Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-op-45408
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2018
Case in other court:Alabama Middle, 3:18-cv-00361
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:33 PM EST
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Noramco Inc
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By
J. Patrick Strubel
Watkins & Eager
contact info
David L. Brown, Jr.
Watkins & Eager
contact info
Houston Lanier Brown, II
Watkins & Eager
contact info
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Plaintiff
Chambers County, Alabama
Represented By
Rhon Eugene Jones
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Richard Douglas Stratton
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Claud E. Skip McCoy, Jr.
Johnson & Madigan
contact info
William Robert Sutton
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Jere L. Beasley
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Jon Ryan Kral
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/09/2019 2:15 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
1 1 153 pgs COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602048695.), filed by Chambers County, Alabama.(kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Filing Fee Receipt
2 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Chambers County, Alabama. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 23, 2018
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Chambers County, Alabama. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry1 for pdf)(kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
3 3 Summons Issued as to Allergan PLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD and returned to counsel for personal service on these foreign defendants. (djy, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and mailed CMRRR with copies of complaint to these defendants. (djy, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 02, 2018
5 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by Laura McHaney for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018; Noramco, Inc. served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
6 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by Julie B for Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018; Cephalon, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018; TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 06, 2018
7 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by M. Wyatt for Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
8 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by (illegible) for Johnson & Johnson served on 4/3/2018, answer due 4/24/2018. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 09, 2018
9 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Houston Lanier Brown, II on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, Houston) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lee Brown, Jr on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, David) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, John) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
12 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by Amy McLaren for Endo Health Solutions, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018; Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018; Mallinckrodt LLC served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
13 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by (not signed) for Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
14 14 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by Daniel D. Kelley for Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
15 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by (illegible) for Actavis, LLC served on 4/3/2018, answer due 4/24/2018. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to clerk. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
16 16 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer order entered on 4/11/2018 by the Judicial Panel on Multi district Litigation transferring this action to the USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/12/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
17 17 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Middle. Case number 3:18-cv-00361. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]