Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-op-45231
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2018
Case in other court:Washington Western, 2:18-cv-00225
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:16 PM EST
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Defendant
Sales Representatives John and Jane Does 1 through 10
Defendant
Seattle Pain Center Medical Corporation
Represented By
James B. Meade
Fain Anderson - Tacoma
contact info
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By
Thomas Dean Adams
Karr Tuttle Campbell
contact info
Ronald J. Friedman
Karr Tuttle Campbell
contact info
Andrew W. Durland
contact info
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
Defendant
David A. Sackler
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Eden
Schwabe Williamson & Wyatt
contact info
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By
Curt Roy Hineline
Baker & Hostetler - Seattle
contact info
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Curt Roy Hineline
Baker & Hostetler - Seattle
contact info
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Eden
Schwabe Williamson & Wyatt
contact info
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1 through 100
Defendant
Frank D. Li
Represented By
James B. Meade
Fain Anderson - Tacoma
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, LLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, PLC
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas Dean Adams
Karr Tuttle Campbell
contact info
Ronald J. Friedman
Karr Tuttle Campbell
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By
Thomas Dean Adams
Karr Tuttle Campbell
contact info
Ronald J. Friedman
Karr Tuttle Campbell
contact info
Andrew W. Durland
contact info
Plaintiff
King County
Represented By
David J. Ko
Keller Rohrback
contact info
Daniel P. Mensher
Keller Rohrback - Seattle
contact info
Alison S. Gaffney
Keller Rohrback
contact info
Derek W. Loeser
Keller Rohrback - Seattle
contact info
Devon Shannon
Office Of Prosecuting Attorney
contact info
Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Keller Rohrback - Seattle
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:05 PM EDT
Monday, February 12, 2018
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18 2-00570 1 SEA; Related [+], filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc..(Hineline, Curt) [Transferred from wawd on 2/28/2018.]
Related: [-] ceipt # 0981-5199224
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Complaint Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3
2 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Hineline, Curt) [Transferred from wawd on 2/28/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2018
Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (DJ) [Transferred from wawd on 2/28/2018.]
Related: [-]
NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc and Johnson & Johnson must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2/20/2018. (KB) [Transferred from wawd on 2/28/2018.]
Related: [-]
3 3 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ) [Transferred from wawd on 2/28/2018.]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (DJ) [Transferred from wawd on 2/28/2018.]
Related: [-]
5 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Purdue Pharma, Inc, Purdue Pharma, LP, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc (Adams, Thomas) [Transferred from wawd on 2/28/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2018
6 6 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING MANUFACTURING DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CERTAIN OTHER DEADLINES by parties re1 Notice of Removal, (Adams, Thomas) [Transferred from wawd on 2/28/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2018
7 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson, Other Affiliate Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Johnson & Johnson. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Eden, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wawd on 2/28/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2018
8 8 MDL 2804 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 11); in re National Prescription Opiate Litigation; Northern District of Ohio; assigned to Judge Dan A. Polster. (SWT) [Transferred from wawd on 2/28/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) assigned to case. (P,R)
Related: [-]
9 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western. Case number 2:18-cv-00225. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]