Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-op-45421
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2018
Case in other court:Alabama Southern, 2:18-cv-00142
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:46 PM EST
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Noramco Inc
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Plaintiff
City of Greensboro, Alabama
Represented By
Jere L. Beasley
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Rhon Eugene Jones
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
William M. Pompey
Pompey & Pompey
contact info
William Robert Sutton
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Richard Douglas Stratton
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Jon Ryan Kral
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/09/2019 2:45 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
1 1 156 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2201198, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by City of Greensboro, Alabama. (Jones, Rhon) (tot). [Transferred from alsd on 4/13/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons-Actavis LLC,
Att: 2 Summons-Actavis Pharma Inc,
Att: 3 Summons-Allergan plc,
Att: 4 Summons-AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation,
Att: 5 Summons-Cardinal Health Inc,
Att: 6 Summons-Cephalon Inc,
Att: 7 Summons-Endo Health Solutions Inc,
Att: 8 Summons-Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc,
Att: 9 Summons-Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc,
Att: 10 Summons-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc,
Att: 11 Summons-Johnson & Johnson,
Att: 12 Summons-Mallinckrodt LLC,
Att: 13 Summons-Mallinckrodt plc,
Att: 14 Summons-McKesson Corporation,
Att: 15 Summons-Noramco Inc,
Att: 16 Summons-Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc,
Att: 17 Summons-Purdue Pharma Inc,
Att: 18 Summons-Purdue Pharma LP,
Att: 19 Summons-Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD,
Att: 20 Summons-Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc,
Att: 21 Summons-The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.,
Att: 22 Summons-Watson Laboratories Inc,
Att: 23 Summons-Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Att: 24 (3/28/2018) Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff City of Greensboro, Alabama. (Jones, Rhon) [Transferred from alsd on 4/13/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
3 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutials, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt plc, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot) [Transferred from alsd on 4/13/2018.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Service Notice entered 3/28/2018. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 5/14/2018. (tot) [Transferred from alsd on 4/13/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 02, 2018
5 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Greensboro, Alabama. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018; Janssen Pharmaceutials, Inc. served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018; McKesson Corporation served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018; Noramco, Inc. served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018 (Jones, Rhon)[Transferred from alsd on 4/13/2018.]
Related: [-]
6 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Greensboro, Alabama. Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018; Cephalon, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018; Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018; Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Jones, Rhon) Modified on 4/3/2018 (tot). [Transferred from alsd on 4/13/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 06, 2018
7 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Greensboro, Alabama. Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018; Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Jones, Rhon) [Transferred from alsd on 4/13/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 09, 2018
8 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Greensboro, Alabama. Actavis LLC served on 4/3/2018, answer due 4/24/2018; The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 4/9/2018, answer due 4/30/2018 (Jones, Rhon) [Transferred from alsd on 4/13/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
9 9 Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent electronically to requesting District. Case Closed. (tot) [Transferred from alsd on 4/13/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 13, 2018
10 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Southern. Case number 2:18-cv-00142. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]