Knott v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45370 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Eastern, 7:18-cv-00006 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:43 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lynn Webster
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richie Enterprises, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Magna Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Fishman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Perry Fine
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The County of Knott
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Russell Portenoy
Terminated: 03/26/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:08 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
Conflict Check run. (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
Clerk's Note re1 Notice of Removal: MDL Panel (cc: SKV) notified of possible tag along case by e-mail with a copy of notice of removal, complaint & docket sheet. (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re9 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay the Date by Which to Respond to Complaint by Russell Portenoy with the consent of Knott County (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Jeffrey Phillips re10 MOTION to Stay by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation; Error: attorney failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days , prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing" (with a certificate of service), file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR(RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
19 | 19
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to John D. Lombardo re20 MOTION for John D. Lombardo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4005619). (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Sean Morris re21 MOTION for Sean Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4005639). (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re20 MOTION for John D. Lombardo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4005619) (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re21 MOTION for Sean Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4005639) (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
20 | 20
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
21 | 21
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
22 | 22
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
![]() |
|
24 | 24
![]() |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Salvatore C. Badala re25 MOTION for Salvatore C. Badala to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The County of Knott (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4020470). (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re25 MOTION for Salvatore C. Badala to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The County of Knott (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4020470) (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review:26 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel re16 Notice to Attorney,17 Notice to Attorney,19 Notice to Attorney Withdrawal of Attorneys Napoli, Ciaccio and Maslo . (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
25 | 25
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
26 | 26
![]() |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review:27 MOTION to Clarify by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation of Obligation to File Status Reports (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
27 | 27
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
28 | 28
![]() |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review:28 MOTION for Joinder27 MOTION to Clarify by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation of Obligation to File Status Reports by Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc. as to status (MJY) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
![]() |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re30 Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal by Russell Portenoy, The County of Knott (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
30 | 30
![]() |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
![]() |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
![]() |
|
34 | 34
![]() |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
![]() |