Seth Baker, et al v. Microsoft Corporation
Original Case: 2:11-cv-00722
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:12-cv-35946 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 15, 2012 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 31, 2018 12:29 AM PST |
Amicus Curiae
WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MICROSOFT CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SETH BAKER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MATTHEW DANZIG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JESSE BERNSTEIN
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAMES JARRETT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
NATHAN MARLOW
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARK RISK, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
1. | Appeals court revives Microsoft Xbox 360 console defect litigation (arstechnica.com) |
Submitted Fri 03/20/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 01/31/2018 12:26 AM PST |