Kissner et al v. McDonald's Corporation
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William P Dimitrouleas |
Referred: | Lurana S Snow |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-61026 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:0001 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 04, 2018 4:42 AM EST |
Defendant
McDonald's Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McDonald's USA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia E. Kissner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leonard Werner
|
Represented By
|
1. | McDonald's Sounds the Alarm: 'Utter Chaos' If a Judge Lets This 'Nonsense' Lawsuit Continue (inc.com) |
Submitted Mon 07/09/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
![]() ORDER granting28 Motion to Dismiss19 Amended Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction. Dismissing Case with prejudice; Closing Case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/2/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Thu 10/25 12:38 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re38 Response in Support of Motion. Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#39]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls) |
|
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 10/25 12:37 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction19 Amended Complaint filed by McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. (ls)(See Image at DE #38) |
|
38 | 38
![]() RESPONSE in Support re28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction19 Amended Complaint filed by McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. (Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 10/09 10:44 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting36 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss28 shall be filed on or before 10/24/2018. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/09/2018. (mkz) |
|
Monday, October 08, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of Its Motion To Dismiss the Amended Complaint re35 Memorandum by McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. Responses due by 10/22/2018(Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
![]() MEMORANDUM in Opposition re28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction19 Amended Complaint by Cynthia E. Kissner, Leonard Werner. (Lavin, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 09/18 4:02 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion. Re:28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction19 Amended Complaint filed by McDonald's USA, LLC, McDonald's Corporation. Responses due by 10/2/2018 Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 09/18/2018. (mkz) |
|
33 | 33
![]() Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction19 Amended Complaint by Cynthia E. Kissner, Leonard Werner.(Lavin, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 09/07 2:02 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion. Re:28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction19 Amended Complaint filed by McDonald's USA, LLC, McDonald's Corporation. Responses due by 9/24/2018 Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/7/1978. (mkz) |
|
31 | 31
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction19 Amended Complaint by Cynthia E. Kissner, Leonard Werner.(Lavin, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
![]() ORDER granting29 Renewed Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Craig D. Mills, Esq. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/30/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Renewed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Craig D. Mills, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10953605 by McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. Responses due by 9/12/2018(Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
utility
~Util - Activate Terminated Attorney
Thu 08/30 7:28 AM
Attorney Craig Mills representing McDonald's Corporation (Defendant) Activated. (pt) |
||
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction19 Amended Complaint by McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. Responses due by 9/10/2018(Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
![]() ORDER granting25 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document McDonald's Corporation. Answer due 8/27/2018; McDonald's USA, LLC. Answer due 8/27/2018. Re:19 Amended Complaint filed by Leonard Werner, Cynthia E. Kissner. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/2/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Thu 08/02 8:06 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint re19 Amended Complaint. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint re19 Amended Complaint by McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. Attorney Jennifer Olmedo-Rodriguez added to party McDonald's USA, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/15/2018(Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Summons Issued as to McDonald's USA, LLC. (ls) |
|
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Cynthia E. Kissner, Leonard Werner re19 Amended Complaint filed by Leonard Werner, Cynthia E. Kissner (Lavin, Andrew) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 20 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): McDonald's USA, LLC. (Lavin, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER denying as moot12 Motion to Dismiss1 Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/24/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Tue 07/24 12:41 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re19 Amended Complaint. Parties/Mediator Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties/Mediator and add the additional parties. (ls) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cynthia E. Kissner, Leonard Werner.(Lavin, Andrew) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ORDER denying without prejudice17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Craig Mills of Attorney Craig Mills Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Craig Mills.. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Craig Mills, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10834074 by McDonald's Corporation. Responses due by 8/2/2018(Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion re:12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint filed by McDonald's Corporation. Responses due by 7/23/2018 ; granting14 Motion to Amend/Correct1 Complaint. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge (Amended Complaint due by 7/23/2018.). Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/12/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Thu 07/12 9:02 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re14 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to either file a response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint of to file an Amended Class Action Complaint re12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack. Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief ; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. AND Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to either file a response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint of to file an Amended Class Action Complaint re12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint by Cynthia E. Kissner, Leonard Werner. Responses due by 7/25/2018(Lavin, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by McDonald's Corporation (Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint by McDonald's Corporation. Responses due by 7/13/2018(Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including June 30, 2018 to respond to the Complaint. (McDonald's Corporation. Answer due 6/30/2018. Re:1 Complaint) Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/6/2018. (mc) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by McDonald's Corporation.(Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Victoria Oguntoye on behalf of McDonald's Corporation. Attorney Victoria Oguntoye added to party McDonald's Corporation(pty:dft). (Oguntoye, Victoria) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Olmedo-Rodriguez on behalf of McDonald's Corporation. Attorney Jennifer Olmedo-Rodriguez added to party McDonald's Corporation(pty:dft). (Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Mon 05/21 12:24 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re5 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#6]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls) |
|
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Mon 05/21 12:23 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Cynthia E. Kissner, Leonard Werner. McDonald's Corporation served on 5/16/2018, answer due 6/6/2018. (ls)(See Image at DE #5) |
|
5 | 5
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cynthia E. Kissner, Leonard Werner re3 Summons Issued,1 Complaint Verified Return of Service (Lavin, Andrew) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/10/2018. (ls) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to McDonald's Corporation. (rms1) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 05/08 4:26 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (rms1) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Class Action against McDonald's Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10633473, filed by Cynthia E. Kissner, Leonard Werner.(Lavin, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |