Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-op-45240
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2018
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:18 PM EST
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. nka Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
116 Pine Street Suite 320
Harrisburg, PA 17101
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
119 E. Court Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L P
2711 Centerville Road
Wilmington, DE 19808
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
2711 Centerville Road
Wilmington, DE 19808
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Russell Portenoy
39 Broadway First Floor
New York, NY 10006
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..
n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 116 Pine Street Suite 320
Harrisburg, PA 17101
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
50 West Broad Sreet Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Brian J. Laliberte
Steptoe & Johnson - Columbus
contact info
Alana V. Tanoury
Steptoe & Johnson - Columbus
contact info
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Vincent I. Holzhall
Steptoe & Johnson - Columbus
contact info
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
One Johnson & Johnson Plaza
New Brunswick, NJ 08933
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
116 Pine Street Suite 320
Harrisburg, PA 17101
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
3411 Silverside Road
Wilmington, DE 19180
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
7000 Cardinal Place
Dublin, OH 43017
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
4400 Easton Common Way Suite 125
Columbus, OH 43215
Defendant
Allergan PLC fka Actavis PLC
4400 Easton Commons Way Suite 125
Columbus, OH 43215
Defendant
Actavis, Inc. fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
119 E. Court Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. fka Watson Pharma Inc.
119 E. Court Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202
Defendant
Actavis LLC
119 E. Court Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202
Plaintiff
City Of Lakewood
12650 Detroit Avenue
Lakewood, OH 44107
Represented By
Shelly A. Sanford
Watts Guerra - Austin
contact info
James Allison Lowe
Lowe, Eklund & Wakefield
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Lynn Webster
Terminated: 04/16/2019
PRA Health Sciences 3838 S. 700 E. #202
Salt Lake City, UT 84106
Represented By
Tyler G. Tarney
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus
contact info
Defendant
Scott Fishman
Terminated: 04/16/2019
2221 Stockton Boulevard
Sacramento, CA 95817
Represented By
Tyler G. Tarney
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus
contact info
Defendant
Perry Fine
Terminated: 04/16/2019
615 Arapeen Way Suite 155
Salt Lake City, UT 84132
Represented By
Tyler G. Tarney
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 4:37 PM EDT
Monday, March 05, 2018
1 1 Complaint of Plaintiff City of Lakewood, Ohio against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8584089. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action MDL No. 2804 . Filed by City Of Lakewood. (Lowe, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons,
Att: 9 Summons,
Att: 10 Summons,
Att: 11 Summons,
Att: 12 Summons,
Att: 13 Summons,
Att: 14 Summons,
Att: 15 Summons,
Att: 16 Summons,
Att: 17 Summons,
Att: 18 Summons,
Att: 19 Summons,
Att: 20 Summons,
Att: 21 Summons,
Att: 22 Summons,
Att: 23 Summons,
Att: 24 Summons,
Att: 25 Summons,
Att: 26 Summons