California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:18-cv-01364
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2018
Terminated:Mar 31, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 28, 2018 2:15 AM PDT
Defendant
Brian Armstrong
Represented By
Benjamin Berkowitz
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Nicholas David Marais
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Steven Paul Ragland
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Erin E. Meyer
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Defendant
Coinbase, Inc.
Represented By
Benjamin Berkowitz
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Nicholas David Marais
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Steven Paul Ragland
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Erin E. Meyer
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Defendant
David Farmer
Represented By
Benjamin Berkowitz
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Nicholas David Marais
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Steven Paul Ragland
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Erin E. Meyer
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Berk
Represented By
Robert S. Green
Green & Noblin, P.C.
contact info
Lynda J Grant
Thegrantlawfirm, PLLC
contact info

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
102 102 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Wed 03/31 3:21 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 4/14/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, April 8, 2021, by no later than 10:00 a.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only e ntry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
101 101 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 03/30 11:05 AM
STIPULATION DISMISSING ACTION filed by Jeffrey Berk. (Green, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 29, 2021
100 100 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 03/29 1:35 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 4/1/2021, AND PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS (FURTHER REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL IS NOT REQUIRED IF ALREADY COMPLETED). Further Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2021, 01:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:ht tps://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry g enerated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
99 99 misc Joint Case Management Statement Wed 03/24 6:04 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Coinbase, Inc.. (Ragland, Steven)
Related: [-]