Tangelo IP, LLC v. Tupperware Brands Corporation
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Richard G Andrews |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00692 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 03, 2018 4:39 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Tupperware Brands Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Tangelo IP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tupperware Brands Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tangelo IP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
3
pgs
order
Order - -Memorandum and Order
Tue 05/28 1:57 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Motion For Exceptional Case (D.I.20 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/24/2019. (nms) |
|
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Declaration
Wed 01/02 5:21 PM
Supplemental DECLARATION re24 Reply Brief of Jeremy D. Anderson by Tupperware Brands Corporation.(Anderson, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Brief - Reply
Wed 01/02 5:18 PM
REPLY BRIEF re20 MOTION For Exceptional Case filed by Tupperware Brands Corporation. (Anderson, Jeremy) |
|
Monday, December 24, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition
Mon 12/24 12:18 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re20 MOTION For Exceptional Case filed by Tangelo IP, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/31/2018. (Weinblatt, Richard) |
|
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Declaration
Mon 12/10 4:22 PM
DECLARATION of Jeremy D. Anderson re21 Opening Brief in Support, by Tupperware Brands Corporation.(Anderson, Jeremy) Modified on 12/10/2018 (nms) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Brief - Opening Brief in Support
Mon 12/10 4:19 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re20 MOTION For Exceptional Case, filed by Tupperware Brands Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/24/2018. (Anderson, Jeremy) Modified on 12/10/2018 (nms) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Attorney Fees
Mon 12/10 4:17 PM
MOTION For Exceptional Case - filed by Tupperware Brands Corporation.(Anderson, Jeremy) Modified on 12/10/2018 (nms) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
- Transcript
Thu 11/29 1:34 PM
Official Transcript of Oral Argument held on 11/15/18 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather Triozzi,Telephone number 302-573-6195. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2019. (Triozzi, Heather) |
|
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
Wed 11/28 3:04 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,429,005 B2.(nms) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum Order | ||
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
8
pgs
order
Order - -Memorandum and Order
Mon 11/26 12:00 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss (D.I.7 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/26/2018. (nms) |
|
utility
Terminate Case - Civil
Mon 11/26 12:01 PM
CASE CLOSED per D.I.17 . (nms) |
||
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel
Wed 11/21 10:15 AM
NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove William B. Collier, Jr. as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (Anderson, Jeremy) |
|
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
minutes
Oral Argument
Thu 11/15 1:20 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 11/15/2018. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) (ksr, ) |
||
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Oral Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 10/03 9:10 AM
ORAL ORDER: A hearing on the Motion to Dismiss (D.I.7 ) is now set for 11/15/2018, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/3/2018. (nms) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Brief - Reply
Tue 07/03 10:40 AM
REPLY BRIEF re7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tupperware Brands Corporation. (Anderson, Jeremy) |
|
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Tue 07/03 8:06 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Wills Collier,Neil J. McNabnay,Ricardo J. Bonilla,Theresa M. Dawnson for Tupperware Brands Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb) |
||
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Mon 07/02 8:05 PM
ANSWER to9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Tangelo IP, LLC.(Weinblatt, Richard) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/28 3:44 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil McNabnay, Ricardo Bonilla, William B. Collier, Jr. and Theresa Dawson - filed by Tupperware Brands Corporation. (Anderson, Jeremy) |
|
order
SO ORDERED
Thu 06/28 4:30 PM
SO ORDERED, re12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil McNabnay, Ricardo Bonilla, William B. Collier, Jr. and Theresa Dawson, filed by Tupperware Brands Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/28/2018. (nms) |
||
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition
Tue 06/26 11:33 AM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tangelo IP, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/3/2018.(Weinblatt, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
Tue 06/12 6:10 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Tupperware Brands Corporation. (Anderson, Jeremy) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Tue 06/12 6:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Tangelo IP, LLC by Tupperware Brands Corporation.(Anderson, Jeremy) |
|
8 | 8
respm
Brief - Opening Brief in Support
Tue 06/12 6:06 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Tupperware Brands Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/26/2018. (Anderson, Jeremy) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss/Fail to State Claim
Tue 06/12 5:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Tupperware Brands Corporation.(Anderson, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
order
SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Wed 05/30 2:02 PM
SO ORDERED, re6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Answer to Complaint to June 12, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Tupperware Brands Corporation answer due 6/12/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/30/2018. (nms) |
||
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Stipulation to EXTEND Time
Tue 05/29 5:21 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Answer to Complaint to June 12, 2018 - filed by Tupperware Brands Corporation. (Morrison, Susan) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/09 9:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tangelo IP, LLC. Tupperware Brands Corporation served on 5/8/2018, answer due 5/29/2018. (Weinblatt, Richard) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 05/09 12:31 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00691-RGA, 1:18-cv-00692-RGA (rjb) |
||
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/08 8:56 AM
Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Tupperware Brands Corporation on 5/8/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (fms) |
||
service
Summons Reissued - Alias Summons
Tue 05/08 2:56 PM
Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Tupperware Brands Corporation. (sar) |
||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
Tue 05/08 8:53 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Tangelo, LLC for Tangelo IP, LLC filed by Tangelo IP, LLC. (fms) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
Tue 05/08 8:52 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,429,005 B2. (fms) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Magistrate Consent Forms
Tue 05/08 8:51 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (fms) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 05/08 8:51 AM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGMENT filed with Jury Demand against Tupperware Brands Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2377113.) - filed by Tangelo IP, LLC.(fms) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |