County of Jones v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45139 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 05, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Texas Northern, 1:18-cv-00003 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:10 PM EST |
Defendant
Amerisource Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Indivior Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
WalMart
9303 Mentor Avenue
Mentor, OH 44060 |
|
Defendant
Walmart Pharmacy
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does 1-100, Inclusive
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
County of Jones
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Terminated: 06/12/2018
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:12 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (jmc) [Transferred from txnd on 2/5/2018.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |