Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-op-45437
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2018
Case in other court:Alabama Middle, 1:18-cv-00363
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:35 PM EST
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Noramco Inc
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By
Houston Lanier Brown, II
Watkins & Eager
contact info
David L. Brown, Jr.
Watkins & Eager
contact info
J. Patrick Strubel
Watkins & Eager
contact info
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Plaintiff
City of Abbeville, Alabama
Represented By
Rhon Eugene Jones
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Jere L. Beasley
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Jon Ryan Kral
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
William Robert Sutton
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Spencer Wayne Danzey
Gunter & Danzey
contact info
Richard Douglas Stratton
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/11/2019 4:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by City of Abbeville, Alabama. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc.1 for pdf.) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
1 1 154 pgs COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602048697.), filed by City of Abbeville, Alabama.(dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Filing Fee Receipt,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Abbeville, Alabama. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
3 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff City of Abbeville, Alabama. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
5 5 Summons Issued as to Allergan PLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD. and returned to counsel for foreign service. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 02, 2018
6 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by Laura McHaney for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018; Noramco, Inc. served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by 3/30/2018 for Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018; Cephalon, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
8 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by H. Ladner for Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
9 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Houston Lanier Brown, II on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, Houston) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, John) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lee Brown, Jr on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, David) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 05, 2018
12 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by William Lolley for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 06, 2018
13 13 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
14 14 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by name illegible for Johnson & Johnson served on 4/3/2018, answer due 4/24/2018. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
15 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by name illegible for Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 09, 2018
16 16 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by name illegible for Actavis, LLC served on 4/3/2018, answer due 4/24/2018. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
17 17 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Daniel D. Kelley for Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
18 18 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Amy McLaren for Endo Health Solutions, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
19 19 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Amy McLaren for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
20 20 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Amy McLaren for Mallinckrodt LLC served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
21 21 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by no signature for Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
22 22 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Moved Left No Address, Unable to Forward." Counsel notified electronically by this docket entry. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 16, 2018
Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to clerk. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
23 23 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer order entered on 4/16/2018 by the Judicial Panel on Multi district Litigation transferring this action to the USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 4/17/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
24 24 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Middle. Case number 1:18-cv-00363. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]