E. Waters & Associates, P.C
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Carla E Craig |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-43212 |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 09, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
E. Waters & Associates, P.C
8936 Sutphin Blvd
Jamaica, NY 11435-3722 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn Office) U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Suite 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 6:06 PM EDT |
Sunday, November 11, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal
Mon 11/12 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal Notice Date 11/11/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 11/09 7:51 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (ads) |
||
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal
Fri 11/09 7:50 AM
Stipulation and Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Case with Notice of Dismissal . Signed on 11/8/2018 (ads) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Sun 11/04 6:12 PM
Hearing Held; Appearance: Rachel Wolf from the Office of the United States Trustee - No Opposition - Granted; Submit Order (tleonard) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Case Owned BK)
Sun 11/04 6:13 PM
Hearing Held; Appearance: Rachel Wolf from the Office of the United States Trustee - Marked Off, It is So Ordered, By The Honorable Carla E. Craig. Endorsed on 10/31/18 calendar. (This is a text Order, no document attached) (tleonard) |
||
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Wed 09/26 3:07 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Office of the United States Trustee (Martin, MaryLou) |
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK)
Thu 09/27 8:48 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Status hearing to be held on 10/31/2018 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY. (tleonard) |
||
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Approve Stipulation
Tue 09/25 1:01 PM
Motion to Approve Stipulation Dismissing Chapter 11 Case Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY. (Martin, MaryLou) |
|
Att: 1 Motion to Approve Stipulation Dismissing Case | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal | ||
26 | 26
misc
Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings)
Tue 09/25 12:15 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from September 26, 2018 at 3:30 pm to October 31, 2018 at 2:00 pm Filed by Norma E Ortiz on behalf of E. Waters & Associates, P.C (Ortiz, Norma). Related document(s) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
trustee
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors
Thu 09/13 11:18 AM
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) Meeting Adjourned to 11/5/2018 at 03:00 PM at Room 2579, 271-C Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, NY. (Martin, MaryLou) |
||
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (BK)
Sat 08/25 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (BK) Notice Date 08/24/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
court
Transcript Court Ordered (Judge Craig Only)
Tue 08/21 12:53 PM
Transcript & Notice regarding the hearing held on 08/01/18. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the Office of the Clerk or may be purchased from the court transcriber. [Please see the court's website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency]. . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Due By 08/28/2018. Redaction Request Due By 09/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 09/21/2018. TRANSCRIPT ACCESS WILL BE ELECTRONICALLY RESTRICTED THROUGH 11/19/2018 AND MAY BE VIEWED AT THE OFFICE OF THE CLERK. (eScribers LLC) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Relief from Stay
Wed 08/15 6:19 PM
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay to the extent set forth herein. Signed on 8/13/2018. (tml) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK)
Thu 08/02 3:42 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Robert Mizrahi Representing 8930 Sutphin Boulevard, Rachel Weinberger from the Office of the United States Trustee, Norma E Ortiz Representing Debtor, Edward J Waters Debtor, Alyssa Gillespie Representing Creditor - Status hearing to be held on 09/26/2018 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY. (tleonard) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Thu 08/02 3:43 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances: Robert Mizrahi Representing 8930 Sutphin Boulevard, Rachel Weinberger from the Office of the United States Trustee, Norma E Ortiz Representing Debtor, Edward J Waters Debtor, Alyssa Gillespie Representing Creditor - Granted; Settle Conditional Order (tleonard) |
||
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 07/31 4:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Norma E Ortiz on behalf of E. Waters & Associates, P.C (Ortiz, Norma) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Thu 07/26 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 07/25/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
court
Court's Certificate of Mailing
Mon 07/23 10:50 AM
Court's Service List (ads) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim
Mon 07/23 10:47 AM
Order Establishing Deadline for filing Proofs of Claim and the form and manner of notice thereof. Signed on 7/20/2018. Proofs of Claims due by 9/2/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/27/2018. (ads) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
trustee
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors
Mon 07/16 11:20 AM
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) Meeting Adjourned to 9/13/2018 at 03:00 PM at Room 2579, 271-C Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, NY. (Martin, MaryLou) |
||
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (No Fee)
Fri 07/13 3:20 PM
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Schedule A/B, Schedule C, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Schedule I, Schedule J, Filed by Edward J Waters on behalf of E. Waters & Associates, P.C (Waters, Edward) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (BK)
Fri 07/13 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (BK) Notice Date 07/12/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Extend Time
Tue 07/10 8:09 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Deadline to file schedules and setting schedule; the Debtor shall file an application to retain new counsel on or before July 20, 2018; the Hearing is adjourned to August 1, 2018 at 3:30 p.m. . Signed on 7/9/2018 Schedule A/B due 7/13/2018. Schedule D due 7/13/2018. Schedule E/F due 7/13/2018. Schedule G due 7/13/2018. Schedule H due 7/13/2018. Disclosure of Compensation Pursuant to FBR 2016(b) due 7/13/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs for Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Form 107 due 7/13/2018. Summary of Schedules due 7/13/2018. List of Equity Security Holders due 7/13/2018. Declaration on Behalf of a Corporation or Partnership schedule due 7/13/2018. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 7/13/2018. List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 7/13/2018. Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 7/13/2018. (ads) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Relief from Stay (Fee Due)
Mon 07/09 1:40 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay Fee Amount $181. Filed by Robert Mizrahi on behalf of 8930 Sutphin Boulevard LLC. Hearing scheduled for 8/1/2018 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY. (Mizrahi, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Notice of Motion | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Memo of Law | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Creditor Affidavit - Declaration | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh A - Lease Part I of II | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh A - Lease Part II of II | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exh B - Notice of Petition & Petition | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exh C - Judgment | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exh D - Stipulation | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exh E - Amended Stipulation | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exh F - Order | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Exh G - Correspondence | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Exh H - Ledger | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Bankruptcy Stay | ||
14 | 14
court
Transcript Court Ordered (Judge Craig Only)
Mon 07/09 1:24 PM
Transcript & Notice regarding the hearing held on 06/27/18. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the Office of the Clerk or may be purchased from the court transcriber. [Please see the court's website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency]. . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Due By 07/16/2018. Redaction Request Due By 07/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 08/9/2018. TRANSCRIPT ACCESS WILL BE ELECTRONICALLY RESTRICTED THROUGH 10/9/2018 AND MAY BE VIEWED AT THE OFFICE OF THE CLERK. (ADL Transcription Services, Inc) |
|
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Mon 07/09 1:41 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(1 18-43212 cec) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 16861647. Fee amount 181.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Amended List of Creditors
Fri 06/29 12:12 PM
Second Amended List of Creditors E Waters and Associates P.C . Filed by Edward J Waters on behalf of E. Waters & Associates, P.C (Waters, Edward) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
trustee
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors
Thu 06/28 11:12 AM
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) Meeting Adjourned to 7/16/2018 at 11:00 AM at Room 2579, 271-C Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, NY. (Martin, MaryLou) |
||
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK)
Fri 07/06 4:26 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Edward J Waters, achel Weinberger from the Office of the United States Trustee - Status hearing to be held on 08/01/2018 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY - Court to issue order granting motion for extension of time and setting 7/13/18 to file schedules (tleonard) |
||
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Operating Report
Thu 06/21 5:56 PM
Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 31,2018 Filed by Edward J Waters on behalf of E. Waters & Associates, P.C (Waters, Edward) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Thu 06/14 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 06/13/2018. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing
Thu 06/14 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing Notice Date 06/13/2018. (Admin.) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Wed 06/13 8:54 PM
First Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Edward J Waters on behalf of E. Waters & Associates, P.C. (Waters, Edward) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Amended List of Creditors
Wed 06/13 2:59 PM
Amended List of Creditors E Waters and Associates P.C . Filed by Edward J Waters on behalf of E. Waters & Associates, P.C (Waters, Edward) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Mon 06/11 11:28 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/2/2018 at 03:30 PM at Room 2579, 271-C Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, NY. (ads) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
List of Creditors
Fri 06/08 5:01 PM
List of Creditors Filed by Edward J Waters on behalf of E. Waters & Associates, P.C (Waters, Edward) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing
Thu 06/07 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 06/06/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Sunday, June 03, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order
Mon 06/04 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 06/03/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
order
Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges
Fri 06/01 5:06 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Signed on 6/1/2018 Status hearing to be held on 6/27/2018 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY. (tml) |
|
court
Prior Filings
Fri 06/01 8:06 AM
[LINK:Prior Filing] Case Number(s): 17-22446 rdd (Southern District of New York) dismissed 10/23/17 (cjm) |
||
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Mon 06/04 1:36 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 5/31/2018. Mailing Matrix / List of Creditors Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-3 due date: 5/31/2018. Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 5/31/2018. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 5/31/2018. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 5/31/2018. Small Business Balance Sheet due by 6/7/2018. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due by 6/7/2018. Small Business Statement of Operations due by 6/7/2018. Small Business Tax Return due by 6/7/2018. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 6/14/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 6/14/2018. Schedule A/B due 6/14/2018. Schedule D due 6/14/2018. Schedule E/F due 6/14/2018. Schedule G due 6/14/2018. Schedule H due 6/14/2018. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 6/14/2018. List of Equity Security Holders due 6/14/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 6/14/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 6/14/2018. (ads) Modified on 6/4/2018 (ads) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 05/31 7:19 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Edward J Waters on behalf of E. Waters & Associates, P.C Chapter 11 Plan - Small Business - due by 11/27/2018. Chapter 11 Small Business Disclosure Statement due by 11/27/2018. (Waters, Edward) |
|
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Thu 05/31 7:20 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(1 18-43212 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 16727395. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
utility
Update / Set Deadlines
Mon 06/04 1:39 PM
Deadlines Updated / SetMailing Matrix / List of Creditors Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-3 due by 5/31/2018. (ads) |