Atkinson Candy Company v. Kenray Associates, Incorporate, et al
Original Case: 4:02-cv-00242
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:12-cv-01036 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2012 |
Terminated: | Jun 11, 2013 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 13, 2016 12:22 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
KENRAY ASSOCIATES, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHARLES A. MCGEE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KENNETH J. MCGEE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ATKINSON CANDY COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/12/2016 11:52 PM CST |
Friday, January 06, 2012 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Atkinson Candy Company by 01/12/2012. Transcript information sheet due by 01/20/2012. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/15/2012 for Atkinson Candy Company. [1] [6364282] 12-1036 (CD) |