Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-op-45507
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2018
Case in other court:Tennessee Eastern, 1:18-cv-00061
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:40 PM EST
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Plaintiff
Hamilton County, Tennessee
Represented By
Jonathan Compretta
Mike Moore Law Firm
contact info
Mike Moore
Mike Moore Law Firm
contact info
Thomas R. Greer
Bailey & Greer
contact info
Daniel L. Clayton
Kinnard, Clayton & Beveridge
contact info
Bruce D. Fox
Fox & Farley
contact info
Ronald J. Berke
Berke, Berke & Berke
contact info
Randall L. Kinnard
Kinnard, Clayton & Beveridge
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:20 PM EDT
Thursday, April 12, 2018
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3648634.), filed by Hamilton County Tennessee.(Berke, Ronald) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Actavis Pharma,
Att: 2 Summons Actavis, LLC,
Att: 3 Summons Allergen Finance,
Att: 4 Summons Allergan, PLC,
Att: 5 Summons Amerisourcebergen,
Att: 6 Summons Cardinal Health,
Att: 7 Summons Cephalon,
Att: 8 Summons Endo Health,
Att: 9 Summons Endo Pharmaceuticals,
Att: 10 Summons Janssen Pharmaceutica,
Att: 11 Summons Janssen Pharmaceuticals,
Att: 12 Summons Johnson & Johnson,
Att: 13 Summons McKesson,
Att: 14 Summons Ortho-McNeil-Janssen,
Att: 15 Summons Purdue Pharma, Inc.,
Att: 16 Summons Purdue Pharma, LP,
Att: 17 Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA,
Att: 18 Summons The Purdue Frederick Co.,
Att: 19 Summons Watson Laboratories,
Att: 20 Summons Watson Pharmaceuticals,
Att: 21 Other Civil Cover Sheet
Friday, April 13, 2018
Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JBR) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Summons not issued as to Cephalon, Inc. Please re-file to include Defendant's address for service. (JBR) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac): Attorneys Moore, Compretta, Tann, Clayton and Greer are not admitted (See LR 83.5) This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (copy mailed to Moore, Compretta, Tann, Clayton and Greer) (JBR) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(JBR) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued - Activis, LLC,
Att: 2 Summons Issued - Allergan Finance, LLC,
Att: 3 Summons Issued - Allergan PLC,
Att: 4 Summons Issued - AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation,
Att: 5 Summons Issued - Cardinal Health, Inc.,
Att: 6 Summons Issued - Endo Health Solutions, Inc.,
Att: 7 Summons Issued - Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,
Att: 8 Summons Issued - Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.,
Att: 9 Summons Issued - Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,
Att: 10 Summons Issued - Johnson & Johnson,
Att: 11 Summons Issued - McKesson Corporation,
Att: 12 Summons Issued - Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals,
Att: 13 Summons Issued - Purdue Pharma, Inc.,
Att: 14 Summons Issued - Purdue Pharma, L.P.,
Att: 15 Summons Issued - Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.,
Att: 16 Summons Issued - The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.,
Att: 17 Summons Issued - Watson Laboratories, Inc.,
Att: 18 Summons Issued - Watson Pharmaceuticals
4 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/13/18. (JBR, [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.] (Entered: 04/13/2018)
Related: [-]
5 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/13/18. (JBR) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
6 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/13/18. (JBR) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 16, 2018
7 7 SUPPLEMENT to1 Complaint,,, Summons to Cephalon, Inc. by Hamilton County, Tennessee. (Berke, Ronald) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
8 8 Summons Issued as to Cephalon, Inc. (aws, ) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 18, 2018
9 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) by Hamilton County, Tennessee.(Greer, Thomas) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Attachment
Thursday, April 19, 2018
10 10 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Thomas R Greer re9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (aws, ) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 23, 2018
11 11 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hamilton County, Tennessee. (Greer, Thomas) Modified on 4/24/2018 to edit text. (aws, ) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
12 12 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Joseph Tann re2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac), (ABF) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 24, 2018
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 11 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Hamilton County, Tennessee, 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Hamilton County, Tennessee (aws, ) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 25, 2018
13 13 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal of Joseph C. Tann (Berke, Ronald) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
14 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Moore (Filing fee $ 90, Receipt# C1015572) by Hamilton County, Tennessee.(aws, ) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing
15 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan Compretta (Filing fee $ 90, Receipt# C1015572.) by Hamilton County, Tennessee.(aws, ) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Friday, April 27, 2018
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Hamilton County, Tennessee, 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Hamilton County, Tennessee (aws, ) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
16 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3659800.) by Hamilton County, Tennessee.(Clayton, Daniel) Modified on 4/27/2018 (BDG, ). [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 *** FILED IN ERROR SEE DOC
Att: 17 ***
17 17 SUPPLEMENT to16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3659800.) by Hamilton County, Tennessee. (Clayton, Daniel) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
24 24 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-25). Signed by Clerk of the Panel, Jeffery N. Luthi on 4/27/18. (aws, ) Mailed to Mike Moore and Jonathan Compretta. [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 30, 2018
Case transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio, MDL No. 2804. (aws, ) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
18 18 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Daniel L Clayton re16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and17 SUPPLEMENT. (aws, ) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
19 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hamilton County, Tennessee. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 4/25/2018. (Berke, Ronald) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
20 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hamilton County, Tennessee. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 4/25/2018. (Berke, Ronald) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
21 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hamilton County, Tennessee. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 4/26/2018. (Berke, Ronald) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
22 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hamilton County, Tennessee. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 4/26/2018. (Berke, Ronald) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
23 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hamilton County, Tennessee. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 4/26/2018. (Berke, Ronald) [Transferred from tned on 4/30/2018.]
Related: [-]
25 25 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Tennessee Eastern. Case number 1:18-cv-00061. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]