Epic Games, Inc. v. Hannah
North Carolina Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Terrence W Boyle |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-00197 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1337 Sherman-Clayton Act |
Case Filed: | May 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 03, 2018 5:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
Thomas Hannah
20 Mayo Street, F1B
Raleigh, NC 27603 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Epic Games, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Accused Fortnite leaker files defense against Epic Games lawsuit (polygon.com) |
Submitted Mon 06/25/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
![]() FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION ON CONSENT. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 12/20/2018. (Stouch, L.) |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Wed 12/19 11:52 AM
Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding22 Joint MOTION for Judgment and Permanent Injunction on Consent . (Stouch, L.) |
||
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Joint MOTION for Judgment and Permanent Injunction on Consent filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Thomas, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
![]() PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/31/2018. (Stouch, L.) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Thomas, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other
Thu 08/30 1:32 PM
TEXT ORDER finding as moot18 Motion for Extension of Time. Entered by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 8/30/2018. (Bullock, N.) |
||
utility
Motion Submitted
Thu 08/30 2:23 PM
Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding20 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. (Sellers, N.) |
||
Saturday, August 25, 2018 | ||
utility
Motion Referred
Sat 08/25 7:47 AM
Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Select Mediator . (Stouch, L.) |
||
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Selection of Rene Stemple Trehy as mediator filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Thomas, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Select Mediator filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Thomas, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to Select Mediator. The parties have one additional week to file a statement identifying and agreed-upon mediator, up to and including August 23, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 8/21/2018. (Stouch, L.) |
|
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
utility
Motion Referred
Mon 08/20 3:52 PM
Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Select Mediator . (Stouch, L.) |
||
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to Select Mediator filed by Thomas Hannah. (Morelos, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER : Discovery due by 3/1/2019. Motions due by 4/5/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 7/26/2018. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for important deadlines and information. (Stouch, L.) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
utility
Remark
Mon 07/23 9:02 AM
Remark -14 Rule 26(f) Report referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II for the entry of a scheduling order. (Stouch, L.) |
||
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Lawson, Catherine) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Financial Disclosure Statement by Thomas Hannah (Morelos, Andrea) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/22/2018. (Stouch, L.) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure
Fri 06/22 11:40 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Thomas Hannah. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Stouch, L.) |
||
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint by Thomas Hannah. (Morelos, Andrea) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
utility
Motion Referred to Clerk
Fri 06/01 3:09 PM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Stouch, L.) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 06/01 3:37 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time10 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiff, it is ordered that Defendant shall have up to and including June 21, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/1/2018. (Hockaday, A.) |
||
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Thomas Hannah. (Morelos, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Appearance filed by Andrea Winters Morelos on behalf of Thomas Hannah. (Morelos, Andrea) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by Epic Games, Inc. served on Thomas Hannah on 05/10/2018. (Thomas, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by Epic Games, Inc. served on Thomas Hannah on 05/10/18. (Thomas, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice filed by Epic Games, Inc. regarding1 Complaint Exhibit A . (Thomas, Christopher) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued as to Thomas Hannah. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Appearance filed by Catherine R.L. Lawson on behalf of Epic Games, Inc.. (Lawson, Catherine) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Financial Disclosure Statement by Epic Games, Inc. (Thomas, Christopher) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher M. Thomas on behalf of Epic Games, Inc.. (Thomas, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Thomas Hannah ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4497477.), filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Thomas, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |