Kozyra Holdings, LLC - 955 Lively LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-06105
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-06105
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | A Benjamin Goldgar |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-15605 |
Case Filed: | May 30, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 23, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Kozyra Holdings, LLC - 955 Lively LLC
955 Lively Boulevard
Wood Dale, IL 60191 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago |
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 03/23 3:20 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed . (Corona, Christina) |
|
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
order
Amended Motion
Tue 03/23 8:45 AM
Order Granting Motion For Final Decree , Granting Amended Motion. Signed on 3/22/2021. (Corona, Christina) |
|
Monday, March 15, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Mon 03/15 11:51 AM
(E)Hearing Continued . hearing scheduled for 03/22/2021 at 10:00 AM at Appear using Zoom for Government.. Signed on 03/15/2021. (Castellano, Nancy) |
|
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Amended Motion
Fri 03/05 11:56 AM
Amended Notice of Motion and Amended Motion Filed by Shelly A. DeRousse on behalf of Kozyra Holdings, LLC - 955 Lively LLC. Hearing scheduled for 3/15/2021 at 09:30 AM at Appear using Zoom for Government. (DeRousse, Shelly) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
utility
U - Corrective Entry
Fri 03/05 11:40 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: PDF/Event Error, Filer Notified . (Gomez, Denise) |
|
Thursday, March 04, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Final Decree
Thu 03/04 4:16 PM
Notice of Motion and Amended Motion for Final Decree Filed by Shelly A. DeRousse on behalf of Kozyra Holdings, LLC - 955 Lively LLC. Hearing scheduled for 3/15/2021 at 09:30 AM at Appear using Zoom for Government. (DeRousse, Shelly) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Final Decree
Wed 03/03 4:18 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Decree Filed by Shelly A. DeRousse on behalf of Kozyra Holdings, LLC - 955 Lively LLC. Hearing scheduled for 3/15/2021 at 09:30 AM at Appear using Zoom for Government. (DeRousse, Shelly) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings
Mon 07/02 6:01 AM
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings Debtor Case No NoteKozyra Holdings, LLC - 955 Lively LLC 18-06105 Ch11 filed in Illinois Northern Bankruptcy on 03/02/2018 (Admin) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Joint Administration
Fri 06/15 10:05 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 18-06105 Markpol Distributors Inc with Member Cases(s) 18-15604 Vistula Development Incorporated, 18-15605 Kozyra Holdings LLC - 955 Lively LLC . Signed on 6/13/2018. (Keith, Cynthia) |
|
10 | 10
court
Hearing Concluded (Other)
Wed 06/13 11:07 AM
Hearing Concluded on 6/13/18 . (Castellano, Nancy) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
Thu 06/07 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. . No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 06/07/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Joint Administration
Wed 06/06 1:09 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 18-06105 Markpol Distributors, Inc. with Member Case(s) 18-15604 Vistula Development, Incorporated and 18-15605 Kozyra Holdings, LLC - 955 Lively, LLC Filed by Shelly A. DeRousse on behalf of Kozyra Holdings, LLC - 955 Lively LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/13/2018 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 642, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (DeRousse, Shelly) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Tue 06/05 12:24 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case . 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/10/2018 at 02:00 PM at 219 South Dearborn, Office of the U.S. Trustee, 8th Floor, Room 802, Chicago, Illinois 60604. Last day to object to dischargeability is 9/10/2018 (Gutierrez, Evelyn) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Appearance
Mon 06/04 3:53 PM
Appearance Filed by Adam B. Rome on behalf of MB Financial Bank, N.A.. (Rome, Adam) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling
Fri 06/01 7:36 AM
Order Scheduling . Status hearing to be held on 6/13/2018 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 642, Chicago, Illinois 60604. Signed on 5/31/2018 (Sims, LaKeysha) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certification of Relatedness
Thu 05/31 9:10 AM
Certification of Relatedness Filed by Elizabeth L Janczak on behalf of Kozyra Holdings, LLC - 955 Lively LLC. (Janczak, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Declaration
Wed 05/30 10:10 PM
Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing Petition and Accompanying Documents Filed by Shelly A. DeRousse on behalf of Kozyra Holdings, LLC - 955 Lively LLC. (DeRousse, Shelly) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 05/30 10:10 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-15605 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 37341777. Fee Amount $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11a)
Wed 05/30 10:09 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717, Filed by Shelly A. DeRousse on behalf of Kozyra Holdings, LLC - 955 Lively LLC (DeRousse, Shelly) |