Polk County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45116 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1407pl |
Case Filed: | Jan 29, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Iowa Southern, 4:18-cv-00010 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:08 PM EST |
Defendant
Hy-Vee, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
RiteAid of Maryland, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dakota Drug, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
LRSAJ Distributors d/b/a SAJ Distributors
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Pharmacy Buying Association, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
SuperValu, Inc. d/b/a Advantage Logistics
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miami Luken, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Polk County
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Lynn Webster
Terminated: 05/25/2018
|
|
Defendant
Perry Fine
Terminated: 05/25/2018
|
|
Defendant
Scott Fishman
Terminated: 05/25/2018
|
Docket last updated: 11/20/2019 4:48 PM EST |
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
***Civil Case Terminated. Case electronically transferred to Ohio Northern. (kjw) [Transferred from iasd on 1/29/2018.] | ||
3 | 3 TEXT MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-5) Finalized on 1/24/18. Please see pleading (3 in ARE/4:17-cv-00831, 3 in IAS/4:18-cv-00010, 3 in IAS/4:18-cv-00011, 3 in INN/1:18-cv-00003, 3 in INN/1:18-cv-00005, 3 in INS/1:18-cv-00047, 3 in INS/1:18-cv-00048, 3 in INS/1:18-cv-00054, 3 in INS/1:18-cv-00057, 3 in INS/1:18-cv-00060, 3 in INS/2:18-cv-00010, 3 in INS/2:18-cv-00011, 3 in INS/4:18-cv-00003, 3 in INS/4:18-cv-00006, 3 in LAW/2:18-cv-00002, 3 in MA/1:18-cv-10010, 3 in MA/3:18-cv-10032, 3 in MA/3:18-cv-10035, 3 in MD/1:18-cv-00063, 601 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in MIE/1:18-cv-10078, 3 in MIE/5:18-cv-10077, 3 in MIW/1:18-cv-00030, 3 in MIW/1:18-cv-00032, 3 in MIW/1:18-cv-00033, 3 in MIW/2:18-cv-00001, 3 in MN/0:18-cv-00062, 3 in MSN/3:18-cv-00006, 3 in MSN/3:18-cv-00007, 3 in MSN/3:18-cv-00008, 3 in MSS/5:18-cv-00009, 3 in NCE/7:18-cv-00001, 3 in NCE/7:18-cv-00002, 3 in NCW/1:18-cv-00004, 3 in NYN/1:18-cv-00024, 3 in SD/4:18-cv-04003, 3 in TNE/2:18-cv-00002, 3 in TNE/2:18-cv-00003, 3 in TNE/3:18-cv-00006, 3 in TNM/3:18-cv-00008, 3 in TNW/1:18-cv-02016, 3 in TXE/2:18-cv-00002, 3 in TXE/5:18-cv-00002, 3 in WIE/2:18-cv-00022, 3 in WVS/5:17-cv-04484). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. Ohio for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 1/24/2018. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804 et al. (TB) (kjw) [Transferred from iasd on 1/29/2018.] | |
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |