Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-op-45140
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2018
Case in other court:Louisiana Western, 2:18-cv-00053
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:10 PM EST
Amicus Curiae
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Co Inc
Represented By
Samuel E. Masur
Gordon Arata Montgomery Barnett
contact info
Paul Byrd Simon
Gordon Arata
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By
Samuel E. Masur
Gordon Arata Montgomery Barnett
contact info
Paul Byrd Simon
Gordon Arata
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By
Samuel E. Masur
Gordon Arata Montgomery Barnett
contact info
Paul Byrd Simon
Gordon Arata
contact info
Defendant
RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
Defendant
David A. Sackler
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
Defendant
Mortimer D. A. Sackler
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
Defendant
Smith Drug Company
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By
Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Bartlit Beck - Chicago
contact info
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceutical Inc.
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
Defendant
Stuart Baker
Advanced Poly-Packaging, Inc. 1331 Emmitt Road
Akron, OH 44306
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Represented By
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By
David D. Fauvre
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
David D. Fauvre
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer - Washington
contact info
Defendant
H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By
Douglas John Moore
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
David W. O'Quinn
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Kelly Juneau Rookard
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
James B. Irwin
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Douglas John Moore
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
David W. O'Quinn
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Kelly Juneau Rookard
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
James B. Irwin
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Represented By
Douglas John Moore
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
David W. O'Quinn
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Kelly Juneau Rookard
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
James B. Irwin
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Defendant
Kroger Co.
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Defendant
Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, LLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, PLC
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co., LLC
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505
Plaintiff
John Craft
Represented By
Paul J. Hanly, Jr.
Hanly Conroy Bierstein Sheridan Fisher & Hayes
contact info
Madeleine R. Brumley
Laborde Earles
contact info
Laura Singletary Fitzpatrick
Simmons Hanly Conroy
contact info
David C. Laborde
Laborde Earles
contact info
Derrick G. Earles
Laborde Earles
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Lynn Webster
Terminated: 05/25/2018
Represented By
Steven Michael Stastny
Stastny Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Perry Fine
Terminated: 05/25/2018
Represented By
Steven Michael Stastny
Stastny Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Randall Brewer
Terminated: 05/25/2018
Defendant
Scott Fishman
Terminated: 05/25/2018
Represented By
Steven Michael Stastny
Stastny Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
Terminated: 01/29/2019


Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:47 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
STATE COURT Service under La. Long Arm Statute. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc answer due 1/23/2018. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, Pam) [Transferred from lawd on 2/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Mitchell, Pam) [Transferred from lawd on 2/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE of Removal from 30th JDC Vernon Parish, Case Number 95086 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3560206) filed by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Attorney Kelly Juneau Rookard added to party Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Juneau Rookard added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft))(aty,Rookard, Kelly) [Transferred from lawd on 2/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Ex. 1,
Att: 3 Ex. 2,
Att: 4 Notice of Collateral Proceedings
2 2 Consent MOTION to Stay by Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Frederick Co Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L P, Teva Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc.(aty,Rookard, Kelly) [Transferred from lawd on 2/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief,
Att: 2 Proposed order
3 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Kelly Juneau Rookard on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/30/2018. (crt,Mitchell, Pam) [Transferred from lawd on 2/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
4 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, Pam) [Transferred from lawd on 2/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2018
5 5 REMOVAL ORDER forwarded to all counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/17/2018. (crt,LaCombe, L) [Transferred from lawd on 2/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER granting2 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/17/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from lawd on 2/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2018
REMARK: A duplicate charge was incurred during the filing of the Notice of Removal. A refund of the initial payment of $400.00, 0536-3560181, has been processed in pay.gov this date. Counsel is advised to verify the refund on their statement. (crt,McInnis, S) [Transferred from lawd on 2/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2018
7 7 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-6) in MDL No.2804, IN RE: National Prescription Opiate Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the Northern District of Ohio upon request of the record. (crt,Whidden, C) [Transferred from lawd on 2/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 6, directing transfer to Northern District of Ohio, In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL # 2804. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whidden, C) [Transferred from lawd on 2/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2018
9 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Western. Case number 2:18-cv-00053. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]