New York Southern District Court
Judge:Analisa Torres
Referred: Katharine H Parker
Case #: 1:18-cv-02334
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000cc Religious Land Use & Institutionalized Persons Act of 2000
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2018
Terminated:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 12, 2018 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
City of New York
Represented By
Suzanna Publicker Mettham
Nyc Law Department
contact info
James Monroe Dervin
New York City Law Department
contact info
Bilal Husain Haider
New York City Department Of Corrections
contact info
Plaintiff
Arwa Aziz
Represented By
Ogilvie Andrew Fraser Wilson
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady, LLP
contact info
Emma Lerner Freeman
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady LLP
contact info
Albert Fox Cahn
Council On American-Islamic Relations, New York, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jamilla Clark
Represented By
Ogilvie Andrew Fraser Wilson
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady, LLP
contact info
Emma Lerner Freeman
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady LLP
contact info
Albert Fox Cahn
Council On American-Islamic Relations, New York, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Turning Point for Women and Families
Represented By
Ogilvie Andrew Fraser Wilson
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady, LLP
contact info
Emma Lerner Freeman
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady LLP
contact info
Albert Fox Cahn
Council On American-Islamic Relations, New York, LLC
contact info

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
376 376 order Memo Endorsement Mon 04/21 11:15 AM
ORDER granting (104 in 1:18-cv-10566-AT-KHP) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. APPLICATION GRANTED: The Settlement Conference in these matters scheduled for 04/29/2025 is hereby adjourned. The parties' are ordered to submit the supplemental stipulation referenced in their letter by July 31, 2025. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/21/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]