Patricia Davis v. Dept. of HHS
Original Case: 4:13-cv-02217
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:13-cv-03680 |
Type | civil / united states as a party |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Case Filed: | Dec 13, 2013 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 10, 2016 2:25 PM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Patricia Marie Davis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/10/2016 2:25 PM CST |
Friday, December 13, 2013 | ||
Civil case docketed. [4105254] 13-3680 (PSA) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of memorandum and order filed 11/20/13, notice of appeal, docket entries, [4105257] 13-3680 (PSA) | ||
CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. Kindly submit these documents within 10 days. [4105258] 13-3680 (PSA) |