Raleigh County Commission v. CVS Indiana, L.L.C. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45108 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 21:0801 |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2018 |
Case in other court: | West Virginia Southern, 5:17-cv-04484 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:07 PM EST |
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Indiana, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kroger Limited Partnership I
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Raleigh County Commission
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2019 10:47 AM EDT |
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/25/2018.] | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
Att: 19
![]() |
||
Att: 20
![]() |
||
Att: 21
![]() |
||
Att: 22
![]() |
||
Att: 23
![]() |
||
Att: 24
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |