City of Tuscaloosa, Alabama v. Cardinal Health Inc et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45553 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 7:18-cv-00630 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:45 PM EST |
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
west-ward pharmaceuticals corp. k/n/a hikma pharmaceuticals, inc.
|
|
Defendant
Indivior, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Tuscaloosa, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/11/2019 4:12 PM EDT |
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601088421. related document1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by City of Tuscaloosa, Alabama.(PSM). (Hobbs, Chad) Modified on 4/23/2018 (TLM, ). [Transferred from alnd on 5/9/2018.] | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
15 | 15
![]() |
|
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
![]() |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
![]() |
|
21 | 21
![]() |