Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-op-45329
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2018
Case in other court:Alabama Northern, 1:18-cv-00398
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:39 PM EST
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Plaintiff
City of Anniston Alabama
Represented By
William Robert Sutton
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Bruce J. Downey, IV
contact info
Jere L. Beasley
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Rhon Eugene Jones
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Richard Douglas Stratton
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/09/2019 2:14 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3046290, NDAL receipt #B4601087485. (Jones, Rhon) Modified on 3/14/2018 (JLC). [Transferred from alnd on 3/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
1 1 155 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by City of Anniston Alabama.(JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 3/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by City of Anniston Alabama. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 3/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by City of Anniston Alabama. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 3/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
4 4 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 3/14/2018. (KWC) [Transferred from alnd on 3/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER REGARDING RULE 7.1. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 05/11/2016. (KWC) [Transferred from alnd on 3/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 23, 2018
6 6 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L P, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. mailed certified mail. (AFS) Modified on 3/23/2018 (AFS). [Transferred from alnd on 3/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
7 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 3/27/2018; Cephalon, Inc. served on 3/27/2018; Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc. served on 3/27/2018. (KBB) [Transferred from alnd on 3/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
8 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. served on 3/26/2018; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/26/2018; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/26/2018. (KBB) [Transferred from alnd on 3/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL; case electronically transmitted to Clerk of Court in District of Northern District of Ohio. (SAC ) [Transferred from alnd on 3/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 30, 2018
10 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 1:18-cv-00398. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]