Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-op-45249
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2018
Case in other court:Pennsylvania Western, 2:18-cv-00211
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:19 PM EST
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Noramco Inc
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Value Drug Company
Defendant
Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice - Kansas City
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Plaintiff
Indiana County, Pennsylvania
Represented By
Bryan S. Neiderhiser
Marcus & Mack
contact info
J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Baron & Budd - Baton Rouge
contact info
Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Greene Ketchum Farrell Bailey & Tweel
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:31 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
1 1 COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ALLERGAN PLC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEPHALON, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NORAMCO, INC., ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4628074), filed by INDIANA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (ept) [Transferred from pawd on 3/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, February 21, 2018
2 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg) [Transferred from pawd on 3/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 09, 2018
3 3 Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (ept) [Transferred from pawd on 3/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Northern District of Ohio. (ept) [Transferred from pawd on 3/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 12, 2018
5 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Western. Case number 2:18-cv-00211. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]