Behlings et al v. Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska
South Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Karen E Schreier |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-04010 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 24, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 23, 2018 3:51 AM CDT |
Defendant
Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Behlings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Suzanne Behlings
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Tue 06/18 3:58 PM
JUDGMENT Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/18/19. (SRA) |
|
33 | 33
1
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)
Tue 06/18 9:35 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska (Travis, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
minutes
Pretrial Conference ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 05/29 10:41 AM
Pretrial Conference held on 5/29/2019, Motions terminated:26 MOTION IN LIMINE: filed by Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska,21 MOTION for Jury List filed by Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska before U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier. (Court Reporter: Jill Connelly) (SLW) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
4
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 05/28 3:22 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re26 MOTION IN LIMINE: Barring Loss of Consortium Claim filed by Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska. (Travis, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Brief in Support of Motion in Limine | ||
30 | 30
misc
Objection
Tue 05/28 3:11 PM
OBJECTION by Plaintiffs Eric Behlings, Suzanne Behlings re24 Proposed Jury Instructions (Hoy, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Schmidt v. Clothier | ||
29 | 29
misc
Objection
Tue 05/28 12:45 PM
OBJECTION by Plaintiffs Eric Behlings, Suzanne Behlings re26 MOTION IN LIMINE: (Hoy, Scott) |
|
28 | 28
respoth
Response
Tue 05/28 12:42 PM
RESPONSE to27 Objections to Deposition Designations filed by Eric Behlings, Suzanne Behlings. (Hoy, Scott) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
10
pgs
misc
Objections to Deposition Designations
Thu 05/23 3:18 PM
OBJECTIONS to Deposition Designations by Defendant Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska (Travis, Richard) |
|
26 | 26
3
pgs
motion
In Limine
Thu 05/23 12:13 PM
MOTION IN LIMINE: by Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska. (Travis, Richard) |
|
25 | 25
2
pgs
trial
Exhibit List
Thu 05/23 12:12 PM
Exhibit List by Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska.(Travis, Richard) |
|
24 | 24
trial
Proposed Jury Instructions
Thu 05/23 12:11 PM
Proposed Jury Instructions by Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska .(Travis, Richard) |
|
23 | 23
2
pgs
trial
Witness List
Thu 05/23 12:07 PM
Witness List by Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska.(Travis, Richard) |
|
22 | 22
trial
Pretrial Submissions
Thu 05/23 12:05 PM
Pretrial Submissions by Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska.(Travis, Richard) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Jury List
Thu 05/23 11:02 AM
MOTION for Jury List by Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska. (Travis, Richard) |
|
20 | 20
trial
Pretrial Submissions
Thu 05/23 10:42 AM
Amended Pretrial Submissions by Eric Behlings, Suzanne Behlings.(Hoy, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Jury Instructions and Verdict Form | ||
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 05/20 3:16 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2019 at 10:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 2* before U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier. Jury Trial set for 6/3/2019 at 01:30 PM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 2* before U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/20/2019. (JLS) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 04/26 9:40 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2019 at 08:30 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 2* before U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier. Jury Trial set for 6/4/2019 at 09:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 2* before U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/26/19. (SRA) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
trial
Pretrial Submissions
Thu 04/25 11:31 AM
Pretrial Submissions of Plaintiffs by Eric Behlings, Suzanne Behlings.(Hoy, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Requested Jury Instructions | ||
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 03/07 11:32 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 2* before U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier. Jury Trial set for 5/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 2* before U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/7/19. (SLW) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Fri 08/17 10:54 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting14 Motion to Amend. Discovery due by 1/2/2019; Motions due by 2/1/2019. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/17/18. (DJP) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 08/16 1:03 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct13 Scheduling Order by Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska. (Travis, Richard) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 03/08 4:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/2/2018 Motions due by 11/30/2018. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/8/2018. (DJP) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Discovery Report
Wed 03/07 3:45 PM
Discovery Report and Scheduling Information by Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska.(Travis, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
3
pgs
order
Order for Discovery Report
Wed 02/21 9:52 AM
ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/21/18. (DJP) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 02/16 3:33 PM
ANSWER to 9 Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska. (Travis, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 02/14 3:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Suzanne Behlings, Eric Behlings. (Hoy, Scott) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/12 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Travis on behalf of Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska. (Travis, Richard) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 02/05 2:44 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service Affidavit of Compliance of Service of Summons and Complaint Upon the Division of Insurance , filed by Eric Behlings, Suzanne Behlings. (Hoy, Scott) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Fri 02/02 2:02 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Eric Behlings, Suzanne Behlings.(Hoy, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Admission of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment Complaint | ||
5 | 5
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Fri 02/02 1:58 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Larry D. Deiter, Director Acknowledgement filed by Eric Behlings, Suzanne Behlings. (Hoy, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 01/24 1:55 PM
Summons Issued as to Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska. 1 original summons, 3 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (SLW) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 01/24 1:55 PM
Filing Fee Received from Eric Behlings, Suzanne Behlings. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #SDX400045835. (SLW) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 01/24 1:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SLW) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)
Wed 01/24 1:54 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Suzanne Behlings, Eric Behlings. (SLW) |