for leave to intervene132 is denied as moot. The remainder of the Order to stand. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
161
|
|
161
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file The Unredacted First Amended Complaint Under Seal (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
162
|
|
162
NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for leave to file161 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/20/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
163
|
|
163
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion hearing held on 10/20/2014 regarding motion for leave to file161 . Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file the unredacted first amended complaint under seal161 is temporarily granted. The first amended complaint will remain under seal until 11/3/2014. Defendants to file any objections to by 10/29/2014. Ruling by mail. Plaintiff given until 11/7/2014 to respond to defendants' joint motion for relief from improper delegation of governmental police power to a financially-interested private party. Defendants to reply by 11/21/2014. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo reset to 12/19/2014 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
164
|
|
164
First AMENDED complaint by City Of Chicago against All Defendants(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
165
|
|
165
SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago Sealed First Amended Complaint(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
166
|
|
166
CERTIFICATE of Service for First Amended Complaint by Linda Singer on behalf of City Of Chicago regarding amended complaint 164 , sealed document 165 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
167
|
|
167
SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago First Amended Complaint Related [+](Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-] vised Redactions
|
168
|
|
168
First AMENDED complaint by City Of Chicago against City Of Chicago Related [+](Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-] vised Redactions
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit List,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A through C
|
169
|
|
169
CERTIFICATE of Service for First Amended Complaint Related [+] by Linda Singer on behalf of City Of Chicago regarding amended complaint168 , sealed document 167 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-] vised Redactions
|
170
|
|
170
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The order entered in this case following the hearing on 10/20/14 is clarified to state, as I stated on the record, that defendants are given until 10/29/14 to file any objections to lifting the seal on the unredacted amended complaint. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
171
|
|
171
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file a Fully Unredacted First Amended Complaint Under Seal(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
172
|
|
172
NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for leave to file171 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/31/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
173
|
|
173
CERTIFICATE of Service by Linda Singer on behalf of City Of Chicago regarding MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file a Fully Unredacted First Amended Complaint Under Seal 171 , notice of motion172 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
174
|
|
174
OBJECTIONS by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson to text entry,170 , order on motion for leave to file, terminate hearings, motion hearing, terminate motion and R&R deadlines/hearings, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,,,,,,,,,163 , MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file The Unredacted First Amended Complaint Under Seal 161 /Jannsen Defendants' Objections to the Unsealing of Jannsen's Confidential Information Appearing in Paragraphs 279 and 280 of the First Amended Complaint(Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1
|
175
|
|
175
OBJECTIONS DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC.S OBJECTIONS TO LIFTING THE SEAL ON THE UNREDACTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
176
|
|
176
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion hearing held on 10/31/2014 regarding motion for leave to file. Mailed notice (jdh) Modified on 11/3/2014 (ef, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
177
|
|
177
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. waiver sent on 10/30/2014, answer due 12/29/2014. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
178
|
|
178
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 10/30/2014, answer due 12/29/2014. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
179
|
|
179
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Charles C. Lifland (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
180
|
|
180
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Carolyn June Kubota (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
181
|
|
181
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 11/4/2014, answer due 1/5/2015. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
182
|
|
182
ORDER: Defendants objections to unredacting the Citys first amended complaint are granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs motion for leave to file a fully unredacted first amended complaint under seal171 is granted. Plaintiff is to publicly file an amended complaint containing only the redactions approved in the order by 11/10/2014. Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/6/2014. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
183
|
|
183
Enter ORDER Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/6/2014. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
184
|
|
184
RESPONSE by City Of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Relief From Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power To A Financially-Interested Private Party (Joint Motion for Relief from Improper Delegation of Governmental Police 148 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.] (Entered: 11/07/2014)
Related: [-]
|
185
|
|
185
SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago First Amended Complaint (Fully Unredacted Per Nov. 6, 2014 Order)(Singer, Linda) Modified on 11/10/2014 (mjc, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
186
|
|
186
First AMENDED complaint by City Of Chicago against All Defendants Related [+](Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-] dactions Per Nov. 6, 2014 Order
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit List,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A through C
|
187
|
|
187
CERTIFICATE of Service by Linda Singer on behalf of City Of Chicago regarding sealed document 185 , amended complaint186 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
188
|
|
188
MOTION by Defendant Cephalon, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to amended complaint186 Joint Motion for Extension of Time and Page Limit , MOTION by Defendant Cephalon, Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
189
|
|
189
NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
190
|
|
190
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. by Tinos Diamantatos (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
191
|
|
191
NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for leave to file excess pages, motion for relief,,,188 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/24/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
192
|
|
192
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. by Steven A. Reed Related [+] [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-] ed, Steven
|
193
|
|
193
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. by J. Gordon Cooney, Jr (Cooney, J.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
194
|
|
194
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notification of Affiliates (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
195
|
|
195
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Joint Motion for extension of time until 12/19/2014 to file responsive pleading and page limit188 is granted. Plaintiff to respond to defendants' responsive pleadings by 1/26/2015. Defendants to reply by 2/17/2015. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
196
|
|
196
REPLY by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson to MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Relief From Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power To A Financially-Interested Private Party (Joint Motion for Relief from Improper Delegation of Governmental Police 148 (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.] (Entered: 11/21/2014)
Related: [-]
|
197
|
|
197
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
198
|
|
198
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
199
|
|
199
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
200
|
|
200
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 11/17/2014, answer due 1/16/2015. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
201
|
|
201
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
202
|
|
202
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Actavis, Inc. waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
203
|
|
203
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendants' Motion to disqualify counsel101 is denied. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
204
|
|
204
Enter MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/15/2014. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
205
|
|
205
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Ruling on Defendants' Joint Motion for relief from improper delegation of governmental police power to a financially-interested private party148 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 2/2/2015 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
206
|
|
206
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Joshua M. Davis (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
207
|
|
207
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Joanna G Persio (Persio, Joanna) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
208
|
|
208
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Melissa A Ku (Ku, Melissa) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
209
|
|
209
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Kristen Elizabeth Hudson (Hudson, Kristen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
210
|
|
210
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
211
|
|
211
Defendant Endo Health Solutions Inc.'s Amended Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3.2 Notification of Affiliates. (Davis, Joshua) Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office on 12/23/2014 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
212
|
|
212
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Steven G. Reade Related [+] [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-] ade, Steven
|
213
|
|
213
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Peter Vincent Baugher (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
214
|
|
214
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by James W Matthews (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
215
|
|
215
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Katy E Koski (Koski, Katy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
216
|
|
216
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Jason L Drori (Drori, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
217
|
|
217
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by William G. Potter (Potter, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
218
|
|
218
MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Matthews, James) (Duplicate filing of Entry No. 220 - Modified by Clerk's Office on 12/22/2014)(sxw). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
219
|
|
219
21
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss218 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
220
|
|
220
MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint "Corrected" (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
221
|
|
221
21
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss220 " Corrrected "(Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit First Declaration of Sheldon V. Hirt in Support of Actavis Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit Second Declaration of Sheldon V. Hirt in Support of Actavis Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint
|
222
|
|
222
NOTICE of Motion by James W Matthews for presentment of motion to dismiss220 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/29/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
223
|
|
223
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement And Local Rule 3.2 Notification of Affiliates by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
224
|
|
224
MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to dismiss all claims against Defendants pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b). (Diamantatos, Tinos) Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office on 12/23/2014 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
225
|
|
225
25
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss all claims against Defendants pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b).(Diamantatos, Tinos) Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office on 12/23/2014 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit C
|
226
|
|
226
DEFENDANTS ENDO Health Soluktions Inc.'s and ENDO Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s MOTION to Dismiss. (Davis, Joshua) Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office on 12/23/2014 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
227
|
|
227
14
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim226 and Under the Primary Jurisdiction Doctrine (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
228
|
|
228
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. / Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Under the Primary Jurisdiction Doctrine and Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
229
|
|
229
30+
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,228 / / Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss(Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Index of Appendices,
|
| |
Att: 2
Appendix 1,
|
| |
Att: 3
Appendix 2,
|
| |
Att: 4
Appendix 3
|
230
|
|
230
DECLARATION of Carolyn J. Kubota regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,228 / Declaration of Carolyn J. Kubota in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss(Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 4,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit 5,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit 6,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit 7,
|
| |
Att: 8
Exhibit 8,
|
| |
Att: 9
Exhibit 9,
|
| |
Att: 10
Exhibit 10,
|
| |
Att: 11
Exhibit 11,
|
| |
Att: 12
Exhibit 12,
|
| |
Att: 13
Exhibit 13,
|
| |
Att: 14
Exhibit 14,
|
| |
Att: 15
Exhibit 15,
|
| |
Att: 16
Exhibit 16,
|
| |
Att: 17
Exhibit 17,
|
| |
Att: 18
Exhibit 18,
|
| |
Att: 19
Exhibit 19,
|
| |
Att: 20
Exhibit 20,
|
| |
Att: 21
Exhibit 21
|
231
|
|
231
NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,228 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/29/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
232
|
|
232
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
233
|
|
233
22
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,232 / Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
234
|
|
234
DECLARATION of Charles C. Lifland regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,232 / Declaration of Charles C. Lifland in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss(Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 4,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit 5,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit 6,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit 7,
|
| |
Att: 8
Exhibit 8,
|
| |
Att: 9
Exhibit 9,
|
| |
Att: 10
Exhibit 10,
|
| |
Att: 11
Exhibit 11,
|
| |
Att: 12
Exhibit 12,
|
| |
Att: 13
Exhibit 13,
|
| |
Att: 14
Exhibit 14,
|
| |
Att: 15
Exhibit 15,
|
| |
Att: 16
Exhibit 16,
|
| |
Att: 17
Exhibit 17,
|
| |
Att: 18
Exhibit 18,
|
| |
Att: 19
Exhibit 19,
|
| |
Att: 20
Exhibit 20,
|
| |
Att: 21
Exhibit 21
|
235
|
|
235
NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,232 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/29/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
236
|
|
236
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss220 ,224 ,226 ,228 and232 are taken under advisement. Plaintiff to respond by 1/26/2015. Defendants to reply by 2/17/2015. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 3/20/2015 at 9:30 AM. The previously filed Motions58 ,111 ,114 ,117 ,119 and123 are terminated as moot. No appearance is required on 12/29/2014. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
237
|
|
237
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time to file response/reply (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
238
|
|
238
NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply237 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/16/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
239
|
|
239
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiff's Agreed Motion for extension of time to file response237 is granted. Plaintiff to respond to defendants' motions to dismiss 220, 224, 226, 228 and 232 by 2/9/2015. Defendants to reply by 3/3/2015. Ruling by mail. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
240
|
|
240
ORDER OF THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE: It appearing that, pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on December 19, 2014, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Jorge Luis Alonso; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 306 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Jorge Luis Alonso. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order shall become effective on January 16, 2015. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/16/15.(gcy, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
241
|
|
241
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: This case has been reassigned to the calendar of Judge Jorge L. Alonso. Unless otherwise ordered by the court, all previously-set discovery and briefing schedules and deadlines remain intact. All previously-set status dates and motion hearing dates are stricken. A reassignment status conference is set for 2/20/15 at 1:00 p.m. before Judge Alonso in Courtroom 1700. The parties are directed not to file or notice any motions, with the exception of emergency motions, prior to appearing at the reassignment status conference. For all emergency motions arising prior to the date scheduled for the reassignment status conference, the parties are directed to contact chambers. To help the court learn about the case, it is hereby ordered that within 10 calendar days of this order's entry, counsel shall confer, prepare, and file a joint status report, not to exceed five pages. If the defendant's counsel has not yet filed an appearance, the plaintiff's counsel should prepare the status report. The report shall provide the information listed in the court's "Initial Status Report for Reassigned Case," a link to which is provided on Judge Alonso's web site. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
242
|
|
242
MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff City Of Chicago, Respondents Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, Linda Singer to withdraw as attorney (Agreed) (Colman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
243
|
|
243
NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey D. Colman for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney242 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/20/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Colman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
244
|
|
244
Amended NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey D. Colman for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney242 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/20/2015 at 01:00 PM. (Colman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
245
|
|
245
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' agreed motion for leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants242 is granted. Attorneys Jeffrey D. Colman, Michael A. Scodro, and Jason M Bradford are given leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants City of Chicago, Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, and Linda Singer. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
246
|
|
246
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file excess pages UNOPPOSED(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice of Filing Notice of Filing UNOPPOSED Motion for Page Limit Extension
|
247
|
|
247
UNOPPOSED NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages246 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/10/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
248
|
|
248
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for page limit extension246 is granted. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
249
|
|
249
STATUS Report for Reassigned Case (Joint) by City Of Chicago (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
250
|
|
250
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file Under Seal (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
251
|
|
251
NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for leave to file250 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/20/2015 at 01:00 PM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
252
|
|
252
30+
pgs
MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in Opposition to motion to dismiss220 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,228 , motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction,, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,224 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim226 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,232 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
253
|
|
253
SEALED RESPONSE by City Of Chicago to MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint "Corrected" 220 , MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion To Dismiss All Claims Against Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(2), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b) 224 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
254
|
|
254
17
pgs
MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in Opposition to motion to dismiss220 , motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction,, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,224 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Declaration Michael Dolesh,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 3,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit 4,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit 5,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit 6,
|
| |
Att: 8
Exhibit 7,
|
| |
Att: 9
Exhibit 8,
|
| |
Att: 10
Exhibit 9,
|
| |
Att: 11
Exhibit 10,
|
| |
Att: 12
Exhibit 11,
|
| |
Att: 13
Exhibit 12
|
255
|
|
255
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 3/19/15 at 9:30 a.m. Parties' pending motions148 ,220 ,224 ,226 ,228 , and232 are taken under advisement. The court will rule electronically. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file250 is granted. Plaintiff's oral motion for leave to file a motion to strike is denied. Parties are directed to meet and confer to discuss a discovery schedule and shall report on that schedule at the next status hearing. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
256
|
|
256
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10385361. (Juzaitis, Anthony) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
257
|
|
257
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's application to appear pro hac vice256 is granted. Attorney Anthony Raymond Juzaitis is given leave to appear as counsel for Plaintiff City Of Chicago. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
258
|
|
258
10
pgs
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The Court denies defendants' joint motion for relief from improper delegation of police power148 . Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/2/2015. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
259
|
|
259
REPLY by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to motion to dismiss220 (Drori, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
260
|
|
260
REPLY by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim226 (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
261
|
|
261
REPLY by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion To Dismiss All Claims Against Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(2), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b) 224 , memorandum in support of motion,225 (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit C
|
262
|
|
262
REPLY by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,228 /Reply in Support of Defendants Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint Under the Primary Jurisdiction Doctrine and Under Rule 12(B)(6) for Failure to State a Claim (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
263
|
|
263
REPLY by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,232 /Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.s Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
264
|
|
264
Proposed Discovery Plan by City Of Chicago(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Appendix A - Priority Request List,
|
| |
Att: 2
Appendix B - Plaintiff's Proposed Confidentiality Order (Compare),
|
| |
Att: 3
Appendix C - Plaintiff's Proposed Confidentiality Order (Clean)
|
265
|
|
265
Proposed Discovery Plan by Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Drori, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit Proposed Agreed Confidentiality Order,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit Proposed Agreed Confidentiality Order (Redline Comparison)
|
266
|
|
266
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing previously set for 3/19/15 is stricken. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert for discovery supervision. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
267
|
|
267
Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision. (ntf, ) Notice mailed by judge's staff [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
268
|
|
268
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10456888. (Cingel, Ivana) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
269
|
|
269
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' application to appear pro hac vice268 is granted. Attorney Ivana Cingel is given leave to appear as counsel for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
270
|
|
270
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision. However, due to a conflict with a Defendant in this case, Magistrate Judge Gilbert hereby recuses himself from presiding over discovery supervision in this matter. This case will be referred to the Executive Committee for reassignment of a new magistrate judge by lot. Recusal Order to follow. Judge Gilbert no longer referred to this case. Mailed notice (ber, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
271
|
|
271
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER:Case referred to the Honorable Young B. Kim. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/25/15.(gcy, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
272
|
|
272
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: According to the parties' joint status report filed on February 6, 2015, the pending motions to dismiss the first amended complaint are dispositive in nature. The court will monitor the docket and issue a follow-up order when appropriate. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
273
|
|
273
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for order directing parties to continue discussions related to discovery (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
274
|
|
274
NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for order273 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 4/2/2015 at 11:00 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
275
|
|
275
9
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in Opposition to motion for order273 Defendants' Joint Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For An Order Directing The Parties To Continue Discussions Related To Discovery(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
276
|
|
276
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, Plaintiff's motion for an order directing the parties to continue discussions related to discovery273 is denied. Despite the title of the motion, the city is seeking to have limited discovery move forward while the motions to dismiss are pending. The parties are not in agreement on the scope of this limited discovery. The court finds that the better and more efficient approach to discovery is to wait for the assigned District Judge's rulings on the pending motions to dismiss so that the parties can identify the surviving claims, if any, and define the scope of discovery permissible under Rule 26. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
277
|
|
277
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file Supplement to its Opposition to Defendants Joint Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, Instanter (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
278
|
|
278
EXHIBIT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago regarding MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file Supplement to its Opposition to Defendants Joint Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, Instanter 277 (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
279
|
|
279
NOTICE of Motion by Fiona A Burke for presentment of motion for leave to file277 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 4/14/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
280
|
|
280
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file Supplement to its Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, Instanter277 is granted. Motion hearing date of 4/14/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
281
|
|
281
MOTION by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. for leave to file Joint Response to Plaintiff's Supplement to its Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, Instanter(Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
282
|
|
282
Joint NOTICE of Motion by R. Ryan Stoll for presentment of motion for leave to file,281 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 4/14/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
283
|
|
283
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendatns' motion for leave to file Joint Response to Plaintiff's Supplement to its Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, Instanter281 is granted. The court will entertain no further briefing. Motion hearing date of 4/14/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
284
|
|
284
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Kenneth A. Wexler (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
285
|
|
285
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Bethany R. Turke (Turke, Bethany) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
286
|
|
286
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Justin Nicholas Boley (Boley, Justin) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
287
|
|
287
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Adam Michael Prom (Prom, Adam) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
288
|
|
288
34
pgs
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The Court: (1) grants the Cephalon entities' motion to dismiss224 and terminates Teva Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. as a party to this case; and (2) grants the Actavis entities' motion to dismiss220 , the Endo entities' motion to dismiss226 , and the Janssen entities' motion to dismiss232 ; and (3) grants in part and denies in part defendants' joint motion to dismiss228 , which is denied as to the claims asserted in Counts One and Two against the Purdue entities but otherwise granted. The City has thirty days from the date of this Memorandum Opinion and Order to amend the dismissed claims, if it can do so and comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11. If the City fails to do so, the Court will dismiss those claims with prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/8/2015. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
289
|
|
289
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for discovery Motion to Lift Discovery Stay (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
290
|
|
290
NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth A. Wexler for presentment of motion for discovery289 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 5/15/2015 at 11:00 AM. (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
291
|
|
291
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to lift discovery stay289 is entered and continued. For the reasons stated in open court, the court is inclined to grant the motion if Purdue Defendants' motion for reconsideration, to be filed soon, is denied. The court will issue a follow-up order when appropriate. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
292
|
|
292
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/20/15 before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, Nancy_LaBella@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2015. (Labella, Nancy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
293
|
|
293
MOTION by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. for extension of time to File a Responsive Pleading to the First Amended Complaint in Light of Plaintiff's Intention to File a Second Amended Complaint and the Purdue Defendants' Intention to Timely File a Limited Motion for Reconsideration (Unopposed) (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
294
|
|
294
Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by R. Ryan Stoll for presentment of extension of time,293 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/26/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
295
|
|
295
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.'s unopposed motion to file a responsive pleading to the first amended complaint in light of plaintiff's intention to file a second amended complaint and the Purdue Defendants' intention to timely file a limited motion for reconsideration293 is granted. Motion hearing date of 5/26/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
296
|
|
296
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time to amend (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
297
|
|
297
NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for extension of time to amend296 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/27/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
298
|
|
298
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time to amend Corrected Dkt. 296 Unopposed Motion (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
299
|
|
299
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to amend its complaint298 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to amend296 is moot. Motion hearing date of 5/27/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
300
|
|
300
MOTION by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. for reconsideration regarding order on motion to dismiss, order on motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,, memorandum opinion and order, add and terminate parties,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,288 (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Index of Exhibits,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit C,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit D
|
301
|
|
301
NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald for presentment of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,300 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 6/2/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
302
|
|
302
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' motion for reconsideration300 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 6/17/15. Defendants' reply in support shall be filed by 7/1/15. The court will rule electronically. Motion hearing date of 6/2/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
303
|
|
303
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10750970. (Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
304
|
|
304
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant City of Chicago's application to appear pro hac vice303 is granted. Attorney Brian E. Bowcut is given leave to appear as counsel for City Of Chicago. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
305
|
|
305
NOTICE by Peter Vincent Baugher of Change of Address Change of Firm Name (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
306
|
|
306
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to clarify Court's May 8, 2015 Order and for Discovery (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
307
|
|
307
PLAINTIFF'S Combined Memorandum in Opposition to the Purdue Defendants' Motion for reconsideration and in support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Clarification and Discovery. (Singer, Linda) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 6/18/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3
|
308
|
|
308
NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion to clarify306 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/7/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
309
|
|
309
NOTICE by Nicholas A Gowen of Change of Address Change of Firm Name (Gowen, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
310
|
|
310
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to clarify306 is taken under advisement. Defendants' response shall be filed by 7/2/15. Plaintiff's reply in support shall be filed by 7/16/15. The court will rule electronically. Motion hearing date of 7/7/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
311
|
|
311
MOTION by Defendant Endo Health Solutions to withdraw Appearance of Counsel (Gowen, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
312
|
|
312
NOTICE of Motion by Nicholas A Gowen for presentment of motion to withdraw311 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/7/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Gowen, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
313
|
|
313
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant Endo Health Solutions' motion to withdraw appearance of counsel311 is granted. Attorney Kristen Elizabeth Hudson is given leave to withdraw as counsel for DefendantEndo Health Solutions. Motion hearing date of 7/7/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
314
|
|
314
REPLY by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. to memorandum,307 , motion for reconsideration, motion for relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,300 (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
315
|
|
315
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on May 15, 2015, before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2015. (Lacien, Laura) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
316
|
|
316
16
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for clarification and discovery306 . (Matthews, James) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 7/7/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
317
|
|
317
REPLY by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to motion to clarify306 Court's May 8, 2015 Order and for Discovery (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
318
|
|
318
4
pgs
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The Court denies Purdue's motion for reconsideration300 and the City's motion for clarification306 . Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/27/2015. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
319
|
|
319
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: A status hearing is scheduled for August 10, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 1019. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
320
|
|
320
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held and continued to September 15, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 1019. Parties are ordered to file their discovery plan, either jointly or separately, by September 11, 2015. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
321
|
|
321
STIPULATION Agreement that the Purdue Defendants Need Not File a Responsive Pleading to the First Amended Complaint in Light of Plaintiff's Intent to File a Second Amended Complaint (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
322
|
|
322
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Thomas P. McNulty (McNulty, Thomas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
323
|
|
323
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Jonathan William Garlough (Garlough, Jonathan) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
324
|
|
324
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Anthony Raymond Juzaitis (Juzaitis, Anthony) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
325
|
|
325
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file the Unredacted Second Amended Complaint Under Seal (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
326
|
|
326
NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for leave to file325 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/1/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
327
|
|
327
SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago Sealed Second Amended Complaint(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
328
|
|
328
Second AMENDED complaint by City Of Chicago against Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., DEPOMED, INC., ALLERGAN PLC(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibits A.1 to A.7, B.1 to B.2 Placeholders
|
329
|
|
329
CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff City Of Chicago regarding sealed document 327 , amended complaint,,328 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
330
|
|
330
NOTICE by City Of Chicago re sealed document 327 , amended complaint,,328 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
331
|
|
331
SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago Sealed Second Amended Complaint (Corrected Version)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
332
|
|
332
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to file the unredacted second amended complaint under seal325 is granted. Motion hearing date of 9/1/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
333
|
|
333
NOTICE by James W Matthews of Change of Address (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
334
|
|
334
NOTICE by Jason L Drori of Change of Address (Drori, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
335
|
|
335
NOTICE by Katy E Koski of Change of Address (Koski, Katy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant DEPOMED, INC. (jp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
336
|
|
336
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: At the parties' request, the deadline for filing their discovery plan is extended from September 11 to September 18, 2015. The status hearing is rescheduled from September 15 to September 22, 2015, at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 1019. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
337
|
|
337
SUMMONS Returned Executed by City Of Chicago as to DEPOMED, INC. on 9/4/2015, answer due 9/25/2015. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
338
|
|
338
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for order Extending the Sealing of Certain Documents(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B
|
339
|
|
339
NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for order338 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/22/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
340
|
|
340
MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to seal document sealed document 327 , sealed document 331 Agreed Motion To Extend The Seal on The City of Chicago's Unredacted Second Amended Complaint (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
341
|
|
341
NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion to seal document, motion for relief,,,,340 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/22/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
342
|
|
342
NOTICE by Peter Vincent Baugher of Change of Address for Joanna G. Persio of Arnold and Porter LLP (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
343
|
|
343
NOTICE by Peter Vincent Baugher of Change of Address for Joshua M. Davis of Arnold & Porter LLP (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
344
|
|
344
NOTICE by Peter Vincent Baugher of Change of Address for Melissa A. Ku of Arnold & Porter LLP (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
345
|
|
345
NOTICE by Peter Vincent Baugher of Change of Address for Steven G. Reade of Arnold & Porter LLP (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
346
|
|
346
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion for an order extending the sealing of certain documents338 is moot. Plaintiff's agreed motion to extend the seal on the plaintiff's unredacted second amended complaint340 is granted. Motion hearing date of 9/22/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
347
|
|
347
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A (Purdue's Proposed Confidentiality Order,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B (Redline Showing Suggested Modifications),
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit C (City's Proposed Confidentiality Order,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit D (Redline Showing City's Suggested Modifications))(Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.] (Entered: 09/18/2015
|
348
|
|
348
MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc, Cephalon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Actavis PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., ALLERGAN PLC for extension of time (Agreed) for Filing of Responsive Pleading by the Defendants to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Fitzgerald, Patrick) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks' Office on 9/22/2015; Added correct defendants) (sxn, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
349
|
|
349
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held and continued to October 1, 2015, at 1:00 p.m. in courtroom 1019. Parties are to email a draft agreed confidentiality order in Word to this court (proposed_order_kim@ilnd.uscourts.gov) by September 25, 2015. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
350
|
|
350
(Agreed) NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald for presentment of extension of time,348 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/29/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
351
|
|
351
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso:Agreed motion for extension of time348 for Filing of Responsive Pleading by the Defendants to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is granted. November 20, 2015 will be the Responsive filing by the Defendants. January 19, 2016 will be the date for Opposition to responsive filing filed by the City. February 18, 2016 will be the date to Reply in support of responsive filing, if any, filed by the Defendants. Motion hearing set for 9/29/2015 on this motion is hereby stricken. Mailed notice (tsa, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
352
|
|
352
MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.Additional Time To Move To Extend The Seal As To Portions Of The Second Amended Complaint Unopposed Emergency Motion (Garlough, Jonathan) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks' Office on 9/23/2015) (mr, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
353
|
|
353
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso:Unopposed motion352 for additional time to move to extend the seal as to portions of the second amended complaint is granted. Mailed notice (tsa, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
354
|
|
354
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for order Extending the Sealing of Certain Documents (Unopposed)(Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Redacted Exhibits A1 to A7,
|
| |
Att: 2
Redacted Exhibits B1 to B2
|
355
|
|
355
NOTICE of Motion by Brian E. Bowcut for presentment of motion for order354 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/29/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
356
|
|
356
MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to seal Motion to Maintain Seal on Select Paragraphs of the City of Chicago's Unredacted Second Amended Complaint(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B
|
357
|
|
357
NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion to seal,356 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/7/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
358
|
|
358
MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. for leave to file Motion for Leave to File An Exhibit Under Seal (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
359
|
|
359
NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion for leave to file358 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/7/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
360
|
|
360
EXHIBIT by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Exhibit C to Document 356 (REDACTED) regarding MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to seal Motion to Maintain Seal on Select Paragraphs of the City of Chicago's Unredacted Second Amended Complaint 356 , MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. for leave to file Motion for Leave to File An Exhibit Under Seal 358 (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
361
|
|
361
MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to withdraw Appearance of William G. Potter (Potter, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
362
|
|
362
NOTICE of Motion by William G. Potter for presentment of motion to withdraw361 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/30/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Potter, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
363
|
|
363
MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to withdraw Appearance of Nicholas W. Marietti (Marietti, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
364
|
|
364
NOTICE of Motion by Nicholas William Marietti for presentment of motion to withdraw363 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/30/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Marietti, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
365
|
|
365
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso:Motions to withdraw361 ,363 as counsel are granted. William G. Potter and Nicholas William Marietti are given leave to withdraw their appearances. Motion hearings set for 9/30/2015 on these motions are hereby stricken. Mailed notice (tsa, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
366
|
|
366
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso:Motion for leave to file358 an exhibit under seal is granted. MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to maintain seal356 on Select Paragraphs of the City of Chicago's Unredacted Second Amended Complaint is entered and briefed as follows: Responses due by 10/14/2015. Replies due by 10/28/2015. The Court will rule electronically. Motion hearings set for 10/7/2015 on these motions are hereby stricken.Mailed notice (tsa, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
367
|
|
367
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso:Motion for order354 Extending the Sealing of Certain Documents is granted. Motion hearing set for 9/29/2015 on this motion is hereby stricken. Mailed notice (tsa, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
368
|
|
368
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11122847.(Hawk, Robert) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Supplement
|
369
|
|
369
ATTORNEY Appearance Form by David J. Stetler. (Stetler, David) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's office on 9/28/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
370
|
|
370
ATTORNEY Appearance Form filed by Mariah E. Moran. (Moran, Mariah) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 9/28/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
371
|
|
371
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11123075. (Mitchell, Christopher) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
372
|
|
372
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11123124. (Welch, Samuel) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
373
|
|
373
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DEPOMED, INC. by Mariah E Moran (Moran, Mariah) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
374
|
|
374
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DEPOMED, INC. by David J. Stetler (Stetler, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
375
|
|
375
MOTION by Defendant DEPOMED, INC. for extension of time to file answer Agreed (Moran, Mariah) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
376
|
|
376
NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer375 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/30/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Moran, Mariah) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
377
|
|
377
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 4-2-15 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/27/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (Warren, Pamela) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
378
|
|
378
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DEPOMED, INC. by Michael J. Shepard (Shepard, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
379
|
|
379
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant DEPOMED, INC's applications to appear pro hac vice368 ,371 , and372 are granted. Attorneys Robert B. Hawk, Christopher Mitchell, Samuel R. Welch are given leave to appear as counsel for Defendant DEPOMED, INC. Defendant DEPOMED, INC's agreed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's second amended complaint375 is granted. Motion hearing date of 9/30/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
380
|
|
380
AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY Order Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 9/28/2015. (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
381
|
|
381
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for protective order (Agreed Motion for Entry of a HIPAA Protective Order)(Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
382
|
|
382
NOTICE of Motion by Brian E. Bowcut for presentment of motion for protective order381 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/6/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
383
|
|
383
MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson to seal /to Maintain Under Seal Janssen's Confidential Information Appearing in the Second Amended Complaint(Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Declaration of Jennifer Cardelus,
|
| |
Att: 2
Declaration of Ronald Kuntz
|
384
|
|
384
NOTICE of Motion by Carolyn June Kubota for presentment of motion to seal,383 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/6/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
385
|
|
385
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Parties' agreed motion for entry of an agreed HIPAA protective order381 is granted. Enter Agreed Qualified Protective Order for Protected Health Information. Appearance is not necessary to present this motion. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
386
|
|
386
AGREED QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE Order For Protected Health Information Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 9/29/2015. (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
387
|
|
387
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson's motion to maintain under seal Janssen's confidential information appearing in the second amended complaint383 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 10/14/15. Defendants' reply in support shall be filed by 10/28/15. The Court will rule electronically. Motion hearing date of 10/6/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
388
|
|
388
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: The city's motion to lift the discovery stay289 is denied. In its motion, the city seeks to move forward with all discovery against Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P. and Purdue Pharma Inc. (together, "Purdue") because the assigned District Judge has ruled that the city is entitled to pursue a portion of its claims against Purdue. Specifically, on May 8, 2015, the assigned District Judge partially denied Purdue's motion to dismiss, ruling that only counts one and two out of the eleven-count complaint can proceed against it. (R. 288 at 34.) In August 2015 the city filed a second amended complaint reasserting many of the claims the District Judge dismissed. (R. 328.) At a status hearing on September 22, 2015, Purdue argued for the discovery stay to remain in place because it plans to move to dismiss the second amended complaint. Purdue argues that discovery should not begin until there is certainty as to the issues to be litigated in this case. The city countered at the status hearing that discovery should move forward because the core consumer fraud allegations against Purdue remain the same. The court agrees with Purdue's position on this point. While the city is correct in its representation that this case boils down to whether Purdue (and other pharma companies) engaged in fraud and deception when promoting and marketing its opiods, the contours of the allegations now pending against Purdue are immensely broader than the contours of the allegations that survived Purdue's first motion to dismiss. The only claims of fraud and deceptive practice that survived the first motion to dismiss were based on the allegation that Purdue misrepresented its products when promoting them through "their own websites." (R. 288 at 29.) The claims against Purdue in the second amended complaint, however, are much more robust and include many of the same counts and allegations dismissed from the first amended complaint. The court finds that if the second amended complaint remains in-tact after the anticipated motions to dismiss, the scope of discovery will be much more expansive than the scope of discovery this court would permit based only on the claims that survived the first motion to dismiss. The court weighed the possibility of permitting the parties to engage in discovery to address only the website allegations while waiting for a ruling on the anticipated motions to dismiss, but the issues pertaining to the websites constitute only a sliver of the claims against Purdue set forth in the second amended complaint. Starting any discovery now, before the District Judge has a chance to rule on the anticipated motions to dismiss the second amended complaint, would not promote efficiency in managing discovery in this case. Also, there is no suggestion that discovery pertaining to the websites allegedly controlled by Purdue would be destroyed or lost if discovery did not commence immediately. Although there can be some benefit from collecting necessary discovery during the motion to dismiss phase, here any such benefit does not outweigh the complication and added burden that necessarily would be imposed on the court and Purdue (and potentially the other pharma companies) from having three or more separate discovery tracks. For these reasons, the most prudent approach is to wait to see what claims and allegations survive the second round of motions to dismiss. The discovery stay remains. The status hearing scheduled for October 1, 2015, is cancelled. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
389
|
|
389
RESPONSE by City Of Chicago to MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson to seal /to Maintain Under Seal Janssen's Confidential Information Appearing in the Second Amended Complaint 383 , MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to seal Motion to Maintain Seal on Select Paragraphs of the City of Chicago's Unredacted Second Amended Complaint 356 Related [+] (Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-] flecting an Agreement by the Parties
|
390
|
|
390
MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., DEPOMED, INC., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Agreed) (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
391
|
|
391
AGREED NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages,,390 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/27/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
392
|
|
392
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' agreed motion for expansion of page limits for briefing in response to plaintiff's second amended complaint390 is granted. Motion hearing date of 10/27/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
393
|
|
393
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/22/2015 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: ALEXANDRA ROTH, alexandra_roth@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312) 408-5038. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2016. (Roth, Alexandra) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
394
|
|
394
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Pursuant to the parties' agreement, the Court grants the Janssen defendants, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., and Cephalon, Inc.'s motions to maintain certain information in the second amended complaint under seal356 and383 . Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
395
|
|
395
Second AMENDED complaint by City Of Chicago against ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., DEPOMED, INC., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (with Redactions Per November 2, 2015 Order)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Certificate of Service
|
396
|
|
396
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by City Of Chicago Without Prejudice Dismissing Defendant Depomed, Inc. (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
397
|
|
397
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Pursuant to parties' notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice396 , Defendant DEPOMED,INC. is dismissed as a Defendant in this case. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
398
|
|
398
MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Agreed) (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
399
|
|
399
Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages,398 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/19/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
400
|
|
400
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' agreed motion for modification of page limits for briefing in response to Plaintiff's second amended complaint398 is granted. Motion hearing date of 11/19/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
401
|
|
401
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 8(a), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b) (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
402
|
|
402
30+
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim401 Memorandum of Law In Support of the Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Defendants Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B
|
403
|
|
403
NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim401 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/1/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
404
|
|
404
MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
405
|
|
405
30+
pgs
MEMORANDUM by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss404 Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint(Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Declaration First,
|
| |
Att: 2
Declaration Second,
|
| |
Att: 3
Text of Proposed Order
|
406
|
|
406
NOTICE of Motion by James W Matthews for presentment of motion to dismiss404 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/1/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
407
|
|
407
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
408
|
|
408
28
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim407 (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
409
|
|
409
DECLARATION of Melissa A. Ku in support of Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc.'s and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint under Rule 12(b)(6) for failure to State a Claim by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Davis, Joshua) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/24/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit
|
410
|
|
410
NOTICE of Motion by Joshua M. Davis for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim407 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/1/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
411
|
|
411
MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6). (Fitzgerald, Patrick) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/24/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
412
|
|
412
28
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Under 12(b)(6)411 . (Fitzgerald, Patrick) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/24/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
413
|
|
413
DECLARATION of Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim411 (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 4,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit 5,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit 6,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit 7,
|
| |
Att: 8
Exhibit 8,
|
| |
Att: 9
Exhibit 9,
|
| |
Att: 10
Exhibit 10,
|
| |
Att: 11
Exhibit 11,
|
| |
Att: 12
Exhibit 12,
|
| |
Att: 13
Exhibit 13,
|
| |
Att: 14
Exhibit 14,
|
| |
Att: 15
Exhibit 15
|
414
|
|
414
NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim411 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/1/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
415
|
|
415
MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Purdue Pharma L.P., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., ALLERGAN PLC, Purdue Pharma Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to dismiss or Stay Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Under the Primary Jurisdiction Doctrine and the Court's Inherent Authority to Stay Proceedings (Joint) (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
416
|
|
416
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
417
|
|
417
19
pgs
MEMORANDUM by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of defendants' joint motion to dismiss or stay Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint under the primary jurisdiction doctrine and the court's inherent authority to stay proceedings415 .(Stoll, R.) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/24/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Index of Appendices,
|
| |
Att: 2
Appendix 1,
|
| |
Att: 3
Appendix 2
|
418
|
|
418
29
pgs
MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of of Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint under Rule 12(b)(6) for failure to state a claim416 . (Lifland, Charles) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/24/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
419
|
|
419
DECLARATION of R. Ryan Stoll regarding motion to dismiss,,415 (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 4,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit 5,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit 6,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit 7,
|
| |
Att: 8
Exhibit 8
|
420
|
|
420
Joint NOTICE of Motion by R. Ryan Stoll for presentment of motion to dismiss,,415 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/1/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
421
|
|
421
DECLARATION of Charles C. Lifland regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim416 (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 4,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit 5,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit 6,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit 7,
|
| |
Att: 8
Exhibit 8,
|
| |
Att: 9
Exhibit 9,
|
| |
Att: 10
Exhibit 10,
|
| |
Att: 11
Exhibit 11,
|
| |
Att: 12
Exhibit 12,
|
| |
Att: 13
Exhibit 13,
|
| |
Att: 14
Exhibit 14,
|
| |
Att: 15
Exhibit 15,
|
| |
Att: 16
Exhibit 16,
|
| |
Att: 17
Exhibit 17,
|
| |
Att: 18
Exhibit 18,
|
| |
Att: 19
Exhibit 19,
|
| |
Att: 20
Exhibit 20,
|
| |
Att: 21
Exhibit 21,
|
| |
Att: 22
Exhibit 22,
|
| |
Att: 23
Exhibit 23,
|
| |
Att: 24
Exhibit 24,
|
| |
Att: 25
Exhibit 25,
|
| |
Att: 26
Exhibit 26,
|
| |
Att: 27
Exhibit 27
|
422
|
|
422
NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim416 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/1/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
423
|
|
423
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
424
|
|
424
30+
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim423 / Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
425
|
|
425
Joint NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim423 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/1/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
426
|
|
426
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' motions to dismiss401 ,404 ,407 ,411 ,415 ,416 , and423 are taken under under advisement. Plaintiff's responses shall be filed by 12/23/15. Defendants' replies in support shall be filed by 1/20/16. The court will rule electronically and set further dates in the ruling. Motion hearing date of 12/1/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
427
|
|
427
Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth A. Wexler for presentment of before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/2/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
428
|
|
428
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time for the Filing of Plaintiff City of Chicago's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Wexler, Kenneth) Modified on 11/30/2015 (ntf, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
429
|
|
429
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's agreed motion for extension of time428 is granted. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motions to dismiss are extended to 2/18/16. Defendants' replies in support are extended to 3/21/16. The court will rule electronically and set further dates in the ruling. Motion hearing date of 12/2/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
430
|
|
430
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file Opposition to Defendants' Joint and Individual Motions to Dismiss Under Seal (Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
431
|
|
431
NOTICE of Motion by Brian E. Bowcut for presentment of motion for leave to file430 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/24/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
432
|
|
432
SEALED RESPONSE by City Of Chicago to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 411 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 423 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 416 , MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 404 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 8(a), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b) 401 , MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Purdue Pharma L.P., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., ALLERGAN PLC, Purdue Pharma Inc, John415 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 407 (Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
433
|
|
433
30+
pgs
MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim411 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim423 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim416 , motion to dismiss,,415 , motion to dismiss404 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim401 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim407 (Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Declaration of Fiona A. Burke,
|
| |
Att: 2
Appendix
|
434
|
|
434
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file its memorandum of law in opposition under seal430 is granted. Plaintiff shall file a redacted version of its memorandum on the docket of this case. Motion hearing date of 2/24/16 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
435
|
|
435
NOTICE by George Freeman Galland, Jr of Change of Address (Galland, George) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
436
|
|
436
NOTICE by Jeffrey Irvine Cummings of Change of Address (Cummings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
437
|
|
437
MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for extension of time , MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for leave to file excess pages UNCONTESTED IN PART MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE (AGREED) AND PAGE LIMITS (NOT AGREED) FOR BRIEFING IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
438
|
|
438
NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of extension of time, motion for leave to file excess pages,,,,,,,,,,437 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/17/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
439
|
|
439
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' uncontested in part motion for modification of briefing schedule(agreed) and page limits (not agreed) for briefing in reply to Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss second amended complaint437 is granted. Defendants' reply memoranda in support of joint and individual motions to dismiss are extended to 4/15/16. Defendants' reply memoranda in support of their joint and individual motions to dismiss will not exceed 85 pages total. Motion hearing date of 3/17/16 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
440
|
|
440
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel, Nicholas A. Gowen by Endo Health Solutions (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
441
|
|
441
REPLY by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim411 (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
442
|
|
442
DECLARATION of Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald regarding reply441 (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 16
|
443
|
|
443
REPLY by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to motion to dismiss,,415 (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
444
|
|
444
DECLARATION of R. Ryan Stoll regarding reply,,443 (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 9,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 10,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 11
|
445
|
|
445
REPLY by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim407 (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
446
|
|
446
REPLY by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. In Support of Actavis Defendants' Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Drori, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
447
|
|
447
REPLY by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim416 (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
448
|
|
448
REPLY by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim423 (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
449
|
|
449
REPLY by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 8(a), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b) 401 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Defendants Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 8(a), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b) (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
450
|
|
450
MOTION by Attorney Ivana J. Cingel to withdraw as attorney for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. No party information provided (Cingel, Ivana) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
451
|
|
451
NOTICE of Motion by Ivana Cingel for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney450 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/10/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Cingel, Ivana) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
452
|
|
452
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Janssen Defendants' motion to withdraw appearance of counsel450 is granted. Attorney Ivana Cingel is given leave to withdraw as counsel for the Janssen Defendants. Motion hearing date of 5/10/16 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
453
|
|
453
MOTION by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. for protective order Amended, Agreed(Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Index of Exhibits,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit C
|
454
|
|
454
Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald for presentment of motion for protective order,453 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 5/12/2016 at 11:00 AM. (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
455
|
|
455
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Defendants' motion for the entry of an amended agreed confidentiality order453 is granted. Appearance on May 12, 2016, is not required to present this motion. Enter Amended Agreed Confidentiality Order. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
456
|
|
456
AMENDED AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 5/6/2016. (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
457
|
|
457
Notice of Supplemental Authority by City Of Chicago(Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit Supreme Court Opinion
|
458
|
|
458
WITHDRAWING Melissa Ku (counsel of record from Honigman Miller and Anrold & Porter will continue to represent defendant) as counsel for Defendant Endo Health Solutions and substituting Peter Vincent Baugher as counsel of record (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
459
|
|
459
MOTION by Attorney Mary Eileen Cunniff Wells to withdraw as attorney for City Of Chicago. No party information provided (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
460
|
|
460
NOTICE of Motion by Mary Eileen Cunniff Wells for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney459 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/19/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
461
|
|
461
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to withdraw appearance of counsel459 is granted. Attorney Mary Eileen Cunniff Wells is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Motion hearing date of 7/19/16 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
462
|
|
462
Notice of Supplemental Authority by City Of Chicago(Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit Appellate Court Opinion
|
463
|
|
463
MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for leave to file Defendants' Joint Motion for Leave to File Joint Response to Plaintiff's Notices of Supplemental Authority(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiff's Notices of Supplemental Authority
|
464
|
|
464
NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion for leave to file,,463 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/2/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
465
|
|
465
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' motion for leave to file their joint response to Plaintiff's notices of supplemental authority463 is granted. Motion hearing date of 8/2/16 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
466
|
|
466
RESPONSE by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to other457 , other462 Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiff's Notices of Supplemental Authority (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
467
|
|
467
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file a Reply to Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiff's Notices of Supplemental Authority(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1
|
468
|
|
468
NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for leave to file467 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/11/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
469
|
|
469
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a reply to defendants' joint response to plaintiff's notices of supplemental authority467 is granted. The motion hearing date of 8/11/16 is stricken. No further motions of supplemental authority regarding the pending motions to dismiss will be considered by the Court. Mailed notice (np, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
470
|
|
470
REPLY by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to Response,,466 Reply to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Notices of Supplemental Authority (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
471
|
|
471
41
pgs
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Defendants' motion to dismiss or stay415 is denied. Defendants' motions to dismiss401 ,404 ,407 ,411 ,416 ,423 are granted in part and denied in part. Counts II and IV through X are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is given a final opportunity, until October 31, 2016, to replead those counts as directed herein. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/29/2016. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
472
|
|
472
MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for extension of time Motion for Extension of Time (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
473
|
|
473
NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of extension of time,,472 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/13/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
474
|
|
474
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso:Defendants' motion for extension of time472 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 12/15/16. The motion hearing date of 10/13/16 is stricken. Mailed notice (lxs, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
475
|
|
475
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to seal document The City of Chicago's Motion to File the Unredacted Third Amended Complaint Under Seal (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
476
|
|
476
NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth A. Wexler for presentment of motion to seal document475 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/1/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
477
|
|
477
SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago Third Amended Complaint(Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
478
|
|
478
AMENDED Third Complaint(Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit A3,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit A4,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit A5,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit A6,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit A7,
|
| |
Att: 8
Exhibit B1,
|
| |
Att: 9
Exhibit B2
|
479
|
|
479
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to Modify the Order Dated October 11, 2016 (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
480
|
|
480
NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth A. Wexler for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief479 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/1/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
481
|
|
481
RESPONSE by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to Modify the Order Dated October 11, 2016 479 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO CITY OF CHICAGO'S MOTION TO MODIFY ORDER DATED OCTOBER 11, 2016 (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
482
|
|
482
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to file the unredacted third amended complaint under seal475 is granted. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
483
|
|
483
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to modify order dated October 11, 2016479 is granted. Defendants shall answer Counts I and III of the third amended complaint by 12/15/16. Any motions to dismiss in lieu of answers on the remaining counts shall filed by 12/15/16. The Court will not consider substantive arguments made on issues already decided in its prior order471 . If motions to dismiss are filed, Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 1/12/17 and Defendants' replies in support shall be filed by 2/2/17. The court will rule electronically and set further dates in the ruling. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
484
|
|
484
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: A status hearing is scheduled for December 19, 2016, at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 1019 to discuss discovery. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
485
|
|
485
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. by Gretchen Maria Wolf (Wolf, Gretchen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
486
|
|
486
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting(Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B
|
487
|
|
487
AMENDED AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY Order Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 12/8/2016. (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
488
|
|
488
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12664096. (Esteban, Rodriguez) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
489
|
|
489
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' application to appear pro hac vice488 is granted. Attorney Esteban Rodriguez is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
490
|
|
490
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12668027. (Roberts, Dave) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
491
|
|
491
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses Related [+] by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.(Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-] garding Third Amended Complaint Dkt.478
|
492
|
|
492
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / Dismiss Counts II and IV-X of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(B)(6) (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
493
|
|
493
14
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim492 (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Appendix 1
|
494
|
|
494
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
495
|
|
495
DECLARATION of R. Ryan Stoll regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim492 (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2
|
496
|
|
496
9
pgs
MEMORANDUM by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim494 (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
497
|
|
497
NOTICE of Motion by James W Matthews for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim494 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
498
|
|
498
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Third Amended Complaint by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc.(Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
499
|
|
499
NOTICE of Motion by R. Ryan Stoll for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim492 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
500
|
|
500
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses Related [+] by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-] garding Third Amended Complaint, Dkt 478
|
501
|
|
501
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
502
|
|
502
12
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim501 (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
503
|
|
503
NOTICE of Motion by Joshua M. Davis for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim501 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
504
|
|
504
MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to seal [FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL] (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
505
|
|
505
NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion to seal504 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
506
|
|
506
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts 4 to 10 of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
507
|
|
507
NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,506 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
508
|
|
508
MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to dismiss Counts II and IV-X of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
509
|
|
509
18
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,506 (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Declaration of Charles C. Lifland,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 2
|
510
|
|
510
15
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss508 (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Appendix,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A [FILED UNDER SEAL]
|
511
|
|
511
NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion to dismiss508 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
512
|
|
512
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. regarding memorandum in support of motion510 (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
513
|
|
513
MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to dismiss / Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Counts 2 and 4-10 of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(f) (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
514
|
|
514
Joint NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of motion to dismiss,513 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
515
|
|
515
ANSWER to Complaint [ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT] by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
516
|
|
516
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. [ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT] regarding answer to complaint515 (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
517
|
|
517
28
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss,513 (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Declaration of Charles C. Lifland,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 1
|
518
|
|
518
ANSWER to Complaint / Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint 478 by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
519
|
|
519
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' application to appear pro hac vice490 is granted. Attorney David K. Roberts is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. Defendants' motions to dismiss492 ,494 ,501 ,506 ,508 , and513 are taken under advisement. Briefing schedule previously set in this court's order of 11/1/16483 . The court will rule electronically and set further dates in the ruling. Defendants' motion for leave to file under seal504 is granted. Motion hearing date of 12/21/16 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
520
|
|
520
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held. Parties are directed to adhere to the following written discovery schedule: (1) exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by January 16, 2017; (2) serve interrogatories and requests for production of documents as noted herein by January 30, 2017; (3) meet and confer on ESI protocol by no later than February 17, 2017; (4) serve responses to interrogatories and requests to produce by March 24, 2017; (4) meet and confer by April 7, 2017, in order to resolve any written discovery issues; and (5) file a joint status report identifying the written discovery issues that remain in dispute by April 14, 2017. As for Rule 33 interrogatories, the City is ordered to serve no more than 20 interrogatories on each Defendant Family (Janssen, Endo, Purdue, Teva, and Actavis) and each Defendant Family is ordered to serve no more than 20 interrogatories on the City. As for Rule 34 requests for production of documents, the City is ordered to serve no more than 50 requests on each Defendant Family and each Defendant Family is ordered to serve no more than 50 requests on the City. Also, the City will be granted 525 hours of party depositions and Defendants will be granted 350 hours of party depositions. A follow-up status hearing is scheduled for February 27, 2017, at 3:00 p.m. (C.S.T.) by phone to discuss written and ESI discovery. The conference call number is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
521
|
|
521
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for the Filing of Plaintiff City of Chicago's Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
522
|
|
522
Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth A. Wexler for presentment of extension of time521 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/22/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
523
|
|
523
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's agreed motion for extension of time and for leave to file a joint brief in response to defendants' motions521 is granted to 1/27/17. Defendants' replies shall be filed by 2/17/17. Motion hearing date of 12/22/16 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
524
|
|
524
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Dave Roberts (Roberts, Dave) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
525
|
|
525
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Rodriguez Esteban (Esteban, Rodriguez) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
526
|
|
526
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/19/16 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kathleen_Fennell@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017. (Fennell, Kathleen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
527
|
|
527
30+
pgs
MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in Opposition to motion to dismiss,513 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim494 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,506 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim501 , motion to dismiss508 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim492 (Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
528
|
|
528
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/1/16 before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, NLaBella.ilnd@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2017. (Labella, Nancy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
529
|
|
529
MOTION by Attorney Joshua D. Glickman and Anthony R. Juzaitis to withdraw as attorney for City Of Chicago. No party information provided (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
530
|
|
530
NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney529 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/7/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
531
|
|
531
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to withdraw appearance of counsel529 is granted. Attorneys Joshua Dubin Glickman and Anthony Raymond Juzaitis are given leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Motion hearing date of 2/7/17 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
532
|
|
532
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Parties are to file a joint status report on written discovery by February 22, 2017. Parties are to also report on the issues they wish to discuss at the February 27, 2017 status hearing. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
533
|
|
533
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
534
|
|
534
REPLY by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Actavis Defendants' Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
535
|
|
535
REPLY by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim501 (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
536
|
|
536
REPLY by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim492 /Dismiss Counts II and IV-X of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(B)(6) (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
537
|
|
537
REPLY by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to motion to dismiss508 Reply Memorandum In Support Of The Motion To Dismiss Counts II And IV-X Against Defendants Cephalon, Inc. And Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
538
|
|
538
REPLY by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to memorandum in support of motion,509 / Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Counts 4 to 10 of Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
539
|
|
539
REPLY by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to memorandum in support of motion,517 / Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Counts 2 and 4 to 10 of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(f) (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
540
|
|
540
NOTICE by Linda Jill Singer of Change of Address (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
541
|
|
541
STATUS Report of the Parties in Response to Dkt. No. 532 by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
542
|
|
542
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held by phone and on the record. Plaintiff is ordered to submit the parties' Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by close of business tomorrow. Parties are reminded that they are to serve their written discovery responses by March 24, 2017. A status hearing is scheduled for April 24, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 1019. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
543
|
|
543
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Parties in this case are ordered to amend and supplement their Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by March 17, 2017. Enter Order. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
544
|
|
544
ORDER Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 3/3/2017. (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
545
|
|
545
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $50, receipt number 0752-13032263. (Nelson, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/4/2017 (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office)(pk, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
546
|
|
546
PAYMENT by City Of Chicago of Pro Hac Fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13032284. (Nelson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
547
|
|
547
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's application to appear pro hac vice545 is granted. Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Plaintiff. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
548
|
|
548
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13037542. (, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
549
|
|
549
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's application to appear pro hac vice548 is granted. Attorney Elizabeth Smith is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Plaintiff. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
550
|
|
550
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13046452. (Hoff, Robert) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
551
|
|
551
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' application to appear pro hac vice550 is granted. Attorney Robert S Hoff is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., and The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
552
|
|
552
STATUS Report JOINT STATUS REPORT by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B
|
553
|
|
553
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: At the parties' request, the April 24, 2017 status hearing is rescheduled for May 8, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 1019. Parties are ordered to file any supplements, jointly or separately, to the April 14, 2017 joint status report by May 3, 2017, identifying their outstanding discovery disputes, if any. Also, at the request of the parties, they are permitted to serve requests for production and interrogatories up to the numerical limitations specified in the December 19, 2016 order through and including May 3, 2017. Parties may seek leave of court to serve supplemental discovery requests at a later time for good cause. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
554
|
|
554
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Thomas Arthur Doyle (Doyle, Thomas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
555
|
|
555
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by David Barry Goroff (Goroff, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
556
|
|
556
STIPULATION Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information (Nelson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
557
|
|
557
STATUS Report (Defendants' Joint Supplemental) by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.(Wolf, Gretchen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Appendix A
|
558
|
|
558
STATUS Report Discovery Issues by City Of Chicago (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
559
|
|
559
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13139563. (Stern, Jonathan) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
560
|
|
560
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Endo Health Solutions and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s application to appear pro hac vice559 is granted. Attorney Jonathan L. Stern is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
561
|
|
561
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: The court treats the parties' stipulation order, (R. 556), as a joint request to have a stipulated order regarding discovery of ESI entered and grants the same. Enter Stipulated Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
562
|
|
562
STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 5/5/2017. (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
563
|
|
563
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Jonathan L. Stern (Stern, Jonathan) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
564
|
|
564
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held. Parties have until June 7, 2017, to meet and confer to resolve their written discovery issues. A follow-up status hearing is scheduled for June 16, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. by phone to discuss whether any written discovery issues remain unresolved. If so, the court will issue a briefing schedule for cross-motions to compel. The conference call number is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
565
|
|
565
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/27/17 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, NLaBella.ilnd@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2017. (Labella, Nancy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
566
|
|
566
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/8/17 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, NLaBella.ilnd@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2017. (Labella, Nancy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
567
|
|
567
MOTION by Attorney Peter V. Baugher to withdraw as attorney for Endo Health Solutions. No party information provided (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
568
|
|
568
NOTICE of Motion by Peter Vincent Baugher for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney567 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 6/7/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
569
|
|
569
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant Endo Health Solutions's motion to withdraw as attorney567 is granted. Attorney Peter Vincent Baugher is given leave to withdrawn as counsel for Defendant. Motion hearing date of 6/7/17 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
570
|
|
570
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13236917. (Morris, Sean) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
571
|
|
571
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' Endo Health Solutions and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s application to appear pro hac vice570 is granted. Attorney Sean O. Morris is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
572
|
|
572
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Sean O. Morris (Morris, Sean) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
573
|
|
573
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Today's status hearing is cancelled. The court adopts the parties' agreed briefing schedule for motions to compel written discovery as follows: (1) motions to compel are due by July 12, 2017; (2) responses to the motions are due by July 26, 2017; and (3) replies thereto are due by July 31, 2017. A hearing on the motions will take place on August 21, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 1019, if the court does not rule on the motions electronically before then. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
574
|
|
574
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13286827. (Francisco, Ana) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
575
|
|
575
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' application to appear pro hac vice574 is granted. Attorney Ana M. Francisco is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
576
|
|
576
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Ana M. Francisco (Francisco, Ana) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
577
|
|
577
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to withdraw the appearance of Michael J. Dolesh as one of its counsel (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
578
|
|
578
NOTICE of Motion by Fiona A Burke for presentment of motion to withdraw577 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/11/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
579
|
|
579
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to withdraw the appearance of Michael J. Dolesh as one of its counsel577 is granted. Attorney Michael J. Dolesh is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Motion hearing date of 7/11/17 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
580
|
|
580
MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to withdraw appearance of Melissa Ku (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
581
|
|
581
NOTICE of Motion by Joshua M. Davis for presentment of motion to withdraw580 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/13/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
582
|
|
582
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Endo Health Solutions and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s motion to withdraw appearance of counsel580 is granted. Attorney Melissa A Ku is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants. Motion hearing date of 7/13/17 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
583
|
|
583
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time for briefing the motions to compel written discovery (Nelson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
584
|
|
584
NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Charles Nelson for presentment of extension of time583 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 7/17/2017 at 11:00 AM. (Nelson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
585
|
|
585
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time583 is granted. Appearance is not necessary on July 17, 2017, to present this motion. The court adopts the parties' amended agreed briefing schedule for motions to compel written discovery as follows: (1) motions to compel are now due by July 19, 2017; (2) responses to the motions are now due by August 2, 2017; and (3) replies thereto are now due by August 7, 2017. The August 21, 2017 hearing date to stand. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
586
|
|
586
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel - Temporal Scope of Discovery(Nelson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit C,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit D,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit E,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit F
|
587
|
|
587
NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Charles Nelson for presentment of motion to compel586 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 8/21/2017 at 02:00 PM. (Nelson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
588
|
|
588
MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to compel Phased Identification of the Medically Unnecessary Claims at Issue (Joint)(Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Index of Exhibits,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit C,
|
| |
Att: 5
Appendix 1
|
589
|
|
589
STATEMENT by Plaintiff City Of Chicagoin Support of MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel - Temporal Scope of Discovery 586 -- Amendment to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Temporal Scope of Discovery) (ECF 586) (Doyle, Thomas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
590
|
|
590
15
pgs
MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in Opposition to motion to compel,,588 and The City of Chicago's Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Phased Identification of the Medically Unnecessary Claims at Issue (ECF 588)(Doyle, Thomas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A (Motion in Janssen Litigation),
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B (Order in Eli Lilly Litigation),
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit C (Order in janssen Litigation)
|
591
|
|
591
RESPONSE by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel - Temporal Scope of Discovery 586 (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Index of Exhibits in Support,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit C,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit D,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit E,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit F,
|
| |
Att: 8
Declaration of Robert S. Hoff,
|
| |
Att: 9
Hoff Decl. Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 10
Hoff Decl. Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 11
Hoff Decl. Exhibit 3,
|
| |
Att: 12
Hoff Decl. Exhibit 4,
|
| |
Att: 13
Hoff Decl. Exhibit 5,
|
| |
Att: 14
Hoff Decl. Exhibit 6,
|
| |
Att: 15
Declaration of Matthew Day
|
592
|
|
592
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time to file response/reply (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
593
|
|
593
NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply592 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 8/10/2017 at 12:00 PM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
594
|
|
594
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Parties' agreed motion for an extension of time to file reply briefs592 is granted. Appearance is not required on August 10, 2017, to present this motion. Parties now have until August 9, 2017, to file their reply in support of their motion to compel. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
595
|
|
595
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Bryan D Pasciak (Pasciak, Bryan) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
596
|
|
596
REPLY by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to motion to compel586 re. temporal scope of discovery (Nelson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
597
|
|
597
REPLY by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to motion to compel,,588 in Support of Their Joint Motion to Compel Phased Identification of the Medically Unnecessary Claims at Issue(Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Index of Supplemental Exhibits,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit D,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit E
|
598
|
|
598
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Donna M. Welch (Welch, Donna) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
599
|
|
599
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Martin Louis Roth (Roth, Martin) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
600
|
|
600
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Timothy William Knapp (Knapp, Timothy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
601
|
|
601
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13485100. (Levy, Jennifer) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's office on 8/16/2017. [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
602
|
|
602
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' application to appear pro hac vice601 is granted. Attorney Jennifer Levy is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
603
|
|
603
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, Plaintiff's motion to compel586 is granted. The motion is granted only to the extent that for the opioid products at issue in this litigation that the FDA approved or Defendants acquired prior to January 1, 2004, the time period for responding to Plaintiffs discovery requests for marketing plan documents, communications related to marketing plans, sales training materials, and marketing materials shall start on January 1, 2004. Defendants must also provide their products' launch plans and communications relating to the launch plans. For the opioid products that the FDA approved or Defendants acquired after January 1, 2004, the time period for responding to Plaintiffs discovery requests for marketing plan documents, communications related to marketing plans, sales training materials, and marketing materials shall start one year prior to the product's approval or acquisition date. Defendants (including Endo to the extent that it has agreed to produce documents), shall have until October 23, 2017, to comply with this order. A status hearing is scheduled for October 23, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. by phone for an update on written discovery. The conference call number for the status hearing is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
604
|
|
604
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, Defendants' joint motion to compel588 is granted. The motion is granted to the extent that Plaintiff will be required to respond to Defendants interrogatories and production requests seeking identification of the following after the close of party written discovery and third-party (except health care providers and patients) written discovery: (1) the prescription claims submitted to and paid for by Plaintiff that it asserts were medically unnecessary and to whom they were written; (2) the physicians or health care providers who wrote the prescriptions Plaintiff alleges to have been medically unnecessary; and (3) Plaintiff's basis for identifying the prescription claims to be "medically unnecessary." The court will set the response deadline at the next status hearing, if possible. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
607
|
|
607
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark S. Cheffo Filing fee $ 50, Receipt Number: 4624188437. (eaa, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
605
|
|
605
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Jennifer G. Levy (Levy, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
606
|
|
606
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Jennifer G. Levy Corrected (Levy, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
608
|
|
608
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., and Purdue Frederick Company's application to appear pro hac vice607 is granted. Attorney Mark S. Cheffo is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of those Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
609
|
|
609
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13580014. (Parish, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
610
|
|
610
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Allergan PLC, Actavis PLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s application to appear pro hac vice609 is granted. Attorney Jason R. Parish is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
613
|
|
613
NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #612 ,610 ,611 sent to Attorney Mark S Cheffo returned as:Unknown Address Error.Mailed to attorney Mark S Cheffo a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
611
|
|
611
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13595171. (Coleman, Hayden) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
612
|
|
612
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13595263. (Sheila, Birnbaum) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
614
|
|
614
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., and Purdue Frederick Company's applications to appear pro hac vice611 and612 are granted. Attorneys Hayden A. Coleman and Sheila L Birnbaum are given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of those Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
615
|
|
615
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Kara Anne Elgersma(Elgersma, Kara) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Certificate of Service
|
616
|
|
616
MOTION by Attorney David J. Stetler and Mariah E. Moran to withdraw as attorney for DEPOMED, INC.. No party information provided (Moran, Mariah) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
617
|
|
617
NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney616 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/3/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Moran, Mariah) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
618
|
|
618
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant Depomed, Inc.'s motion to withdraw as local counsel616 is granted. Attorneys Mariah E Moran and David J. Stetler are given leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendant. Motion hearing date of 10/3/17 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
619
|
|
619
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13642637.(Ackerman, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit
|
620
|
|
620
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's application to appear pro hac vice619 is granted. Attorney David I. Ackerman is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Plaintiff. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
621
|
|
621
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for Leave to File the Motion to Compel Under Seal. (Ackerman, David) (Docket Text Modified on 10/18/2017 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
622
|
|
622
NOTICE of Motion by David I. Ackerman for presentment of motion to seal621 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 10/23/2017 at 02:00 PM. (Ackerman, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
623
|
|
623
SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
624
|
|
624
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Include Relevant Custodians in its ESI Searches (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
625
|
|
625
NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of Sealed motion 623 , motion to compel624 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 10/23/2017 at 02:00 PM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
626
|
|
626
NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document # 623 ,621 ,624 ,622 ,625 sent to Attorney Jason R. Parish returned as: Unknown Address Error. The Clerk telephoned Jason R. Parish, no contact made. Mailed to attorney Jason R. Parish a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
627
|
|
627
MOTION by Attorney Jason R. Parish to withdraw as attorney for ALLERGAN PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. No party information provided (Levy, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
628
|
|
628
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a motion to compel under seal621 is granted. Plaintiff has already filed the unredacted version of the motion as document No. 623 under seal and the redacted public version of the motion without exhibits as document No. 624. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
629
|
|
629
MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Leave to File Opposition to Motion to Compel Under Seal. (Lifland, Charles) (Docket Text Modified on 10/24/2017 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
630
|
|
630
NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of motion to seal629 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 10/26/2017 at 11:00 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
631
|
|
631
SEALED RESPONSE by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago 623 , MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Include Relevant Custodians in its ESI Searches 624 (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
632
|
|
632
RESPONSE by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.in Opposition to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago 623 , MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Include Relevant Custodians in its ESI Searches 624 (REDACTED) (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
633
|
|
633
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Motion and status hearing held by phone. Janssen Defendants' motion for leave to file under seal629 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to compel [ 623 ,624 ] is entered and continued. Plaintiff has until October 30, 2017, to file its reply in support of its motion. The court will rule electronically. Parties are ordered to complete their discussions on ESI search terms by November 3, 2017. If there are any remaining issues, parties are to file a joint motion for a ruling on ESI search terms by November 13, 2017, with each side identifying the search terms they wish to use. Parties are ordered to also file a joint status report by December 1, 2017, identifying any other discovery disputes and including a chart showing the status of Plaintiff's subpoenas for records. A status hearing is scheduled for December 5, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. by phone. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
634
|
|
634
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants ALLERGAN PLC and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc's motion to withdraw as counsel627 is granted. Attorney Jason R. Parish is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
635
|
|
635
MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file Reply Memorandum Under Seal (Ackerman, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
636
|
|
636
NOTICE of Motion by David I. Ackerman for presentment of motion for leave to file635 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 11/2/2017 at 11:00 AM. (Ackerman, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
637
|
|
637
SEALED REPLY by City Of Chicago to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago 623(Ackerman, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
638
|
|
638
REPLY by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to motion to compel624 (Ackerman, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
639
|
|
639
MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. to stay Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
640
|
|
640
14
pgs
MEMORANDUM by Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. in support of motion to stay,639 Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer(Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Index of Exhibits,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 3
|
641
|
|
641
NOTICE of Motion by R. Ryan Stoll for presentment of motion to stay,639 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/2/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
642
|
|
642
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal635 is granted. Appearance is not necessary on November 2, 2017, to present this motion. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
643
|
|
643
MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. to substitute attorney For Substitution of Counsel (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
644
|
|
644
NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion to substitute attorney643 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/7/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
645
|
|
645
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion to compel [ 623624 ] is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted to the extent that Janssen Defendants ("Janssen") are to add six of the ten custodians sought in Plaintiff's motion to Janssen's ESI search. There is ample information to establish that the accounts of these six custodians should be searched for the reasons argued by Plaintiff, but Janssen never explained to Plaintiff in detail why a search of their accounts would yield mostly duplicate documents and why Janssen is unable to de-dupe the search result to identify only unique documents. The motion is denied to the extent that Janssen is not required to search the accounts of the four support individuals with initials HM, CI, JH, and LB identified on page 4 of the motion. Although Plaintiff is correct that Janssen did not specify the exact burden it must bear to search these accounts, the information it has provided about them is sufficient for the court to find that spending resources looking into their electronic drawers is not sensible. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
646
|
|
646
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. Defendants' motion to stay pending decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a motion to transfer639 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 11/10/17. Defendants' reply in support shall be filed by 11/14/17. Defendants Acquired Actavis Entities' motion for substitution of counsel643 is granted. Motion hearing date of 11/7/17 is stricken. Status hearing set for 11/16/17 at 9:00 a.m. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
647
|
|
647
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by J. Gordon Cooney, Jr (Cooney, J.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
648
|
|
648
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Steven A. Reed Related [+] [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-] ed, Steven
|
649
|
|
649
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Tinos Diamantatos (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
650
|
|
650
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13756621. (Menkowitz, Jeremy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
651
|
|
651
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13756711. (Ercole, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
652
|
|
652
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, and Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc's applications to appear pro hac vice650 and651 are granted. Attorneys Jeremy A. Menkowitz and Brian M. Ercole are given leave to file appearance forms on behalf of Defendants. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
653
|
|
653
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Brian M. Ercole (Ercole, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
654
|
|
654
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Jeremy A. Menkowitz (Menkowitz, Jeremy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
655
|
|
655
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Megan Rose Braden (Braden, Megan) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
656
|
|
656
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Jane E. Dudzinski (Dudzinski, Jane) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
657
|
|
657
RESPONSE by City Of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. to stay Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multi 639 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 4,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit 5,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit 6,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit 7
|
658
|
|
658
REPLY by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. to motion to stay,639 (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Index of Exhibit,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 1
|
659
|
|
659
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 1/19/18 at 9:00 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendants' motion to stay pending decision by JPML on a motion to transfer639 is granted. Defendants' pending motions to dismiss492 ,494 ,501 ,508 ,513 , and639 are moot. Parties shall file a joint status report before the next status hearing. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
660
|
|
660
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: In light of the stay granted by the assigned District Judge, the parties are no longer required to file a joint status report by December 1, 2017, or appear for a status hearing on December 5, 2017. The court will monitor the docket and issue a follow-up order when appropriate. Mailed notice (Kim, Young) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
661
|
|
661
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Minute entry dated 11/16/17659 is amended as follows: Status hearing held and continued to 1/9/18 at 9:00 a.m. Remainder of order to stand. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2804 Conditional Transfer Order filed 12/20/2017. (jjr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
662
|
|
662
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Northern District of Ohio. (jjr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
663
|
|
663
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned District Judge. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
664
|
|
664
TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Ohio the electronic record. (jjr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
665
|
|
665
NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #664 ,662 ,663 sent to Attorney Jason L Drori returned as: Other mail system problem. Mailed to attorney Jason L Drori a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (jk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
ELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio as case 1:17-op-45169, filed 12/21/2017. (ags, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
Related: [-]
|
666
|
|
666
CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Northern. Case number 1:14-cv-04361. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
|