Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-op-45497
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2018
Case in other court:Georgia Northern, 4:18-cv-00088
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:53 PM EST
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
CVS Health Corporation
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Walmart, Inc.
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Smith Drug Company
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
3411 Silverside Road
Wilmington, DE 19180
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Noramco Inc
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Plaintiff
Catoosa County, Georgia
Represented By
C. Chad Young
Patty & Young
contact info
Jesse Anderson Davis
Brinson Askew Berry Siegler Richardson & Davis
contact info
Christopher D. Glover
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Rhon Eugene Jones
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Clifton M. Patty, Jr.
Patty & Young
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:00 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
1 1 Electronic Summons Issued as to Purdue Pharma L.P. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Purdue Pharma, Inc. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
6 6 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Catoosa County, Georgia. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-7804133) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bjh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cephalon, Inc. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
8 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
9 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
10 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
11 11 Electronic Summons Issued as to Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
12 12 Electronic Summons Issued as to Noramco, Inc. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
13 13 Electronic Summons Issued as to Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
14 14 Electronic Summons Issued as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
15 15 Electronic Summons Issued as to Allergan PLC. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
16 16 Electronic Summons Issued as to Waston Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
17 17 Electronic Summons Issued as to Watson Laboratories, Inc. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
18 18 Electronic Summons Issued as to Actavis, LLC. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
19 19 Electronic Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
20 20 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mallinckrodt, PLC. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
21 21 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mallinckrodt LLC. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
22 22 Electronic Summons Issued as to McKesson Corporation. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
23 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Catoosa County, Georgia by Catoosa County, Georgia.(Glover, Christopher) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
24 24 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cardinal Health, Inc. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
25 25 APPLICATION for Admission of Rhon E. Jones Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7805188)by Catoosa County, Georgia. (Glover, Christopher) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
26 26 Electronic Summons Issued as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:25 APPLICATION for Admission of Rhon E. Jones Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7805188). Attorney Rhon E. Jones added appearing on behalf of Catoosa County, Georgia per DB (cdg) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
27 27 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Harold L. Murphy recused. Case reassigned to Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 4:18-cv-88-CAP. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 4/11/18. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 13, 2018
28 28 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael L. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 4:18-cv-00088-MLB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 4/13/2018. (tcc) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
29 29 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/17/18. (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 18, 2018
30 30 Return of Service Executed by Catoosa County, Georgia. McKesson Corporation served on 4/3/2018, answer due 4/24/2018; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 4/18/2018, answer due 5/9/2018. (Glover, Christopher) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 20, 2018
31 31 Return of Service Executed by Catoosa County, Georgia. Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 4/13/2018, answer due 5/4/2018; Johnson & Johnson served on 4/16/2018, answer due 5/7/2018; Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 4/20/2018, answer due 5/11/2018; Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 4/16/2018, answer due 5/7/2018; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 4/13/2018, answer due 5/4/2018; The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 4/20/2018, answer due 5/11/2018; Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 4/16/2018, answer due 5/7/2018. (Glover, Christopher) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 24, 2018
Case transferred electronically to USDC ND/OH for inclusion in MDL No. 2804. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
Civil Case Terminated. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
32 32 Cert copy of CTO-24 ORDER from the MDL Panel TRANSFERRING action the USDC ND/OH for inclusion in MDL No. 2804. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 4/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
33 33 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Northern. Case number 4:18-cv-00088. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]