Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-op-45110
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2018
Case in other court:Massachusetts, 1:18-cv-10010
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:06 PM EST
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Noramco Inc
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By
Ann M. Songer
Shook, Hardy & Bacon - Kansas City
contact info
Bryan T. Pratt
Shook, Hardy & Bacon - Kansas City
contact info
Brice Nengsu Kenfack
Shook, Hardy & Bacon - Kansas City
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By
Ann M. Songer
Shook, Hardy & Bacon - Kansas City
contact info
Bryan T. Pratt
Shook, Hardy & Bacon - Kansas City
contact info
Brice Nengsu Kenfack
Shook, Hardy & Bacon - Kansas City
contact info
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Does 1-50, Inclusive
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Plaintiff
Regina Hapgood
Represented By
Randi A. Kassan
Sanders Phillips Grossman
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:34 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 02, 2018
1 1 87 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6948071 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Richard Coehlo, Hapgood Regina.(Kassan, Randi) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/3/2018) (Jones, Sherry). [Transferred from mad on 1/25/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, January 03, 2018
2 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (McDonagh, Christina) [Transferred from mad on 1/25/2018.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Does 1-50, Inclusive, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 1/25/2018.]
Related: [-]
4 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Regina Hapgood.(Kassan, Randi) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/5/2018) (Paine, Matthew). [Transferred from mad on 1/25/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
5 5 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 5 in MDL Case 2804 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 1/25/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2018
6 6 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 5 in MDL Case 2804 received from District of Ohio (Northern) requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from mad on 1/25/2018.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Case transferred to the District of Ohio (Northern) pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on January 24, 2018. Case File Electronically Sent to the Clerk in that District on January 25, 2018. (Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from mad on 1/25/2018.]
Related: [-]
8 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Massachusetts. Case number 1:18-cv-10010. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]