Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Robert W Gettleman
Referred: Jeffrey Cole
Case #: 1:18-cv-00582
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 25, 2018 4:07 AM CDT
Defendant
Lakeview Fitness East, LLC
Represented By
Heather Lynn Maly
Ice Miller
contact info
Martha Larson Kohlstrand
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Isaac J. Colunga
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Fitness Formula, LTD.
Represented By
Heather Lynn Maly
Ice Miller
contact info
Martha Larson Kohlstrand
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Isaac J. Colunga
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Wheeler
Represented By
Cathleen M. Combs
Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin LLC
contact info
Daniel A. Edelman
Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin LLC
contact info
James O. Latturner
Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin LLC
contact info
David See Kim
Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, LLC
contact info
Tara Leigh Goodwin
Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin LLC
contact info

GPO Nov 14 2018
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Assuming for the purposes of the instant motion that defendants violated section 1693e(b) of the EFTA by failing to give advance notice of varying charge amounts, their violation was unintentional, and the result of a bona fide error despite having maintained procedures reasonably adapted to avoid that error. Consequently, to the extent that plaintiff seeks to hold defendants liable under section 1693e(b) of the EFTA for the six erroneous charges, defendants' motion for partial summary judgment 45 is granted. The case remains set for a status on December 6, 2018, at 9:00 a.m., and the parties should be prepared to identify plaintiffs remaining claims. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/14/2018. Mailed notice (cn).
GPO Mar 30 2020
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 3/30/2020. Mailed notice. (dm, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.