Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:18-bk-10474
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2018
Terminated:Jan 14, 2019
Plan Confirmed:Jun 13, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The Walking Company Holdings, Inc.
25 W. Anapamu
Santa Barbara, CA 93101
Represented By
Colin R. Robinson
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Jeffrey N. Pomerantz
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Peter J. Keane
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Joseph Michael Mulvihill
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Maxim B. Litvak
C/o Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
James E. O'Neill
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:50 PM EST
Attorney
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
www.kccllc.com 2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Albert Kass
Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Oklahoma County Treasurer
320 Robert S Kerr Ave Rm 307
Oklahoma City, OK 73102
Represented By
Gretchen A. Crawford
Oklahoma County Treasurer
contact info
Creditor
QKC Maui Owner, LLC
Honigman Miller Schwartz and Cohn 660 Woodward Ave. Ste. 2290
Detroit, MI 48226
Represented By
Lawrence A. Lichtman
C/o Honigman Miller Schwartz And Cohn
contact info
Creditor
Pyramid Walden Company, L.P.
Barclay Damon Tower 125 East Jefferson Street Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq.
Syracuse, NY 13202
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Kevin M. Newman
Barclay Damon LLP
contact info
Creditor
Pyramid Management Group, LLC
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Kevin M. Newman
Barclay Damon LLP
contact info
Creditor
Power Link International Corp.
Creditor
Paseo Nuevo Owner, LLC
Represented By
Chantelle D'nae McClamb
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Laurel D. Roglen
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
PREIT Services, LLC, as agent for Cherry Hill Center, PR Patrick Henry, LLC and WG Park, L.P.
Kurtzman | Steady, LLC 401 S. 2nd Street Suite 200
Philadelphia, PA 19147
Represented By
Jeffrey Kurtzman
Kurtzman | Steady, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Doshi Legal Group, P.C. 1979 Marcus Avenue Suite 210E
Lake Succes, NY 11042
Represented By
Amish R. Doshi
Doshi Legal Group, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Old Orchard Urban Limited Partnership
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Niclas A. Ferland
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporatoin
contact info
Creditor
Richard Kayne, as Trustee of the Richard and Suzanne Kayne Living Trust dated 1/14/1999
Represented By
Jeffrey W. Reisner
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Kerri A Lyman
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Pessin Katz Law, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
VF Mall LLC
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Niclas A. Ferland
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporatoin
contact info
Creditor
Oakridge Mall LLC
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Niclas A. Ferland
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporatoin
contact info
Creditor
NorthPark Partners, LP
8080 North Central Expwy Ste. 1100
Dallas, TX 75206
Represented By
James H. Billingsley
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Creditor
North County Fair LP
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Niclas A. Ferland
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporatoin
contact info
Creditor
Valencia Town Center Venture, L.P.
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Niclas A. Ferland
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporatoin
contact info
Creditor
Montgomery Mall Owner LLC
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Niclas A. Ferland
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporatoin
contact info
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475
Jefferson City, MO 65105
Represented By
Sheryl L. Moreau
Missouri Department Of Revenue
contact info
Creditor
Maricopa County Treasurer
222 North Central Avenue #1100
Phoenix, AZ 85004
Represented By
Peter Klaus Muthig
Maricopa County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Southern California Edison Company
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Travis County
P.O. Box 1748
Austin, TX 78767
Represented By
Kay Diebel Brock
Travis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Creditor
The Taubman Landlords
Represented By
Susan E. Kaufman
Law Office Of Susan E. Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Andrew S. Conway
The Taubman Company
contact info
Creditor
The Macerich Company
Represented By
Chantelle D'nae McClamb
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Laurel D. Roglen
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
The Kayne Foundation
Represented By
Jeffrey W. Reisner
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Kerri A Lyman
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Pessin Katz Law, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
The Forbes Company
Represented By
Chantelle D'nae McClamb
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Laurel D. Roglen
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Tarrant County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
Represented By
Laura L. McCloud
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Starwood Retail Partners LLC
Represented By
Chantelle D'nae McClamb
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Laurel D. Roglen
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Southgate Mall Owner LLC
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Creditor
Li and Fung Trading Limited
Creditor
Simon Property Group, Inc.
225 West Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN 46237
Represented By
Ronald Mark Tucker
Simon Property Group, Inc.
contact info
Creditor
UTC Venture LLC
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Niclas A. Ferland
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporatoin
contact info
Creditor
ShopperTrak RCT Corporation
233 S. Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606
Represented By
Sally E. Edison
Spilman Thomas & Battle, PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Sherman Oaks Fashion Associates, LP
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Niclas A. Ferland
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporatoin
contact info
Creditor
Santa Anita Shoppingtown LP
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Niclas A. Ferland
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporatoin
contact info
Creditor
San Diego Gas and Electric Company
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
United States/USAO
U.S. Attorney's Office 1007 N. Orange Street Suite 700
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Ellen Slights
contact info
Creditor
S.F. Centre Limited Partnership
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Niclas A. Ferland
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporatoin
contact info
Creditor
Roseville Shoppingtown LLC
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Niclas A. Ferland
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporatoin
contact info
Creditor
Bohannan Development Company
60-31st Avenue
San Mateo, CA 94403
Represented By
Catherine Scholmann Robertson
Pahl & Mccay
contact info
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson,LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
DDR Deer Park Town Center LLC
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Crossgates Mall General Company NewCo, LLC
Barclay Damon Tower 125 East Jefferson Street Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq.
Syracuse, NY 13202
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Kevin M. Newman
Barclay Damon LLP
contact info
Creditor
Westfield, LLC
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Niclas A. Ferland
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporatoin
contact info
Creditor
County of Loudoun, Virginia
1 Harrison Street P.O. Box 7000
Leesburg, VA 20177
Creditor
Westland Garden State Plaza Limited Partnership
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Niclas A. Ferland
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporatoin
contact info
Creditor
Centennial Real Estate Company, LLC
Represented By
Chantelle D'nae McClamb
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Laurel D. Roglen
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Carousel Center Company, L.P.
125 East Jefferson Street Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq.
Syracuse, NY 13202
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Kevin M. Newman
Barclay Damon LLP
contact info
Creditor
CP Commercial Delaware, LLC
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Jason A. Gibson
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Creditor
LPA 229 W. Broughton, LLC
Represented By
Kristin D. Ogburn
Horack Talley Pharr & Lowndes
contact info
Creditor
Big Box Property Owner E LLC
Represented By
David Dean
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Bellevue Square, LLC
Nold Muchinsky PLLC 10500 NE 8th Street Suite 930
Bellevue, WA 98004
Represented By
Nafees Uddin
Nold Muchinsky PLLC
contact info
David A. Nold
Nold Muchinsky PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Bellevue Associates
Kurtzman | Steady, LLC 401 S. 2nd Street Suite 200
Philadelphia, PA 19147
Represented By
Jeffrey Kurtzman
Kurtzman | Steady, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Mark Barry
Creditor
BEI-Beach
Creditor
Annapolis Mall Owner LLC
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Niclas A. Ferland
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporatoin
contact info
Creditor
AmTrust North America, Inc., on behalf of Wesco Insurance Company
2000 Auburn Drive Suite 200 One Chagrin Highlands
Beachwood, OH 44122
Creditor
AA Footwear Co. Ltd.
Creditor
Yonkers Associates, LLC
Creditor
Deutsche Asset and Wealth Management
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Kahala Center Company
Represented By
Nancy J. Newman
Hanson Bridgett LLP
contact info
Susan E. Kaufman
Law Office Of Susan E. Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Washington Prime Group Inc.
Represented By
Ronald E Gold
Frost Brown Todd LLC
contact info
Susan E. Kaufman
Law Office Of Susan E. Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Creditor
EWH Escondido Associates, LP
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Creditor
KS Owner, LLC
Represented By
Lawrence A. Lichtman
C/o Honigman Miller Schwartz And Cohn
contact info
Creditor
WEA Southcenter LLC
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Niclas A. Ferland
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporatoin
contact info
Creditor
WBCMT 2007-C33 Independence Center LLC
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
GGP Inc.
Represented By
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Creditor
GGP Limited Partnership
Kristen N. Pate, Esq. 350 N. Orleans St Suite 300
Chicago, IL 60654
Represented By
Kristen N. Pate
Brookfield Property Reit Inc.
contact info
Creditor
Dansko Inc.
Represented By
Mark E. Felger
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Creditor
HART Wailea, LLC
Represented By
J. David Folds
Baker Donelson Bearmancaldwell Berkowitz
contact info
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Horton Plaza LLC
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
Niclas A. Ferland
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporatoin
contact info
Creditor
IMI Huntsville LLC
Represented By
Justin Cory Falgowski
Burr And Forman LLP
contact info
Regan Loper
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Joe Joseph
contact info
Creditor
KA-Sabes Investments LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey W. Reisner
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Kerri A Lyman
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Pessin Katz Law, P.A.
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for The Walking Company Holdings, Inc., et al.
Represented By
Domenic E. Pacitti
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Lauren S. Schlussel
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Sally E. Veghte
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Jason R. Adams
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Financial Advisor
Consensus Advisory Services LLC
Interested Party
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as agent
Represented By
Matthew P. Ward
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Saige E. Jutras
Choate, Hall & Stewart LLP
contact info
Morgan L. Patterson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Kevin J. Simard
Choate, Hall & Stewart LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Vestar Gateway, LLC
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Interested Party
Antoinette Young, Esq.
9801 Washingtonian Blvd 12th Floor
Gaithersburg, MD 20878
Interested Party
San Diego County Treasurer-Tax Collector of California
Dan McAllister Attention: Bankruptcy Desk 1600 Pacific Highway, Room 162
San Diego, CA 92101
Represented By
Dan McAllister
contact info
Interested Party
Office of Unemployment Compensation Tax Services (UCTS)
Interested Party
Metin Negrin
Interested Party
Merritt Meade Loughran Inc.
Interested Party
Eastview Mall. LLC
Represented By
Donald C. Cowan, Jr.
contact info
Interested Party
Easton Town Center II, LLC
Represented By
Michael S. Tucker
Ulmer & Berne LLP
contact info
Brenna Anne Dolphin
Morris James LLP
contact info
Interested Party
District at Green Valley, LLC
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Interested Party
Donald C. Cowman, Jr.
Interested Party
Chatham County Tax Commissioner
P.O. Box 8324
Savannah, GA 31412
Other Prof.
Simi Entertainment Plaza, LLC
Landsberg Law, APC 9300 Whilshire Blvd
Beverly Hills, CA 90212
Represented By
Ian S Landsberg
Landsberg & Associates
contact info
Transcriber
EScribers, LLC
PO Box 7533
New York, NY 10116
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Richard L. Schepacarter
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Mark S. Kenney
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. How The Walking Co. Plans to Emerge From Bankruptcy (footwearnews.com)
Submitted Tue 06/19/2018
2. The Walking Company Files For Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (footwearnews.com)
Submitted Thu 03/08/2018
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Monday, October 19, 2020
508 508 court Withdrawal of Standing Order/Transcripts Mon 10/19 4:42 PM
The transcriber has withdrawn the standing order for hearings in this case at the request of counsel.Terminating EScribers, LLC. Related [+]. (EScribers, LLC)
Related: [-] 386