Neat Audio Acquisition Corp.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-11025
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-11025
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-11034 |
Case Filed: | May 01, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Neat Audio Acquisition Corp.
309 Park Plus Blvd.
Nashville, TN 37217 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago |
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
6
pgs
order
Order
Thu 12/20 3:06 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases And Order Amending Joint Administration Order To Designate Chapter 11 Case of Guitar Liquidation Corporation, f/k/a Cakewalk, Inc., As The Lead Case. THE DOCKET IN GUITAR LIQUIDATION CORPORATION, CASE NO. 18-11028 (CSS), SHOULD BE CONSULTED FOR ALL MATTERS AFFECTING THIS CASE FROM THIS DATE FORWARD. Signed on 12/20/2018 (DMC) Modified on 12/20/2018 (DMC) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 12/20 4:20 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (DMC) |
||
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Schedules/Statements
Fri 06/29 9:11 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Neat Audio Acquisition Corp.. (McLaughlin, Marcy) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Schedules/Statements
Fri 06/29 9:10 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Neat Audio Acquisition Corp.. (McLaughlin, Marcy) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Service - Notice
Mon 05/07 6:54 PM
Notice of Service // Notice Of Filing Of Second Amended Consolidated List Of Creditors Who Have The 30 Largest Unsecured Claims And Are Not Insiders Filed by Neat Audio Acquisition Corp.. (Custer, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order-Joint Admin
Wed 05/02 5:06 PM
An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of GIBSON BRANDS, INC., Case No. 18-11025 for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 18-11025 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 5/2/2018 (DMC) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Service - Notice
Wed 05/02 3:17 PM
Notice of Service //Notice of Filing of Amended Consolidated List of Creditors Who Have the 30 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders Filed by Neat Audio Acquisition Corp.. (Fournier, David) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 05/01 10:03 AM
SO ORDERED, the following case is hereby REASSIGNED from Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon to Judge Christopher S. Sontchi. (AK) |
|
4 | 4
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 05/01 9:08 AM
SO ORDERED, this case is hereby REASSIGNED from Judge Christopher S. Sontchi to Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon. (AK) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Tue 05/01 5:26 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Baldwin Piano, Inc., Cakewalk, Inc., Consolidated Musical Instruments, LLC, Gibson Brands, Inc., Gibson Cafe & Gallery, LLC, Gibson Europe B.V., Gibson Holdings, Inc., Gibson Innovations USA, Inc., Gibson International Sales LLC, Gibson Pro Audio Corp., Neat Audio Acquisition Corp., Wurlitzer Corp. (Fournier, David) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 05/01 5:05 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-11034 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8853091, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 05/01 4:56 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Neat Audio Acquisition Corp.. (Fournier, David) |
|
misc
Add Attorney
Tue 05/01 8:40 AM
Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Casey, Linda) |
||
court
Case Assigned
Tue 05/01 8:39 AM
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case. (SG) |