Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-00909

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Tamara O Mitchell
Case #: 2:18-ap-00080
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2018
Terminated:Nov 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wythe Medical Associates, Inc.
360 Virginia Avenue
Wytheville, VA 24382
Represented By
Wythe Medical Associates, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee
Reynolds Legal Solutions, LLC 300 Richard Arrington Jr. Blvd. N. Suite 503
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Clyde Ellis Brazeal, III
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Monday, November 01, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/01 1:13 PM
Adversary Case 2:18-ap-80 Closed (klt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 09/29 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 09/29/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Default Judgment
Monday, September 27, 2021
15 15 2 pgs order Default Judgment Mon 09/27 10:04 AM
Default Judgment Signed on 9/27/2021 Related [+]. (klt)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Thomas E Reynolds
Saturday, September 11, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 09/11 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 09/11/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, September 09, 2021
13 13 order Default Judgment Thu 09/09 4:14 PM
Notice and Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] Signed on 9/9/2021. (klt)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 motion Default Judgment Thu 09/09 12:35 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Thomas E Reynolds Default Judgment Motion due by 10/12/2021. (Brazeal, Clyde)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 26, 2021
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 08/26 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 08/26/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
10 10 court Clerk Entry of Default Tue 08/24 12:23 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] (klt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Thomas E Reynolds,9 Application for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Thomas E Reynolds
Monday, August 23, 2021
9 9 motion Entry of Default Mon 08/23 3:42 PM
Plaintiff's Application to Clerk for Entry of Default Against Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Thomas E Reynolds Related [+] (Brazeal, Clyde) Modified on 8/24/2021 to match title on pleading (klt)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Saturday, January 05, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 01/06 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 01/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic)
Thursday, January 03, 2019
7 7 8 pgs order Order (Generic-from hearing) Thu 01/03 4:03 PM
Order Requiring All Defendants in P&H Adversary Proceedings to Answer or Face Potential Default Signed on 1/3/2019. (thc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 26, 2018
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 05/27 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/26/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Notice
Thursday, May 24, 2018
5 5 court Notice (Blank) Thu 05/24 12:41 PM
Notice of Opportunity to File Appearance in Main Case and Notice of Hearing in P&H Adversary Proceedings. (rwh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
4 4 misc Courtroom Notes Thu 04/26 8:12 AM
Courtroom Notes NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AND PROCEDURES FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES . (klt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
3 3 2 pgs cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 02/28 4:15 PM
Summons Service Executed on Wythe Medical Associates, Inc. 2/28/2018 (Brazeal, Clyde)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2018
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 02/27 3:37 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conferenc Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/30/2018 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. (klt)
Related: [-] 1 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds
1 1 38 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/27 3:04 PM
Adversary case 18-00080 13 Related [+]) Complaint by Thomas E. Reynolds, Atherotech Holdings, Inc. against WYTHE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, INC.. Fee Amount $350 (Brazeal, Clyde)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer