New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:18-bk-22178
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2018
Terminated:Mar 22, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Aug 21, 2018

Debtor
Cenveo, Inc.
777 Westchester Ave Ste 111
White Plains, NY 10604-3520
Represented By
Jonathan S. Henes
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


1. Cenveo files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (bankruptcompanynews.com)
Submitted Fri 02/02/2018
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 03/22 4:39 PM
Case Closed. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Party Tue 03/22 4:46 PM
Party Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent terminated from case. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Party Tue 03/22 4:47 PM
Party Prime Clerk LLC terminated from case. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]